Orthosie Systems, LLC v. Quartix, Inc.
Plaintiff: Orthosie Systems, LLC
Defendant: Quartix, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00998
Filed: December 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2017 Filing 19 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cm, )
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #17 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant are hereby dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. t is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/2/17. (cm, )
June 1, 2017 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Dismiss All Claims and Counterclaims, filed on behalf of all Parties by Orthosie Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burns, Ronald)
May 15, 2017 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burns, Ronald)
May 5, 2017 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #12 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Orthosie Systems, LLC. (Burns, Ronald)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER finding as moot #11 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss First and Second Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) for Failure to Properly State a Claim Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 8(a) (Dkt. #11) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/26/17. (cm, )
April 24, 2017 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Quartix, Inc.'s First and Second Counterclaims filed by Quartix, Inc. . (Collins, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2017: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (cm, ).
April 24, 2017 Filing 12 AMENDED ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Orthosie Systems, LLC by Quartix, Inc.. (Collins, Michael)
April 10, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Quartix, Inc.'s First and Second Counterclaims by Orthosie Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burns, Ronald)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS, ( Rule 16 Management Conference set for 6/9/2017 10:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before Judge Amos L. Mazzant III.). Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/3/17. (cm, )
March 24, 2017 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Quartix, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Quartix Holdings PLC for Quartix, Inc.. (Collins, Michael)
March 24, 2017 Filing 8 Quartix, Inc.'s ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Orthosie Systems, LLC by Quartix, Inc..(Collins, Michael)
February 10, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Collins on behalf of Quartix, Inc. (Collins, Michael)
February 6, 2017 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Orthosie Systems, LLC. Quartix, Inc. waiver sent on 1/23/2017, answer due 3/24/2017. (baf, )
January 19, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Quartix, Inc.. (cm, )
January 19, 2017 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Quartix, Inc., filed by Orthosie Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Burns, Ronald)
January 19, 2017 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Orthosie Systems, LLC (Burns, Ronald)
January 3, 2017 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Burns, Ronald)
December 31, 2016 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Orthosie Systems, LLC. (cm, )
December 31, 2016 Case Assigned to Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (cm, )
December 31, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Quartix, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6091737.), filed by Orthosie Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Burns, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orthosie Systems, LLC v. Quartix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orthosie Systems, LLC
Represented By: Ronald William Burns, Jr
Represented By: Mazin Ahmad Sbaiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quartix, Inc.
Represented By: Michael James Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?