Liverman et al v. Denton County, Texas, Criminal District Attorney et al
Plaintiff: |
Roger Liverman and Aaron Liverman |
Defendant: |
Denton County, Texas, Criminal District Attorney, Paul Johnson, Lara Tomlin, Rick Daniel, Lindsey Sheguit and Katheryn Payne Hall |
Case Number: |
4:2016cv00801 |
Filed: |
October 19, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas |
Office: |
Sherman Office |
County: |
Denton |
Presiding Judge: |
Kimberly C Priest Johnson |
Presiding Judge: |
Amos L. Mazzant |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 15, 2017 |
Filing
72
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 68 Report and Recommendations. Accordingly, the District Attorney's Office's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 65) is GRANTED. The case as to the Defendant Denton County Criminal District Attorneys Office a/k/a Denton County, Texas, Criminal District Attorney shall be dismissed with all costs to be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/15/2017. (daj, )
|
June 15, 2017 |
Filing
63
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 58 Report and Recommendations. Defendant Hall's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 52 ) is GRANTED, and her Motion to Strike (Dkt. 52 ) is DENIED as moot. The case as to Defendant Katheryn Payne Hall shall be dismissed with all costs to be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/15/2017. (baf, )
|
March 23, 2017 |
Filing
50
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 40 Report and Recommendations, 18 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Paul Johnson, Lindsey Sheguit, Denton County, Texas, Criminal District Attorney, Lara Toml in, Rick Daniel. The District Attorney Defendants' Consolidated Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6) (Dkt. 18 ), is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs' claims against Denton County Criminal District Attorney Paul Johnson and three Assistant Criminal District Attorneys, Lara Tomlin, Rick Daniel, and Lindsey Sheguit, are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, with all costs to be borne by the party incurring same. All other named Defendants remain in the suit at this time. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/23/2017. (baf, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?