RealPage, Inc. et al v. Enterprise Risk Control. LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
RealPage, Inc. and RealPage Vendor Compliance LLC |
Defendant: |
Enterprise Risk Control. LLC and Lonnie Derden |
Case Number: |
4:2016cv00737 |
Filed: |
September 23, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas |
Office: |
Sherman Office |
County: |
Collin |
Presiding Judge: |
Amos L. Mazzant |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 3, 2017 |
Filing
96
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Application for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #10) is hereby GRANTED IN PART. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/3/2017. (daj, )
|
March 30, 2017 |
Filing
62
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Computer Images (Dkt. 49 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendants shall produce a mirror image to the neutral forensic expert for inspection within seven (7) days of this order. The forensic examiner shall produce a report by April 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/30/2017. (baf, )
|
March 29, 2017 |
Filing
61
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Document Production, Motion to Overrule Objections, and Motion to Compel Document Custodian Deposition (Dkt. 40 ) is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants shall produce all items in accordance with this order within seven (7) days. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/29/2017. (baf, )
|
February 16, 2017 |
Filing
39
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 11 ) is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Abate (Dkt. 11 ) is GRANTED in part, pending direct negotiation and mediat ion according to Section 8.9 of the Asset Purchase agreement. Plaintiffs' claim for money damages is hereby ABATED pending direct negotiation and mediation according to Section 8.9 of the Asset Purchase Agreement. Plaintiffs' claim for p reliminary injunctive relief as permitted by Section 8.9(e) of the Asset Purchase Agreement will proceed as scheduled. A hearing on the preliminary injunction has been set for May 18-19, 2017. The hearing will commence at 9:00 a.m. on May 18, 2017, at the Paul Brown United States Courthouse located at 101 East Pecan Street in Sherman, Texas. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/16/2017. (baf, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?