Molina v. Collin County, Texas et al
Plaintiff: Guillermo Murillo Molina
Defendant: Collin County, Texas and Robert Langwell
Case Number: 4:2017cv00017
Filed: January 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. 65 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/17/2018. (baf, )
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant Collin County's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 31 ) is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, Molina's federal and state law claims against Collin County are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and Collin County is dismissed from this lawsuit. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/21/2017. (baf, )
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant Deputy Langwell's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 30 ) is hereby DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART. Accordingly, the Court denies Deputy Langwell's motion as it relates to qualified immunity, but grants it as to Molina's claims for punitive damages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/14/2017. (baf, )
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Experts (Dkt. 41 ) is hereby GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/27/2017. (baf, )
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Summary Judgment Evidence (Dkt. 48 ) is hereby GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' Objections and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Improper Summary Judgment Evidence (Dkt. 44 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/25/2017. (baf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molina v. Collin County, Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Murillo Molina
Represented By: Joe Ralph Fletcher, Jr.
Represented By: Scott H Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collin County, Texas
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Langwell
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?