Orthosie Systems, LLC v. DPL Telematics
Plaintiff: Orthosie Systems, LLC
Defendant: DPL Telematics
Case Number: 4:2016cv01002
Filed: December 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2017 Filing 11 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (baf, )
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Before the Court is the plaintiff's #8 Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice (the "Motion"). Having considered the merits of Motion, this Court finds that there is good cause to grant that motion. The Motion is therefore GRANTED. All claims in this action are dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/10/2017. (baf, )
October 9, 2017 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by Orthosie Systems, LLC. (Burns, Ronald)
October 9, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Orthosie Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burns, Ronald)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a Status Report informing the Court of the status of this case no later than October 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/26/2017. (baf, )
May 11, 2017 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Orthosie Systems, LLC. DPL Telematics served on 4/27/2017, answer due 5/18/2017. (daj, )
March 13, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to DPL Telematics. (baf, )
March 13, 2017 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Orthosie Systems, LLC (Burns, Ronald)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL - The Complaint was filed in this case on December 31, 2016. It appears from the records currently before the Court that Defendant has not yet been served. Moreover, the Court's records indicate that more than 60 days have passed from the filing of the Complaint and/or Notice of Removal in this Court. Therefore, this notice serves to inform Plaintiff that this action shall be dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant after 90 days, in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 (m), as amended effective December 1, 2015. To avoid dismissal pursuant to Rule 4(m), if more than 90 days are necessary for service of process, Plaintiff must execute and file a verified petition regarding service of process on or before 3/20/2017. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/10/2017. (baf, )
January 3, 2017 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Burns, Ronald)
December 31, 2016 Case ASSIGNED to Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
December 31, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against DPL Telematics ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6091746.), filed by Orthosie Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Burns, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orthosie Systems, LLC v. DPL Telematics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orthosie Systems, LLC
Represented By: Ronald William Burns, Jr
Represented By: Mazin Ahmad Sbaiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DPL Telematics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?