Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System v. Adeptus Health Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System and Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund
Defendant: Evercore Group L.L.C., Sterling Fund Management Holdings GP, LLC, Steven V. Napolitano, Richard Covert, Stephen M. Mengert, Timothy L. Fielding, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Jeffery S. Vender, Dougherty & Company LLC, Sterling Capital Partners III, L.P., Sterling Fund Management, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings, L.P., BMO Capital Markets Corp., SC Partners III, L.P., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, PIPER JAFFRAY & CO., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER Conduit, L.P., Graham B Cherrington, Sterling Partners, Ronald L. Taylor, Adeptus Health Inc., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER, L.P., Sterling Capital Partners III, LLC, Daniel W. Rosenberg, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Thomas S. Hall, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated and Gregory W. Scott
Petitioner: Robert Gibbons, Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund, Jason Rutherford, Ning Tian, Kui Liu, Manchang Tian, Joel Magazine, Stefanie L. Seese, Sohail Sattar, Benjamin Bowman, Adeptus Investor Group, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association and Michigan Laborers Pension Fund
Consolidated Plaintiff: Michael Frick, Yvonne Chen, Victor Sardar, Li-Kuan Chen, Sascha Troll, Winston Kim and Laborers' Local 235 Benefit Funds
Consolidated Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Daniel J. Hosler, Frank R Williams, Jr., Jeffrey S. Vender and RBC Capital Markets LLC
Not Classified By Court: Hon. Layn R Phillips (Ret.)
Case Number: 4:2017cv00449
Filed: October 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Set Hearings: Settlement Hearing set for May 20, 2020, at 11:30 a.m. in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. (daj, )
February 24, 2020 In light of the status of this case, the Final Pretrial Conference, Jury Selection, and Trial of this case are CANCELLED. (tls) Modified on 2/25/2020 (tls).
February 19, 2020 Filing 279 NOTICE by Piper Jaffray & Co. - Notice of Party Name Change and Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement (Behrens, Richard)
January 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER. In light of the Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice (Dkt. #277 ) entered on January 9, 2020, all pending motions in this case are DENIED as MOOT, subject to reinstatement, if necessary. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/12/2020. (baf, )
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/9/2020. (daj, )
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER - GRANTING #274 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/2/2019. (baf, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 275 Unopposed MOTION for an Order Preliminarily Approving Proposed Class Action Settlement by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Richard Russo, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Siebman, Clyde) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/27/2019: #5 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
November 26, 2019 Filing 274 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: GRANTING #272 Joint Motion for Leave to Amend Scheduling Order. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2020 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Proposed Jury instructions/Form of Verdict due by 3/27/2020. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 4/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, or other dispositive motions due by 11/22/2019. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 3/13/2020. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/16/2019. (baf, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 272 Joint MOTION for Leave to Amend Scheduling Order re #192 Scheduling Order,, by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Graham B Cherrington, Daniel W. Rosenberg, Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, SC Partners III, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER Conduit, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER, L.P., Stephen M. Mengert, Sterling Partners, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Proposed Order)(Behrens, Richard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/12/2019) (baf, ).
August 5, 2019 Filing 271 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Eamonn W. Campbell on behalf of SC Partners III, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER Conduit, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER, L.P., Sterling Capital Partners III, L.P., Sterling Capital Partners III, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings GP, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings, L.P., Sterling Fund Management, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7378432. (Campbell, Eamonn)
August 1, 2019 Filing 270 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Behrens, Richard)
July 25, 2019 Filing 269 RESPONSE to #267 Notice (Other),, filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Siebman, Clyde)
July 24, 2019 Filing 268 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by S. Mark Hurd on behalf of Graham B Cherrington, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7362031. (Hurd, S.)
July 19, 2019 Filing 267 NOTICE by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Daniel W. Rosenberg, Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano - Underwriter and Director Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Motion to Dismiss Time-Barred New Claims in Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Authority)(Behrens, Richard)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER - DENYING AS MOOT #181 Motion to Enter a Discovery Coordination Order. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/30/2019. (baf, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 265 STIPULATION Concerning Coordinated Discovery by Richard Covert, Gregory W. Scott, Daniel J. Hosler, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano, Daniel W. Rosenberg, Ronald L. Taylor, Jeffrey S. Vender, Frank R Williams, Jr. (Sterling, David)
May 10, 2019 Filing 264 REDACTION to #262 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion,,, by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Richard Russo, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 9, 2019 Filing 263 REPORT of Mediation by Layn R Phillips (Ret.). Mediation result: IMPASSE(baf, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 262 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #229 SEALED MOTION - Underwriter and Director Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Time-Barred New Claims in Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Brief in Support, #227 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Brief In Support, #224 SEALED MOTION Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Richard Russo, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER - GRANTING #254 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Defendants are permitted to file sur-reply briefs not to exceed a combined 35 pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/8/2019. (baf, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 260 REDACTION to #255 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion,, by Graham B Cherrington, SC Partners III, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER Conduit, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER, L.P., Sterling Capital Partners III, L.P., Sterling Capital Partners III, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings GP, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings, L.P., Sterling Fund Management, LLC, Sterling Partners, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Bessette, Paul)
May 6, 2019 Filing 259 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #180 SEALED MOTION For Class Certification, Appointment Of Class Representatives, And Appointment Of Counsel (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Daniel W. Rosenberg, Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano . (Behrens, Richard)
May 3, 2019 Filing 258 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #180 SEALED MOTION For Class Certification, Appointment Of Class Representatives, And Appointment Of Counsel filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Daniel W. Rosenberg, Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano. (Behrens, Richard)
May 3, 2019 Filing 257 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #256 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 51)(Biles, Michael)
May 3, 2019 Filing 256 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #180 SEALED MOTION For Class Certification, Appointment Of Class Representatives, And Appointment Of Counsel filed by Graham B Cherrington, SC Partners III, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER Conduit, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER, L.P., Sterling Capital Partners III, L.P., Sterling Capital Partners III, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings GP, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings, L.P., Sterling Fund Management, LLC, Sterling Partners, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding . (Biles, Michael)
May 3, 2019 Filing 255 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #180 SEALED MOTION For Class Certification, Appointment Of Class Representatives, And Appointment Of Counsel filed by Graham B Cherrington, SC Partners III, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER Conduit, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER, L.P., Sterling Capital Partners III, L.P., Sterling Capital Partners III, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings GP, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings, L.P., Sterling Fund Management, LLC, Sterling Partners, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Bessette, Paul)
May 3, 2019 Filing 254 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Graham B Cherrington, Daniel W. Rosenberg, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Sterling Partners, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bessette, Paul)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER - GRANTING #252 Motion for Extension of Time and Leave to File Omnibus Sur-reply in response to Defendants' pending motions to dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiffs are permitted to file an omnibus opposition brief not to exceed 20 pages by May 8, 2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/30/2019. (baf, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 252 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Omnibus Sur-Reply by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 26, 2019 Filing 251 REDACTION to #246 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion by Graham B Cherrington, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Bessette, Paul)
April 26, 2019 Filing 250 REPLY to Response to Motion re #229 SEALED MOTION - Underwriter and Director Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Time-Barred New Claims in Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Brief in Support (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Daniel W. Rosenberg, Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano . (Behrens, Richard)
April 26, 2019 Filing 249 REDACTION to #247 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,, The Sterling Defendants' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Sterling Capital Partners III, L.P., Sterling Capital Partners III, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings GP, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings, L.P., Sterling Fund Management, LLC, Sterling Partners, Sterling Partners. (Acker, Charles)
April 24, 2019 Filing 248 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #229 SEALED MOTION - Underwriter and Director Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Time-Barred New Claims in Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Brief in Support filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Daniel W. Rosenberg, Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano. (Behrens, Richard)
April 24, 2019 Filing 247 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #227 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Brief In Support filed by Sterling Capital Partners III, L.P., Sterling Capital Partners III, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings GP, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings, L.P., Sterling Fund Management, LLC, Sterling Partners. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Piccirillo Declaration, #2 Exhibit 21- July 2015 Prospectus, #3 Exhibit 22-DIRECTORS_Ron_Taylor_00005206_image, #4 Exhibit 23-ST-AD_00043642)(Acker, Charles)
April 24, 2019 Filing 246 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #224 SEALED MOTION Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Graham B Cherrington, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Bessette, Paul)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER - granting #243 Motion for Extension of Time to File ReplIES re #229 SEALED MOTION - Underwriter and Director Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Time-Barred New Claims in Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Brief in Support, #224 SEALED MOTION Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, #227 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Brief In Support. Replies due by 4/24/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/12/2019. (baf, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 244 REDACTION to #242 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 11, 2019 Filing 243 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #242 Sealed Response to Motion,,, by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Graham B Cherrington, Daniel W. Rosenberg, Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, SC Partners III, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER Conduit, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER, L.P., Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding, Jeffrey S. Vender. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sessions, Ellen)
April 9, 2019 Filing 242 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #229 SEALED MOTION - Underwriter and Director Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Time-Barred New Claims in Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Brief in Support, #227 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Brief In Support, #224 SEALED MOTION Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Richard Russo, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 3, 2019 Filing 241 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Lynn K. Neuner on behalf of SC Partners III, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER Conduit, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER, L.P., Sterling Capital Partners III, L.P., Sterling Capital Partners III, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings GP, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings, L.P., Sterling Fund Management, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7209652. (Neuner, Lynn)
March 26, 2019 Filing 240 REDACTION to #238 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document,,, #237 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Abe Alexander, #2 Exhibit N-YY)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER - GRANTING #236 Motion for Leave to File Omnibus Reply Brief. The Reply Brief shall not exceed 50 pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/24/2019. (baf, )
March 23, 2019 Filing 238 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #237 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, Declaration of Abe Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N, #2 Exhibit O, #3 Exhibit P, #4 Exhibit Q, Part 1, #5 Exhibit Q, Part 2, #6 Exhibit Q, Part 3, #7 Exhibit R, #8 Exhibit S, #9 Exhibit T, #10 Exhibit U, #11 Exhibit V, Part 1, #12 Exhibit V, Part 2, #13 Exhibit V, Part 3, #14 Exhibit V, Part 4, #15 Exhibit W, #16 Exhibit X, #17 Exhibit Y, #18 Exhibit Z, #19 Exhibit AA, #20 Exhibit BB, #21 Exhibit CC, #22 Exhibit DD, #23 Exhibit EE, #24 Exhibit FF, #25 Exhibit GG, #26 Exhibit HH, #27 Exhibit II, #28 Exhibit JJ, #29 Exhibit KK, #30 Exhibit LL, #31 Exhibit MM, #32 Exhibit NN, #33 Exhibit OO, #34 Exhibit PP, #35 Exhibit QQ, #36 Exhibit RR, #37 Exhibit SS, #38 Exhibit TT, #39 Exhibit UU, #40 Exhibit VV, #41 Exhibit WW, #42 Exhibit XX, #43 Exhibit YY)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 22, 2019 Filing 237 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #180 SEALED MOTION For Class Certification, Appointment Of Class Representatives, And Appointment Of Counsel filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Siebman, Clyde)
March 22, 2019 Filing 236 Unopposed MOTION For Leave To File Omnibus Reply by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. The Court hereby ORDERS that this case be submitted to mediation in accordance with this court's Mediation Plan. By agreement of the parties, the mediator assigned is The Honorable Layn R. Phillips (Ret.). Mediation Completion due by 4/30/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/21/2019. (baf, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 234 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Honorable Layn R. Phillips (Ret.), filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Graham B Cherrington, Daniel W. Rosenberg, Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, SC Partners III, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER Conduit, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER, L.P., Stephen M. Mengert, Sterling Capital Partners III, L.P., Sterling Capital Partners III, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings GP, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings, L.P., Sterling Fund Management, LLC, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. - Joint Notice of Agreed Mediator (Behrens, Richard)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting #232 Motion for Leave for Extension of Time and Leave to File. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiffs are permitted to file an omnibus opposition brief not to exceed 45 pages by April 9, 2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/19/2019. (rpc, )
March 15, 2019 Filing 232 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Leave to File Omnibus Opposition by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 6, 2019 Filing 231 REDACTION to #224 SEALED MOTION Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Graham B Cherrington, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bessette, Paul)
March 5, 2019 Filing 230 REDACTION to #229 SEALED MOTION - Underwriter and Director Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Time-Barred New Claims in Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Brief in Support by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Daniel W. Rosenberg, Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Behrens, Richard)
March 4, 2019 Filing 229 SEALED MOTION - Underwriter and Director Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Time-Barred New Claims in Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Brief in Support by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Daniel W. Rosenberg, Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Behrens, Richard)
March 4, 2019 Filing 228 REDACTION to #227 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Brief In Support by SC Partners III, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER Conduit, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER, L.P., Sterling Capital Partners III, L.P., Sterling Capital Partners III, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings GP, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings, L.P., Sterling Fund Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acker, Charles)
March 4, 2019 Filing 227 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Brief In Support by SC Partners III, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER Conduit, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER, L.P., Sterling Capital Partners III, L.P., Sterling Capital Partners III, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings GP, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings, L.P., Sterling Fund Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acker, Charles)
March 4, 2019 Filing 226 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #225 Affidavit in Support of Motion,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 - 2015-01-22 Email (MPI000391), #2 Exhibit 17 - 2015-06-04 Email (ADPT_00165173), #3 Exhibit 18 - 2015-08-12 Email (MPI000330), #4 Exhibit 19 - 2015-11-18 Email (MPI000572), #5 Exhibit 20 - Redline Comparison of Complaints)(Biles, Michael)
March 4, 2019 Filing 225 AFFIDAVID IN SUPPORT re #224 SEALED MOTION Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Graham B Cherrington, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2014-06-12 Adeptus S-1 Reg Stmt, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2014-06-25 Adeptus 424B4 Prospectus, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2014-06-25 Registration Rights Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2014-06-25 Stockholders Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2015-02-27 Adeptus 10-K (FY 2014), #6 Exhibit 6 - 2015-04-23 Adeptus Earnings Call Transcript (1Q15), #7 Exhibit 7 - 2015-05-07 Adeptus 424B4 Prospectus, #8 Exhibit 8 - 2015-07-31 Adeptus 10-Q (2Q15), #9 Exhibit 9 - 2015-07-31 Adeptus 424B5 Prospectus, #10 Exhibit 10 - 2016-02-29 Adeptus 10-K (FY2015), #11 Exhibit 11 - 2016-06-03 Adeptus 424B5 Prospectus, #12 Exhibit 12 - Cherrington Insider Sales Forms, #13 Exhibit 13 - Fielding Insider Sales Forms, #14 Exhibit 14 - Hall Insider Sales Forms)(Biles, Michael)
March 4, 2019 Filing 224 SEALED MOTION Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Graham B Cherrington, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bessette, Paul)
February 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER - GRANTING #200 Sealed Motion. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/16/2019. (baf, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 222 REPLY to Response to Motion re #200 SEALED MOTION For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Siebman, Clyde)
February 14, 2019 Filing 221 RESPONSE to Motion re #200 SEALED MOTION For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Graham B Cherrington, Daniel W. Rosenberg, Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, SC Partners III, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER Conduit, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER, L.P., Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding . (Acker, Charles)
February 14, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. BY ATTORNEY (PER PHONE CALL) Document # 220, RESPONSE. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 220 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR***RESPONSE to Motion re #200 SEALED MOTION For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint filed by SC Partners III, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER Conduit, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER, L.P.. (Acker, Charles) Modified on 2/14/2019 (baf, ).
February 11, 2019 Filing 219 REDACTION to #216 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document,,, by Graham B Cherrington, SC Partners III, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER Conduit, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER, L.P., Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 38 12/21/18 Plaintiff Rog Responses, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 47 02/08/19 Jack Weiner Report, #3 Exhibit 49 02/08/19 Kenneth Lehn Report)(Biles, Michael)
February 11, 2019 Filing 218 REDACTION to #206 Sealed Response to Motion,, by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Daniel W. Rosenberg, Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Behrens, Richard)
February 11, 2019 Filing 217 REDACTION to #205 Sealed Response to Motion, by Graham B Cherrington, SC Partners III, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER Conduit, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER, L.P., Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Biles, Michael)
February 11, 2019 Filing 216 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #213 Affidavit in Support of Motion,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 36 Miami Stock Trading Records, #2 Exhibit 37 ACERA Stock Trading Records, #3 Exhibit 38 12/21/18 Plaintiff Rog Responses, #4 Exhibit 39 01/16/19 Robert Scott Depo, #5 Exhibit 40 01/16/19 Scott Depo Ex. 4, #6 Exhibit 41 01/17/19 Rod Graves Depo, #7 Exhibit 42 01/18/19 Charles Nichols Depo, #8 Exhibit 43 01/23/19 Ryan Dunnegan Depo, #9 Exhibit 44 01/28/19 Kai Hong Depo, #10 Exhibit 45 01/29/19 Thomas Taylor Depo, #11 Exhibit 46 01/31/19 Andrew McGarrell Depo, #12 Exhibit 47 02/08/19 Jack Weiner Report, #13 Exhibit 48 02/08/19 Nicholas Smith Decl. & Exs., #14 Exhibit 49 02/08/19 Kenneth Lehn Report)(Biles, Michael)
February 11, 2019 Filing 215 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #213 Affidavit in Support of Motion,,,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26 04/20/16 ADPT Earnings Call Transcript, #2 Exhibit 27 07/21/16 ADPT Earnings Call Transcript, #3 Exhibit 28 07/22/16 Avondale Partners Report, #4 Exhibit 29 07/22/16 Stephens Report, #5 Exhibit 30 07/29/16 Ex. 10.2 FTH DFW Op Agreement, #6 Exhibit 31 11/01/16 ADPT Earnings Call Transcript, #7 Exhibit 32 11/03/16 Avondale Partners Report, #8 Exhibit 33 06/28/18 Special Masters Report, #9 Exhibit 34 10/01/18 Associated Press Article)(Biles, Michael)
February 11, 2019 Filing 214 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #213 Affidavit in Support of Motion,,,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13 04/21/15 Deutsche Bank Report, #2 Exhibit 14 04/21/15 Denver Bus Journal Article, #3 Exhibit 15 04/22/15 Dougherty & Co Report, #4 Exhibit 16 05/05/15 Adeptus Prospectus Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 17 06/10/15 KeyBanc Report, #6 Exhibit 18 08/13/15 Ex. 10.4 UCHealth Op Agreement, #7 Exhibit 19 09/29/15 Seeking Alpha Article, #8 Exhibit 20 11/10/15 Stephens Fall Inv Conf Transcript, #9 Exhibit 21 11/18/15 Jeffries Report, #10 Exhibit 22 11/18/15 RBC Report, #11 Exhibit 23 12/01/15 ADPT Piper Jaffray Presentation, #12 Exhibit 24 02/24/16 ADPT Earnings Call Transcript)(Biles, Michael)
February 11, 2019 Filing 213 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #180 SEALED MOTION For Class Certification, Appointment Of Class Representatives, And Appointment Of Counsel filed by Graham B Cherrington, SC Partners III, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER Conduit, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER, L.P., Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 2011 CDC Survey Factsheet, #2 Exhibit 2 04/01/13 Bloomberg Article, #3 Exhibit 3 07/14/13 USA Today Article, #4 Exhibit 4 06/24/14 Adeptus Prospectus Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 5 07/21/14 Piper Jaffray Report, #6 Exhibit 6 08/09/14 Fort Worth Star Telegram Article, #7 Exhibit 10/01/14 RBC Capital Markets Report, #8 Exhibit 8 11/03/14 Gazette.com Article, #9 Exhibit 9 12/11/14 JMP Securities Report, #10 Exhibit 10 12/11/14 Piper Jaffray Report, #11 Exhibit 11 02/27/15 Adeptus 2014 10-K Excerpts)(Biles, Michael)
February 11, 2019 Counsel are reminded that the Court has not opted out of this court's Local Rules concerning courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of pleadings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzant's chambers. Please use tabs and dividers for exhibits. (tls)
February 11, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the AFFIDAVIT submitted DOCUMENT #207 , #208 , #209 , AND #210 - DOCUMENT IS NOT SIGNED BY AN ATTORNEY OF RECORD. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER - GRANTING #204 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/11/2019. (baf, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 211 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #205 Sealed Response to Motion,.. (Bessette, Paul)
February 8, 2019 Filing 210 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #207 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 36 Miami Stock Trading Records, #2 Exhibit 37 ACERA Stock Trading Records, #3 Exhibit 38 12/21/18 Plaintiff Rog Responses, #4 Exhibit 39 01/16/19 Robert Scott Depo, #5 Exhibit 40 01/16/19 Scott Depo Ex. 4, #6 Exhibit. 41 01/17/19 Rod Graves Depo, #7 Exhibit 42 01/18/19 Charles Nichols Depo, #8 Exhibit 43 01/23/19 Ryan Dunnegan Depo, #9 Exhibit 44 01/28/19 Kai Hong Depo, #10 Exhibit 45 01/29/19 Thomas Taylor Depo, #11 Exhibit 46 01/31/19 Andrew McGarrell Depo, #12 Exhibit 47 02/08/19 Jack Weiner Report, #13 Exhibit 48 02/08/19 Nicholas Smith Decl. & Exs., #14 Exhibit 49 02/08/19 Kenneth Lehn Report)(Bessette, Paul) Modified on 2/11/2019 (baf, ).
February 8, 2019 Filing 209 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #207 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,,,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26 04/20/16 ADPT Earnings Call Transcript, #2 Exhibit 27 07/21/16 ADPT Earnings Call Transcript, #3 Exhibit 28 07/22/16 Avondale Partners Report, #4 Exhibit 29 07/22/16 Stephens Report, #5 Exhibit 30 07/29/16 Ex. 10.2 FTH DFW Op Agreement, #6 Exhibit 31 11/01/16 ADPT Earnings Call Transcript, #7 Exhibit 32 11/03/16 Avondale Partners Report, #8 Exhibit 33 06/28/18 Special Masters Report, #9 Exhibit 34 10/01/18 Associated Press Article)(Bessette, Paul) Modified on 2/11/2019 (baf, ).
February 8, 2019 Filing 208 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #207 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,,,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13 04/21/15 Deutsche Bank Report, #2 Exhibit 14 04/21/15 Denver Bus Journal Article, #3 Exhibit 15 04/22/15 Dougherty & Co Report, #4 Exhibit 16 05/05/15 Adeptus Prospectus Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 17 06/10/15 KeyBanc Report, #6 Exhibit 18 08/13/15 Ex. 10.4 UCHealth Op Agreement, #7 Exhibit 19 09/29/15 Seeking Alpha Article, #8 Exhibit 20 11/10/15 Stephens Fall Inv Conf Transcript, #9 Exhibit 21 11/18/15 Jeffries Report, #10 Exhibit 22 11/18/15 RBC Report, #11 Exhibit 23 12/01/15 ADPT Piper Jaffray Presentation, #12 Exhibit 24 02/24/16 ADPT Earnings Call Transcript)(Bessette, Paul) Modified on 2/11/2019 (baf, ).
February 8, 2019 Filing 207 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #180 SEALED MOTION For Class Certification, Appointment Of Class Representatives, And Appointment Of Counsel filed by Graham B Cherrington, SC Partners III, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER Conduit, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER, L.P., Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 2011 CDC Survey Factsheet, #2 Exhibit. 2 04/01/13 Bloomberg Article, #3 Exhibit 3 07/14/13 USA Today Article, #4 Exhibit 4 06/24/14 Adeptus Prospectus Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 5 07/21/14 Piper Jaffray Report, #6 Exhibit 6 08/09/14 Fort Worth Star Telegram Article, #7 Exhibit 7 10/01/14 RBC Capital Markets Report, #8 Exhibit 8 11/03/14 Gazette.com Article, #9 Exhibit 9 12/11/14 JMP Securities Report, #10 Exhibit 10 12/11/14 Piper Jaffray Report, #11 Exhibit 11 02/27/15 Adeptus 2014 10-K Excerpts)(Bessette, Paul) Modified on 2/11/2019 (baf, ).
February 8, 2019 Filing 206 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #180 SEALED MOTION For Class Certification, Appointment Of Class Representatives, And Appointment Of Counsel filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Daniel W. Rosenberg, Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Behrens, Richard)
February 8, 2019 Filing 205 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #180 SEALED MOTION For Class Certification, Appointment Of Class Representatives, And Appointment Of Counsel filed by Graham B Cherrington, SC Partners III, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER Conduit, L.P., SCP III AIV THREE-FCER, L.P., Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Bessette, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
February 8, 2019 Filing 204 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Oppositions to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Graham B Cherrington, Daniel W. Rosenberg, Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Sterling Capital Partners III, L.P., Sterling Capital Partners III, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings GP, LLC, Sterling Fund Management Holdings, L.P., Sterling Fund Management, LLC, Sterling Partners, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bessette, Paul)
February 4, 2019 Filing 203 REDACTION to #202 Redacted Document, by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Siebman, Clyde)
February 4, 2019 Filing 202 REDACTION to #200 SEALED MOTION For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
January 31, 2019 Filing 201 Sealed Document. Second Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Siebman, Clyde)
January 31, 2019 Filing 200 SEALED MOTION For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
January 18, 2019 Filing 199 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Telephone Conference held on December 20, 2018 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-209-4013. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (35 pages) Motion to Redact due 2/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/18/2019. (jm, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 198 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joshua Slocum on behalf of Sterling Partners. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7094219. (Slocum, Joshua)
January 11, 2019 Filing 197 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Scheduling Conference held on January 3, 2019 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-209-4013. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (30 pages) Motion to Redact due 2/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2019. (jm, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 196 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ellen Bush Sessions on behalf of Sterling Partners (Sessions, Ellen)
January 10, 2019 Filing 195 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Heather G. Diles on behalf of Sterling Partners. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7091673. (Diles, Heather)
January 7, 2019 Filing 194 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Stuart L Berman on behalf of Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7085908. (Berman, Stuart)
January 7, 2019 Filing 193 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Justin O. Reliford on behalf of Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7085868. (Reliford, Justin)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2020 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2019. Discovery due by 7/24/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2019. Proposed Jury instructions/Form of Verdict due by 3/27/2020. Mediation Completion due by 4/30/2019. Designation of Mediator due by 3/19/2019. Motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, or other dispositive motions due by 11/22/2019. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 3/13/2020. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/4/2019. (baf, )
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 STIPULATION AND AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/3/2019. (baf, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 190 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Scheduling Conference held on 1/3/2019. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (kkc, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 189 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
January 2, 2019 Filing 188 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #181 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Discovery Coordination Order filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Siebman, Clyde)
December 28, 2018 Filing 187 REPLY to Response to Motion re #181 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Discovery Coordination Order filed by Graham B Cherrington, Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Sterling Partners, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Matsumura, Rebecca)
December 21, 2018 Filing 186 RESPONSE in Opposition re #181 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Discovery Coordination Order filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Richard A. Russo, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
December 21, 2018 Filing 185 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY***RESPONSE in Opposition re #181 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Discovery Coordination Order filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Richard A. Russo, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) Modified on 12/26/2018 (daj, ).
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER. The Court orders that the Underwriter Defendants listed below shall search the custodial files of the additional custodians identified below and produce the relevant documents elicited by those searches: i. Goldman Sachs: Lyla Bibi; Jack Bannister; and Celene Menschel; ii. Merrill Lynch: Jim Cooney; Brian McCarthy; Tucker Sampson; and Monica Brandes; iii. Evercore: Ted Omlid; Jim Birle; Jeff Rosichan; Jordan Webb; Gloria Tang; Lee Fan; and Andrew Isaacs; iv. Piper Jaffray: Emily Wildes; David Stadinski; Neil Riley; Chris Christina; Pam Nightingale; and Nick Cooper; v. BMO: Rogert Gjerlow; Philip Pucciarelli; Eric Oppenheimer; and Steven Tuch. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/20/2018. (baf, )
December 20, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference held on 12/20/2018 at 9:01 a.m. Court orally grants Plaintiffs request as to additional custodians. A formal order will follow. Call adjourned at 9:50 a.m. (Court Reporter Digital Recording.) (kkc, )
December 18, 2018 **RESCHEDULED** Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 12/20/2018 at 9:00 a.m. before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 8:55 a.m.: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (kc)
December 17, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference to address a discovery dispute set for 12/21/2018 at 9:00 a.m. before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 8:55 a.m.: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (kc)
December 11, 2018 Filing 183 RESPONSE to Objections to Subpoena from Alameda County, Employees' Retirement Association and Arkansas Teacher Retirement System by Texas Health Resources. (Blaies, Grant)
December 10, 2018 Filing 182 REDACTION to #180 SEALED MOTION For Class Certification, Appointment Of Class Representatives, And Appointment Of Counsel by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Richard A. Russo, Jr., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
December 10, 2018 Filing 181 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Discovery Coordination Order by Graham B Cherrington, Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Sterling Partners, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bessette, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2018: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
December 7, 2018 Filing 180 SEALED MOTION For Class Certification, Appointment Of Class Representatives, And Appointment Of Counsel by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Richard A. Russo, Jr., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER. The Court feels it would be beneficial to hold a Scheduling Conference in this case, and sets the conference for Thursday, 1/3/2019 at 2:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/5/2018. (baf, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 178 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Piper Jaffray & Co. identifying Corporate Parent Piper Jaffray Companies for Piper Jaffray & Co.. (Behrens, Richard)
November 16, 2018 Filing 177 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Behrens, Richard)
November 16, 2018 Filing 176 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co. identifying Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Behrens, Richard)
November 16, 2018 Filing 175 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Evercore Group L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Evercore Inc. for Evercore Group L.L.C.. (Behrens, Richard)
November 16, 2018 Filing 174 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dougherty & Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dougherty Financial Group LLC for Dougherty & Company LLC. (Behrens, Richard)
November 16, 2018 Filing 173 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of Montreal for BMO Capital Markets Corp.. (Behrens, Richard)
November 15, 2018 Filing 172 ANSWER to #149 Amended Complaint,,, by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co..(Behrens, Richard)
November 15, 2018 Filing 171 The Sterling Defendants' ANSWER to #149 Amended Complaint,,, by Sterling Partners.(Acker, Charles)
November 15, 2018 Filing 170 ANSWER to #149 Amended Complaint,,, by Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano.(Sterling, David)
November 15, 2018 Filing 169 ANSWER to #149 Amended Complaint,,, by Graham B Cherrington, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding.(Bessette, Paul)
October 29, 2018 Filing 168 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Graham B Cherrington, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding (Bessette, Paul)
October 29, 2018 Filing 167 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund (Siebman, Clyde)
October 26, 2018 Filing 166 NOTICE by Sterling Partners of Filing of Disclosures (Acker, Charles)
October 26, 2018 Filing 165 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co. - Underwriter Defendants' Notice of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) (Behrens, Richard)
October 26, 2018 Filing 164 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sterling Partners (Acker, Charles)
October 26, 2018 Filing 163 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joseph A Bruno on behalf of Sterling Partners, Sterling Partners. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7000158. (Bruno, Joseph)
October 23, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference held on 10/23/2018. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (kkc, )
October 23, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the NOTICE submitted DOCUMENT #162 - DOCUMENT IS A LETTER - LETTERS ARE NOT FILED OF RECORD IN OUR COURT. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 162 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE***NOTICE by Graham B Cherrington, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding Letter re Discovery Hearing (Bessette, Paul) Modified on 10/23/2018 (baf, ).
October 22, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference to address a discovery dispute set for 10/23/2018 02:00 PM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number no later than 1:55 pm: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (tls)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/22/2018. (baf, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 160 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
October 18, 2018 Filing 159 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Siebman, Clyde)
October 17, 2018 Filing 158 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michelle M. Newcomer on behalf of Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6986810. (Newcomer, Michelle)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #153 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Sterling Defendants' deadline to file an answer to the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint is extended until November 15, 2018. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/10/2018. (rpc, )
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #152 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Executive Defendants' deadline to file an answer to the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint is extended until November 15, 2018. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/10/2018. (rpc, )
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #151 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Director Defendants' deadline to file an answer to the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint is extended until November 15, 2018. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/10/2018. (rpc, )
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting #150 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Underwriter Defendants' deadline to file an answer to the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint is extended until November 15, 2018. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/10/2018. (rpc, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 153 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Sterling Partners, Sterling Partners. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acker, Charles)
October 9, 2018 Filing 152 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #149 Amended Complaint,,, by Graham B Cherrington, Timothy L. Fielding, Thomas S. Hall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bessette, Paul)
October 8, 2018 Filing 151 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Richard Covert, Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott, Daniel J. Hosler, Jeffery S. Vender, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott(Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sterling, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 150 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Behrens, Richard)
September 25, 2018 Filing 149 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BMO Capital Markets Corp., Graham B Cherrington, Richard Covert, Daniel W. Rosenberg, Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Timothy L. Fielding, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Thomas S. Hall, Stephen M. Mengert, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Steven V. Napolitano, Piper Jaffray & Co., Gregory W. Scott(Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Sterling Partners, Ronald L. Taylor, Jeffrey S. Vender, filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Siebman, Clyde)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. ORDERED that the Executive Defendants' #119 Motion to Dismiss is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, the Underwriter Defendants' #121 Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, the Director Defendants' #123 Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. ORDERED that Sterling's #120 Motion to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint is hereby DENIED and Defendants' #147 Motion for Oral Argument on Motions to Dismiss is hereby DENIED as moot. The Named Plaintiffs shall have fourteen days from entry of this Order to submit an amended complaint in compliance with this Order. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/12/2018. (daj, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 147 MOTION for Hearing - Defendants' Motion for Oral Argument on Motions to Dismiss by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Graham B Cherrington, Richard Covert, Daniel W. Rosenberg, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Timothy L. Fielding, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Thomas S. Hall, Stephen M. Mengert, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Steven V. Napolitano, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Gregory W. Scott(Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Sterling Partners, Ronald L. Taylor, Jeffrey S. Vender. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Behrens, Richard)
June 27, 2018 Filing 146 RESPONSE to #145 Notice (Other), (UW Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Supreme Court Authority) filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Siebman, Clyde)
June 21, 2018 Filing 145 NOTICE by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC Notice of Supplemental Supreme Court Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Supreme Court decision in China Agritech, Inc. v. Resh)(Behrens, Richard)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER - GRANTING #142 Motion for Leave to File Omnibus Sur-Reply. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiffs are permitted to file an omnibus sur-reply brief not to exceed 40 pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/18/2018. (baf, )
June 15, 2018 Filing 143 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #120 MOTION to Dismiss , #121 MOTION to Dismiss , #119 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Russo, #2 Exhibit 4- Page 9 and cover page Adeptus Bankruptcy Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibit 5- 2015-03-12 Adeptus Health Inc at Barclays Healthcare)(Siebman, Clyde)
June 15, 2018 Filing 142 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Omnibus Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER - GRANTING #140 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/25/2018. (baf, )
May 24, 2018 Filing 140 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER - GRANTING #132 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit on Replies to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/22/2018. (baf, )
May 21, 2018 Filing 138 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #119 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Graham B Cherrington, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2018-03-01 Global Brokerage Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit Nov 2016 ADPT Investors Presentation)(Bessette, Paul)
May 21, 2018 Filing 137 REPLY to Response to Motion re #123 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott, Daniel J. Hosler, Jeffery S. Vender, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano . (Sterling, David)
May 21, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT submitted DOCUMENT #136 - DOCUMENT DOES NOT HAVE A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
May 21, 2018 Filing 136 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE***AFFIDAVIT in Support re #119 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Graham B Cherrington, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2018-03-01 Global Brokerage Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit Nov 2016 ADPT Investors Presentation)(Bessette, Paul) Modified on 5/21/2018 (baf, ).
May 21, 2018 Filing 135 REPLY to Response to Motion re #119 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Graham B Cherrington, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding . (Bessette, Paul)
May 21, 2018 Filing 134 REPLY to Response to Motion re #120 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Sterling Partners . (Acker, Charles)
May 21, 2018 Filing 133 REPLY to Response to Motion re #121 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Behrens, Richard)
May 21, 2018 Filing 132 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Graham B Cherrington, Daniel W. Rosenberg, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bessette, Paul)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER - GRANTING #129 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/11/2018. (baf, )
April 6, 2018 Filing 130 RESPONSE in Opposition re #120 MOTION to Dismiss , #119 MOTION to Dismiss , #123 MOTION to Dismiss , #121 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Richard A. Russo, Jr., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 6, 2018 Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER - GRANTING #127 Unopposed MOTION to Continue April 9, 2018 Initial Conference and other deadlines in #126 Order Governing Proceedings filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Sterling Partners, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Ronald L. Taylor, Jeffery S. Vender, Gregory W. Scott, Piper Jaffray & Co., Adeptus Health Inc., Steven V. Napolitano, Evercore Group L.L.C., Richard Covert, Stephen M. Mengert, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding, Graham B Cherrington, Daniel W. Rosenberg, Dougherty & Company LLC. It is further ORDERED that the deadlines set out in the Court's February 7, 2018 Order Governing Proceedings (Dkt. #126), be adjourned until promptly after the resolution of the pending motions to dismiss in this matter. The April 9, 2018 Scheduling Conference is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/27/2018. (baf, )
February 20, 2018 Filing 127 Unopposed MOTION to Continue April 9, 2018 Initial Conference and other deadlines in #126 Order Governing Proceedings by Adeptus Health Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., Graham B Cherrington, Daniel W. Rosenberg, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Sterling Partners, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bessette, Paul)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS - Rule 16 Management Conference set for 4/9/2018 at 2:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 3/14/2018. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/7/2018. (baf, )
February 5, 2018 Filing 125 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #122 Affidavit in Support of Motion,,,,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2016-11-09 Adeptus 10-Q (3Q16), #2 Exhibit 2016-11-09 Hall Form 4, #3 Exhibit 2017-03-02 Adeptus Form 12b-25, #4 Exhibit 2017-04-19 Bankr Disclosure Statement, #5 Exhibit 2017-04-19 Bankr Hinkelman Declaration, #6 Exhibit Cherrington Insider Sales Chart & Forms, #7 Exhibit Fielding Insider Sales Chart & Forms, #8 Exhibit Hall Insider Sales Chart & Forms, #9 Exhibit Adeptus Risk Factors Chart, #10 Exhibit Adeptus Historical Stock Price Chart)(Biles, Michael)
February 5, 2018 Filing 124 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #122 Affidavit in Support of Motion,,,,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2015-10-30 Adeptus 10-Q (3Q15), #2 Exhibit 2015-11-10 Stephens Fall Investment Conf, #3 Exhibit 2015-11-17 KUSA 9 News Article, #4 Exhibit 2015-11-19 KUSA News Article, #5 Exhibit 2015-12-01 Piper Jaffray 27th Health Care Conf, #6 Exhibit 2016-02-24 Adeptus Earnings Call Transcript (4Q15), #7 Exhibit FY 2015 10-K, #8 Exhibit 2016-04-15 Adeptus DEF 14A Proxy, #9 Exhibit 2016-04-20 Adeptus Earnings Call Transcript (1Q16), #10 Exhibit 2016-04-29 Adeptus 10-Q (1Q16), #11 Exhibit 2016-05-10 BofA-Merrill Lynch 2016 Health Care Conf., #12 Exhibit 2016-05-16 8-K, #13 Exhibit 2016-06-03 Adeptus 424B5 Prospectus, #14 Exhibit 2016-07-21 Adeptus Earnings Call (2Q16), #15 Exhibit Operating Agreement, #16 Exhibit 2016-09-12 Morgan Stanley Global Health Care Conf, #17 Exhibit 2016-11-01 Adeptus Earnings Call Transcript (3Q16))(Biles, Michael)
February 5, 2018 Filing 123 MOTION to Dismiss by Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott, Daniel J. Hosler, Jeffery S. Vender, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sterling, David)
February 5, 2018 Filing 122 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #119 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Graham B Cherrington, Timothy L. Fielding, Thomas S. Hall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2014-06-25 Prospectus, #2 Exhibit 2014-06-25 Stockholders' Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2014-08-08 Adeptus 10-Q (2Q14), #4 Exhibit 2014-10-29 8-K, #5 Exhibit 2014-10-29 Adeptus Earnings Call Transcript (3Q14), #6 Exhibit 2014-11-07 Adeptus 10-Q (3Q14), #7 Exhibit 2015-02-19 Adeptus Earnings Call (4Q14), #8 Exhibit FY 2014 10-K, #9 Exhibit 2015-04-14 Adeptus DEF 14A Proxy, #10 Exhibit 2015-04-21 8-K, #11 Exhibit 2015-04-23 8-K, #12 Exhibit 2015-04-23 Adeptus Earnings Call Transcript (1Q15), #13 Exhibit 2015-04-27 Adeptus S-1, #14 Exhibit 2015-05-01 Adeptus 10-Q (1Q15), #15 Exhibit 2015-05-05 Adeptus 424B4 Prospectus, #16 Exhibit 2015-07-20 Adeptus 424B7 Prospectus, #17 Exhibit 2015-07-23 Adeptus Earnings Call Transcript (2Q15), #18 Exhibit 2015-07-31 Adeptus 10-Q (2Q15), #19 Exhibit 2015-07-29 Adeptus 424B5 Prospectus, #20 Exhibit 2015-08-13 Adeptus 10-QA (2Q15))(Biles, Michael)
February 5, 2018 Filing 121 MOTION to Dismiss by BMO Capital Markets Corp., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Behrens, Richard)
February 5, 2018 Filing 120 MOTION to Dismiss by Sterling Partners. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acker, Charles)
February 5, 2018 Filing 119 MOTION to Dismiss by Graham B Cherrington, Timothy L. Fielding, Thomas S. Hall. (Bessette, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/6/2018: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
February 2, 2018 Filing 118 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Adam J. Goldstein on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6647949. (Goldstein, Adam)
February 2, 2018 Filing 117 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Jason Resetarits on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6647903. (Resetarits, Jeffrey)
February 2, 2018 Filing 116 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Adam Selim Hakki on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Evercore Group L.L.C., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Dougherty & Company LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6647765. (Hakki, Adam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/6/2018: #1 Sealed Attachment) (jmv, ).
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #114 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/1/2018. (kls, )
January 31, 2018 Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Graham B Cherrington, Richard Covert, Timothy L. Fielding, Thomas S. Hall, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano, Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott(Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Jeffrey S. Vender. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bessette, Paul)
January 31, 2018 Filing 113 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Anthony C. Piccirillo on behalf of Sterling Partners, Sterling Partners. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6643404. (Piccirillo, Anthony)
January 31, 2018 Filing 112 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Susannah S. Geltman on behalf of Sterling Partners, Sterling Partners. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6643392. (Geltman, Susannah)
January 30, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Vincent Leito, IV on behalf of Sterling Partners (Leito, James)
January 29, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Rodney Acker on behalf of Sterling Partners (Acker, Charles)
November 22, 2017 Filing 109 SUMMONS Issued as to Graham B Cherrington. (baf, )
November 21, 2017 Filing 108 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Adeptus Health Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., Richard Covert, Daniel W. Rosenberg, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Dougherty & Company LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Timothy L. Fielding, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Thomas S. Hall, Daniel J. Hosler, Jeffery S. Vender, Stephen M. Mengert, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Steven V. Napolitano, PIPER JAFFRAY & CO., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Ronald L. Taylor, Sterling Partners, Graham B Cherrington, filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Siebman, Clyde)
November 20, 2017 Filing 107 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Abraham Alexander on behalf of Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241). Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6560839. (Alexander, Abraham)
November 20, 2017 Filing 106 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy Robinson on behalf of Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241), Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6560835. (Robinson, Jeremy)
November 17, 2017 Filing 105 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Evan R. Hoey on behalf of Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241). Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6558837. (Hoey, Evan)
November 17, 2017 Filing 104 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Megan Koneski on behalf of Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241). Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6558797. (Koneski, Megan)
November 17, 2017 Filing 103 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gregory M Castaldo on behalf of Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241). Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6558739. (Castaldo, Gregory)
November 17, 2017 Filing 102 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Richard A. Russo, Jr on behalf of Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6558671. (Russo, Richard)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER - Upon consideration of Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Dkt. #97 ), and for good cause shown, it is HEREBY ORDERED THAT Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System's claims are dismissed without prejudice to its ability to participate in this consolidated action as an absent class member. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/25/2017. (baf, )
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER - GRANTING #99 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Claire Abernathy Henry; Nathan R Lindell; Tricia L McCormick; Danielle Suzanne Myers; Samuel H Rudman; Thomas John Ward, Jr; Mario Alba, Jr and Andrea Leigh Fair terminated. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/19/2017. (baf, )
October 18, 2017 Filing 99 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Danielle)
October 17, 2017 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL submitted DOCUMENT #98 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
October 16, 2017 Filing 98 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE*** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Danielle) Modified on 10/17/2017 (baf, ).
October 16, 2017 Filing 97 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System (Myers, Danielle) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2017: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER - GRANTING #95 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. It is therefore ORDERED that the deadlines related to filing the amended complaint and deadlines related to filing an answer or motion to dismiss are amended as follows: Amended Compliant November 21, 2017; Answer or Motion to Dismiss February 5, 2018; Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss (if any) April 6, 2018; Reply in further support of Motion to Dismiss May 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/10/2017. (baf, )
October 4, 2017 Filing 95 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
October 3, 2017 Filing 94 NOTICE by Goldman, Sachs & Co. - Notice of Party Name Change (Behrens, Richard)
September 12, 2017 Filing 93 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund for proceedings held on 08/18/2017 Lead Plaintiff Motion before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Myers, Danielle)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - It is therefore ORDERED that the Motion of Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association and Arkansas Teacher Retirement System for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of Selection of Counsel, and Consolidation of Related Actions (Dkt. #19 ) is hereby GRANTED. The Retirement Group's choice of lead counsel and liaison counsel are hereby APPOINTED. Accordingly, Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund's Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and for Approval of its Selection of Lead Counsel (Dkt. #21 , #49 ) and the Motion of Adeptus Investor Group to be Appointed Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel (Dkt. #73 ) are hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/31/2017. (baf, )
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER - Pending before the Court are four motions for appointment of lead counsel (Dkt. #15 , #16 , #18 , #22 ). To the extent Rutherford, the Liu Group, and the Laborers Local Group seek to withdraw their motions for appointment as lead counsel, that request is GRANTED. Further, to the extent, if any, Rutherford, the Liu Group, and the Laborers' Local Group still seek appointment as lead counsel, that request is DENIED. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/31/2017. (baf, )
August 29, 2017 Filing 90 NOTICE by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241) Of Subsequent Developments (Forrest, Elizabeth)
August 29, 2017 Filing 89 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul Richard Bessette (Bessette, Paul)
August 21, 2017 Filing 88 NOTICE by Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel Notice of Subsequent Event (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Aaron's Motion)(Myers, Danielle)
August 18, 2017 Filing 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Motion Hearing held on 8/18/2017 re #73 MOTION To Be Appointed Lead Plainitff and To Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel filed by Adeptus Investor Group. Court withheld ruling at this time (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (dm, )
August 14, 2017 Filing 86 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by George S. Wang on behalf of Sterling Partners, Sterling Partners. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6421922. (Wang, George)
August 11, 2017 Filing 85 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #73 MOTION To Be Appointed Lead Plainitff and To Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel filed by Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund. (Myers, Danielle)
August 11, 2017 Filing 84 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #73 MOTION To Be Appointed Lead Plainitff and To Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241). (Siebman, Clyde)
August 11, 2017 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Danielle Suzanne Myers on behalf of Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6421002. (Myers, Danielle)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #73 MOTION To Be Appointed Lead Plainitff and To Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel : Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2017 at 8:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/10/2017. (baf, )
August 4, 2017 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re #73 MOTION To Be Appointed Lead Plainitff and To Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel filed by Adeptus Investor Group. (Tindel, Andy)
August 4, 2017 Filing 80 Emergency MOTION For An Expedited Status Conference by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
July 28, 2017 Filing 79 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #77 Response in Opposition to Motion.. (McCormick, Tricia)
July 27, 2017 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #73 MOTION To Be Appointed Lead Plainitff and To Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
July 27, 2017 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #73 MOTION To Be Appointed Lead Plainitff and To Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel filed by Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund. (McCormick, Tricia)
July 27, 2017 Filing 76 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Siebman Forrest on behalf of Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241) (Forrest, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2017 Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde Moody Siebman on behalf of Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System(Consolidated Civil Action 6:16cv1391; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv150; Consolidated Civil Action 6:17cv241) (Siebman, Clyde)
July 14, 2017 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy Heard on behalf of Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott, Daniel J. Hosler, Jeffery S. Vender, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano (Heard, Amy)
July 13, 2017 Filing 73 MOTION To Be Appointed Lead Plainitff and To Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel by Adeptus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andy Tindel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER - GRANTING #63 Motion to Substitute Attorney. It is therefore ORDERED that DLA Piper LLP (US), David Clarke, Jr., Xenia Nicole Figueroa, and Sarabeth Hall shall be withdrawn as counsel for Richard Covert, Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott, Ronald L. Taylor, Jeffery S. Vender, Steven V. Napolitano and Stephen M. Mengert and are hereby relieved of all responsibility for the representation in this action. It is further ORDERED that David D. Sterling, John B. Lawrence, Jessica B. Pulliam, Amy Heard and Mysha Lubke of Baker Botts L.L.P. will be entered as counsel for Defendants in the above-captioned matters. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/10/2017. (baf, )
June 27, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mysha Webster Lubke on behalf of Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott, Daniel J. Hosler, Jeffery S. Vender, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano (Lubke, Mysha)
June 27, 2017 Filing 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica B Pulliam on behalf of Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott, Daniel J. Hosler, Jeffery S. Vender, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano (Pulliam, Jessica)
June 26, 2017 Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak no longer assigned to case. (kls, )
June 26, 2017 Case ASSIGNED to Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (baf, )
June 26, 2017 ***Consolidated Civil Actions added: Laborers' Local 235 Benefit Funds v. Adeptus Health Inc (6:16cv1391); Winston Kim v. Adeptus Health Inc, et al (6:17cv150); Sascha Troll et al v. Adeptus Health Inc, et al (6:17cv241). (mll, )
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Change Venue; granting #31 Motion to Take Judicial Notice; granting #39 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Clerk of the Court is directed to consolidate the above-captioned matters under Case No. 6:16-cv-1243 and to transfer the consolidated matter to the Sherman Division for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 06/23/17. (mll, )
June 23, 2017 Filing 68 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund for proceedings held on 06/22/2017 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (Lindell, Nathan)
June 22, 2017 Filing 67 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Status Conference and Motions Hearing held on 6/22/2017 re MOTIONS to Consolidate Cases and MOTIONS to Transfer. (Court Reporter Darlene May) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
June 22, 2017 Filing 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donald (Matt) Mattson Keil on behalf of Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System (Keil, Donald (Matt))
June 21, 2017 Filing 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Benjamin Lawrence on behalf of Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano (Lawrence, John)
June 21, 2017 Filing 64 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Dykeman Sterling on behalf of Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano (Sterling, David)
June 21, 2017 Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sterling, David)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Michael John Biles,Tyler Wayne Highful,Srimath Saliya Subasinghe,Jill Rickershauser Carvalho for Thomas S. Hall and Timothy L. Fielding. Attorney David Clarke, Jr and Xenia Nicole Figueroa terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/21/2017. (rlf)
June 20, 2017 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bessette, Paul)
June 6, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing: TIME CHANGE ONLY: The Status Conference and Motions Hearing is reset for 6/22/2017 at 01:00 PM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (SMC)
June 2, 2017 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Howard Gold on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated (Gold, Daniel)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING #56 MOTION to Continue and RESETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND MOTIONS HEARING. Status Conference and Motions Hearing is re-set for 6/22/2017 10:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/1/2017. (rlf)
May 26, 2017 Filing 58 NOTICE by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Babcock & Wilcox Lead Plaintiff Order)(McWilliams, George)
May 26, 2017 Filing 57 RESPONSE to Motion re #56 MOTION to Continue // Motion to Postpone Hearing Scheduled for June 5, 2017 filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Response to the Individual Defendants' Email, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McWilliams, George)
May 25, 2017 Filing 56 MOTION to Continue // Motion to Postpone Hearing Scheduled for June 5, 2017 by Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Figueroa, Xenia)
May 24, 2017 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #55 MOTION to Continue // Motion to Postpone Hearing Scheduled for June 5, 2017 submitted. There is no Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by within one business day (rlf)
May 23, 2017 Filing 55 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***MOTION to Continue // Motion to Postpone Hearing Scheduled for June 5, 2017 by Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Figueroa, Xenia) Modified on 5/24/2017 (rlf).
May 18, 2017 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael D Blatchley on behalf of Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6298908. (Blatchley, Michael)
May 17, 2017 Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nathan R Lindell on behalf of Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6297990. (Lindell, Nathan)
May 17, 2017 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Tricia L McCormick on behalf of Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6297713. (McCormick, Tricia)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER STAYING CLAIMS AGAINST ADEPTUS. Action shall proceed against the remaining Defendants. Status Conference and Motion Hearing is set for 6/5/2017 01:30 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. The Court will hear arguments with respect to motions to consolidate and to transfer venue. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/11/2017. (rlf)
May 11, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David Clarke, Jr on behalf of Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6288129. (Clarke, David)
May 9, 2017 Filing 49 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samuel H. Rudman in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Rudman Decl. (PSLRA Notice), #3 Exhibit B to Rudman Decl. (Sworn Certification), #4 Exhibit C to Rudman Decl. (Estimate of losses), #5 Exhibit D to Rudman Decl. (Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP firm resume), #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Rudman, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2017: #7 Certificate of Conference) (rlf, ).
May 2, 2017 Filing 48 NOTICE by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System of Related Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - April 27, 2017 Press Release)(McWilliams, George)
April 20, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE by Adeptus Health Inc. Notice of Bankruptcy Filing (Figueroa, Xenia)
April 17, 2017 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. (McWilliams, George)
April 10, 2017 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion re #39 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund. (Rudman, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2017: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rlf, ).
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Added attorney Xenia Nicole Figueroa for Adeptus Health Inc., Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. Attorney James R Nelson terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/7/2017. (rlf)
March 30, 2017 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel by Adeptus Health Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, James)
March 29, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Naumon Amjed on behalf of Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6221781. (Amjed, Naumon)
March 29, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ryan T Degnan on behalf of Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6221770. (Degnan, Ryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2017: #1 Sealed Attachment) (pkb, ).
March 29, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Darren J Check on behalf of Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6221761. (Check, Darren)
March 27, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 McWilliams Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - Notice, #3 Exhibit B - Hom v. Vale, S.A. Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(McWilliams, George)
February 6, 2017 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 MOTION to Change Venue // Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (A) and Brief In Support filed by Adeptus Health Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding . (Nelson, James)
January 31, 2017 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Change Venue // Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (A) and Brief In Support filed by Michigan Laborers Pension Fund, Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt from Goldman Sachs' Form 8-K, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt from Merrill Lynch's Form 13F)(Rudman, Samuel)
January 31, 2017 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re #29 MOTION to Change Venue // Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (A) and Brief In Support filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. (McWilliams, George) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2017: #1 Proposed Order) (rlf, ).
January 26, 2017 Filing 35 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Sur-Reply Declaration of George L. McWilliams, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(McWilliams, George)
January 19, 2017 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of George L. McWilliams, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(McWilliams, George)
January 18, 2017 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Support re #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund. (Rudman, Samuel)
January 18, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Thaddeus Behrens on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated (Behrens, Richard)
January 18, 2017 Filing 31 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice re #29 MOTION to Change Venue // Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (A) and Brief In Support by Adeptus Health Inc., Daniel W. Rosenberg, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Jeffery S. Vender, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Sterling Partners, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, James)
January 18, 2017 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** Document # 30, Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to be refiled by Attorney. (rlf)
January 17, 2017 Filing 30 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DIREGARD. ATTORNEY TO REFILE.***NOTICE by Adeptus Health Inc., Daniel W. Rosenberg, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Stephen M. Mengert, Sterling Partners, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding re #29 MOTION to Change Venue // Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (A) and Brief In Support // Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Defendants' Motion To Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, James) Modified on 1/18/2017 (rlf).
January 17, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION to Change Venue // Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (A) and Brief In Support by Adeptus Health Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Sterling Partners, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, James)
January 13, 2017 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel, #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel, and Memorandum of Law in Support, #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel, #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Jason Rutherford. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thames, Earl)
January 11, 2017 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel, #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel, and Memorandum of Law in Support, #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel, #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Approve Selection of Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel , #22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samuel H. Rudman in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit 1 to Rudman Opp. Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Rudman Opp. Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Rudman Opp. Decl., #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Rudman, Samuel)
January 11, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE by Robert Gibbons, Kui Liu, Joel Magazine, Sohail Sattar NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION BY KUI LIU, ROBERT GIBBONS, JOEL MAGAZINE AND SOHAIL SATTAR TO COMPETING MOTIONS FOR CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED CASES, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL (Kendall, Elton)
January 10, 2017 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel, and Memorandum of Law in Support, #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel, #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Approve Selection of Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel and in Further Support of the Motion of Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association and Arkansas Teacher Retirement System for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of Selection of Counsel, and Consolidation of Related Actions filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. (McWilliams, George) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2017: #1 Proposed Order) (rlf, ).
January 10, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE by Laborers' Local 235 Benefit Funds, Stefanie L. Seese, Manchang Tian, Ning Tian OF NON-OPPOSITION OF THE ADEPTUS INVESTORS TO THE MOTION OF ALAMEDA COUNTY EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT ASSOCIATION AND ARKANSAS TEACHER RETIREMENT SYSTEM FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL, AND CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS (Barrett, Shorty)
January 10, 2017 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel, #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel, and Memorandum of Law in Support, #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Approve Selection of Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel , #22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Adeptus Health Inc.. (Nelson, James)
December 29, 2016 Filing 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel and Memorandum of Law in Support by Robert Gibbons, Kui Liu, Joel Magazine, Sohail Sattar. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Joe Kendall, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kendall, Elton)
December 28, 2016 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #17 Additional Document -- Document filed in error. (rlf)
December 27, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michigan Laborers Pension Fund, Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samuel H. Rudman in Support, #2 Exhibit A to the Rudman Decl. (PSLRA Notice), #3 Exhibit B to the Rudman Decl. (Sworn Certification ), #4 Exhibit C to the Rudman Decl. (Estimate of Losses), #5 Exhibit D to the Rudman Decl. (Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP firm resume), #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Rudman, Samuel)
December 27, 2016 Filing 20 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Additional Attachments to Main Document: #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel.. (McWilliams, George) Proposed Order attached to Motion #19 . Modified on 12/28/2016 (rlf, ).
December 27, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George L. McWilliams, #2 Exhibit A - Joint Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Notice, #4 Exhibit C - Notice, #5 Exhibit D - Certifications, #6 Exhibit E - Chart of Transactions and Losses, #7 Exhibit F - Kessler Topaz Firm Resume, #8 Exhibit G - Bernstein Litowitz Firm Resume)(McWilliams, George) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2016: #9 Proposed Order) (rlf, ).
December 27, 2016 Filing 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel, and Memorandum of Law in Support by Laborers' Local 235 Benefit Funds, Ning Tian, Manchang Tian, Stefanie L. Seese. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lester R. Hooker in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Barrett, Shorty)
December 27, 2016 Filing 17 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel.. (Kendall, Elton) Modified on 12/28/2016 (rlf).
December 27, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel by Kui Liu, Robert Gibbons, Joel Magazine, Sohail Sattar. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Joe Kendall, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kendall, Elton) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2016: #3 Revised Proposed Order) (rlf, ).
December 27, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Approve Selection of Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel by Jason Rutherford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Glenn Thames, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Glenn Thames - Jason Rutherford Certification, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Glenn Thames - Jason Rutherford Trades, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Glenn Thames - PR Newswire Oct. 27, 2016, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Glenn Thames - KSF Resume, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Thames, Earl)
December 9, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James R Nelson on behalf of Adeptus Health Inc., Daniel W. Rosenberg, Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding (Nelson, James)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation filed by Adeptus Health Inc.. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/29/16. (mll, )
November 23, 2016 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed as to Sterling Partners on 11/9/2016, by personal service; answer due: 11/30/2016. (mll, )
November 23, 2016 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to Jeffery S. Vender on 11/5/2016, by personal service; answer due: 11/28/2016. (mll, )
November 23, 2016 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Daniel W. Rosenberg on 11/5/2016, by personal service; answer due: 11/28/2016. (mll, )
November 23, 2016 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Steven V. Napolitano on 11/7/2016, by personal service; answer due: 11/28/2016. (mll, )
November 21, 2016 Filing 8 STIPULATION and Proposed Order by Adeptus Health Inc.. (Nelson, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2016: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
November 10, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Samuel H Rudman on behalf of Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6022858. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Schedule A)(Rudman, Samuel)
November 9, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mario Alba, Jr on behalf of Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6020920. (Alba, Mario)
October 28, 2016 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Rosenberg, #2 Summons(es) Goldman, #3 Summons(es) Scott, #4 Summons(es) Vender, #5 Summons(es) Merrill Lynch, #6 Summons(es) Covert, #7 Summons(es) Taylor, #8 Summons(es) Mengert, #9 Summons(es) Sterling, #10 Summons(es) Napolitano, #11 Summons(es) Hall, #12 Summons(es) Fielding)(rlf)
October 27, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System (Ward, Thomas)
October 27, 2016 Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III added. (mll, )
October 27, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System (Fair, Andrea)
October 27, 2016 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System. (Henry, Claire)
October 27, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adeptus Health Inc., Daniel W. Rosenberg, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Gregory W. Scott, Jeffery S. Vender, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Richard Covert, Ronald L. Taylor, Stephen M. Mengert, Sterling Partners, Steven V. Napolitano, Thomas S. Hall, Timothy L. Fielding ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6002734.), filed by Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet - COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit Certification of Named Plaintiff)(Henry, Claire) Modified on 10/28/2016 (mjc, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/31/2017) (mll, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/31/2017) (mll, ). (The Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet were originally filed incorrectly and modified on 3/31/2017 to correct the incorrect identification of the documents) (mll, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System v. Adeptus Health Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michael Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Yvonne Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Victor Sardar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Li-Kuan Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Sascha Troll
Represented By: Willie Charles Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Winston Kim
Represented By: Andy Tindel
Represented By: Laurence Rosen
Represented By: Keith Robert Lorenze
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Represented By: Jacob A Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Laborers' Local 235 Benefit Funds
Represented By: Shorty Craig Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Howard Gold
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Daniel J. Hosler
Represented By: John Benjamin Lawrence
Represented By: David Clarke, Jr
Represented By: David Dykeman Sterling
Represented By: Amy Heard
Represented By: Mysha Webster Lubke
Represented By: Jessica B Pulliam
Represented By: Xenia Nicole Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Frank R Williams, Jr.
Represented By: John Benjamin Lawrence
Represented By: David Clarke, Jr
Represented By: David Dykeman Sterling
Represented By: Xenia Nicole Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Jeffrey S. Vender
Represented By: John Benjamin Lawrence
Represented By: David Clarke, Jr
Represented By: David Dykeman Sterling
Represented By: Amy Heard
Represented By: Mysha Webster Lubke
Represented By: Jessica B Pulliam
Represented By: Xenia Nicole Figueroa
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: RBC Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Daniel Howard Gold
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evercore Group L.L.C.
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Adam J. Goldstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Jason Resetarits
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fund Management Holdings GP, LLC
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Lynn K. Neuner
Represented By: Eamonn W. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven V. Napolitano
Represented By: John Benjamin Lawrence
Represented By: David Dykeman Sterling
Represented By: Amy Heard
Represented By: Mysha Webster Lubke
Represented By: Jessica B Pulliam
Represented By: James R Nelson
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Xenia Nicole Figueroa
Represented By: David Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Covert
Represented By: John Benjamin Lawrence
Represented By: David Dykeman Sterling
Represented By: Amy Heard
Represented By: Mysha Webster Lubke
Represented By: Jessica B Pulliam
Represented By: James R Nelson
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Xenia Nicole Figueroa
Represented By: David Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen M. Mengert
Represented By: John Benjamin Lawrence
Represented By: David Dykeman Sterling
Represented By: Amy Heard
Represented By: Mysha Webster Lubke
Represented By: Jessica B Pulliam
Represented By: James R Nelson
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Xenia Nicole Figueroa
Represented By: David Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy L. Fielding
Represented By: Paul Richard Bessette
Represented By: Tyler Wayne Highful
Represented By: Srimath Saliya Subasinghe
Represented By: James R Nelson
Represented By: Michael John Biles
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Xenia Nicole Figueroa
Represented By: Rebecca Teryn Matsumura
Represented By: Jill Rickershauser Carvalho
Represented By: David Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Represented By: S. Mark Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Represented By: Daniel Howard Gold
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Adam J. Goldstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Jason Resetarits
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery S. Vender
Represented By: John Benjamin Lawrence
Represented By: David Dykeman Sterling
Represented By: Amy Heard
Represented By: Mysha Webster Lubke
Represented By: Jessica B Pulliam
Represented By: James R Nelson
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Xenia Nicole Figueroa
Represented By: David Clarke, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dougherty & Company LLC
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Adam J. Goldstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Jason Resetarits
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Capital Partners III, L.P.
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Lynn K. Neuner
Represented By: Eamonn W. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fund Management, LLC
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Lynn K. Neuner
Represented By: Eamonn W. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fund Management Holdings, L.P.
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Lynn K. Neuner
Represented By: Eamonn W. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp.
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Adam J. Goldstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Jason Resetarits
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC Partners III, L.P.
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Lynn K. Neuner
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Represented By: Eamonn W. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Adam J. Goldstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Jason Resetarits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIPER JAFFRAY & CO.
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Adam J. Goldstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Jason Resetarits
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCP III AIV THREE-FCER Conduit, L.P.
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Lynn K. Neuner
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Represented By: Eamonn W. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham B Cherrington
Represented By: Paul Richard Bessette
Represented By: Michael John Biles
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Rebecca Teryn Matsumura
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Represented By: S. Mark Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Partners
Represented By: Susannah S. Geltman
Represented By: James Vincent Leito, IV
Represented By: Anthony C. Piccirillo
Represented By: George S. Wang
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Represented By: Joseph A Bruno
Represented By: Joshua Slocum
Represented By: Heather G. Diles
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald L. Taylor
Represented By: John Benjamin Lawrence
Represented By: David Dykeman Sterling
Represented By: Amy Heard
Represented By: Mysha Webster Lubke
Represented By: Jessica B Pulliam
Represented By: James R Nelson
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Xenia Nicole Figueroa
Represented By: David Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adeptus Health Inc.
Represented By: James R Nelson
Represented By: Xenia Nicole Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCP III AIV THREE-FCER, L.P.
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Lynn K. Neuner
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Represented By: Eamonn W. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Capital Partners III, LLC
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Lynn K. Neuner
Represented By: Eamonn W. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel W. Rosenberg
Represented By: John Benjamin Lawrence
Represented By: David Dykeman Sterling
Represented By: Amy Heard
Represented By: Mysha Webster Lubke
Represented By: Jessica B Pulliam
Represented By: James R Nelson
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Xenia Nicole Figueroa
Represented By: David Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Adam J. Goldstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Jason Resetarits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas S. Hall
Represented By: Paul Richard Bessette
Represented By: Tyler Wayne Highful
Represented By: Srimath Saliya Subasinghe
Represented By: James R Nelson
Represented By: Michael John Biles
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Xenia Nicole Figueroa
Represented By: Rebecca Teryn Matsumura
Represented By: Jill Rickershauser Carvalho
Represented By: David Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Represented By: S. Mark Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Adam J. Goldstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Jason Resetarits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Daniel Howard Gold
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Adam J. Goldstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Jason Resetarits
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory W. Scott
Represented By: John Benjamin Lawrence
Represented By: David Dykeman Sterling
Represented By: Amy Heard
Represented By: Mysha Webster Lubke
Represented By: Jessica B Pulliam
Represented By: James R Nelson
Represented By: Charles Rodney Acker
Represented By: Xenia Nicole Figueroa
Represented By: David Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Gibbons
Represented By: Elton Joe Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michigan Laborers' Pension Fund
Represented By: Tricia L McCormick
Represented By: Danielle Suzanne Myers
Represented By: Samuel H Rudman
Represented By: Nathan R Lindell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Rutherford
Represented By: Earl Glenn Thames, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ning Tian
Represented By: Shorty Craig Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kui Liu
Represented By: Elton Joe Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Manchang Tian
Represented By: Shorty Craig Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joel Magazine
Represented By: Elton Joe Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stefanie L. Seese
Represented By: Shorty Craig Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sohail Sattar
Represented By: Elton Joe Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Benjamin Bowman
Represented By: Elton Joe Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adeptus Investor Group
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Andy Tindel
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Represented By: Patrick V Dahlstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arkansas Teacher Retirement System
Represented By: Evan R. Hoey
Represented By: Abraham Alexander
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Donald (Matt) Mattson Keil
Represented By: Richard A. Russo, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Siebman Forrest
Represented By: Jeremy Robinson
Represented By: George L McWilliams
Represented By: Ryan T Degnan
Represented By: Darren J Check
Represented By: Stuart L Berman
Represented By: Naumon Amjed
Represented By: Gregory M Castaldo
Represented By: Michelle M. Newcomer
Represented By: Justin O. Reliford
Represented By: Michael D Blatchley
Represented By: Megan Koneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association
Represented By: Evan R. Hoey
Represented By: Abraham Alexander
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Donald (Matt) Mattson Keil
Represented By: Richard A. Russo, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Siebman Forrest
Represented By: Jeremy Robinson
Represented By: George L McWilliams
Represented By: Ryan T Degnan
Represented By: Darren J Check
Represented By: Stuart L Berman
Represented By: Naumon Amjed
Represented By: Gregory M Castaldo
Represented By: Michelle M. Newcomer
Represented By: Justin O. Reliford
Represented By: Michael D Blatchley
Represented By: Megan Koneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michigan Laborers Pension Fund
Represented By: Samuel H Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Hon. Layn R Phillips (Ret.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Represented By: Mario Alba, Jr
Represented By: Samuel H Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Stuart L Berman
Represented By: Michelle M. Newcomer
Represented By: Justin O. Reliford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?