November 5, 2020 |
Filing
428
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING 422 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE granting 396 Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendants Jerry L. Bryant, Brad Johnson, Tiffany Averitte, and Paseo Miramar, Inc. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve, by certified mail, Jerry L. Bryant, Brad Johnson, Tiffany Averitte, and any other interested parties, with this Memorandum Adopting Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. This service must be completed by November 12, 2020, and the Court must receive notice of such service prior to entry of a Final Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 11/5/2020. (rpc, )
|
August 29, 2019 |
Filing
361
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING 327 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Court finds no error in the Magistrate Judge'srecommendations, and Plaintiff's Objection is OVERRULED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant Richa rd Schwartz and Associates, P.A.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. # 184 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Foy and Associates, P.C.'s First Amended Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. # 217 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/29/2019. (rpc, )
|
June 18, 2019 |
Filing
276
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING 264 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE granting 263 Motion to Dismiss defendant Daniel McNeil. Franklin D. Azar & Associates, P.C.'s claims against Daniel McNeil are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/18/2019. (rpc, )
|
May 31, 2019 |
Filing
270
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 253 MOTION to Extend Discovery Deadline to Conduct Depositions of Franklin Azar, Individually and as the Corporate Representative of Franklin D. Azar and Associates, P.C., and Lauren McNeil, Individually and as the Corporate Representative of McNeil Consultants LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 5/31/2019. (rpc, )
|
April 22, 2019 |
Filing
243
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING 228 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Therefore, the Agreed Motion (Dkt. # 226 ) is GRANTED. Azar's claims against McNeil Consultants, LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/22/2019. (rpc, )
|
March 30, 2019 |
Filing
229
MEMORANDUM 223 ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Therefore, the Stipulation (Dkt. # 222 ) is GRANTED. Azar's claims against Gruber Law Offices, LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/30/2019. (rpc, )
|
February 19, 2019 |
Filing
210
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING 197 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Therefore, the Stipulation (Dkt. # 194 ) is GRANTED. Azar's claimsagainst The Law Office of Bruce M. White, L.C. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/19/2019. (rpc, )
|
January 12, 2019 |
Filing
181
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING 165 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Because Plaintiff failed to establish that there are no genuine issues of material fact for trial, Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. # 89 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/12/2019. (rpc, )
|
December 4, 2018 |
Filing
169
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING 158 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Because Plaintiff's Amended Complaint states sufficient facts to establish a prima facie showing of the Law Firm Defendants' contacts in Texas, the Motions (Dkts. # 106 , 110 , 125 , 128 ) are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/4/2018. (rpc, )
|
October 20, 2017 |
Filing
49
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, for 38 Motion to Set Aside Default,, filed by Deana Bryant, Exclusive Legal Marketing, Inc., Prime Legal Leads, LLC, Coety Layne Bryant, 41 Report and Reco mmendation. The Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entries of Default as to Defendants, Coety Layne Bryant, Deanna Bryant, Exclusive Legal Marketing, Inc., and Prime Legal Leads, LLC (Dkt.# 38) is GRANTED. The Court orders the Clerk's Entries of Default against Coety Layne Bryant, Deanna Bryant, Exclusive Legal Marketing, Inc., and Prime Legal Leads, LLC (Dkts. # 25, 31 and 35) are hereby VACATED.. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/202017. (kls, )
|