Virtual Chart Solutions I, Inc. v. Meredith et al
Plaintiff: |
Virtual Chart Solutions I, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Brian Lee Meredith, Tracie Dawn Davis, Virtual Chart Network, LLC, Virtualasc.com, Virtual Chart Solutions, LLC, Surgical Notes, Inc., Surgical Notes MDP, LP, Surgical Notes GP, LLC, Surgical Notes RCM, LLC and MRI Centers Of Texas, LLC |
Case Number: |
4:2017cv00546 |
Filed: |
August 4, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas |
Office: |
Sherman Office |
County: |
Collin |
Presiding Judge: |
Amos L. Mazzant |
Nature of Suit: |
Copyrights |
Cause of Action: |
17 U.S.C. ยง 501 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 25, 2020 |
Filing
218
ORDER ADOPTING 214 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE granting 192 and 208 Motions for Bill of Costs and Award of Attorney's Fees as modified in the Report and Recommendation. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's above-referenced cause of action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/25/2020. (rpc, )
|
August 20, 2019 |
Filing
207
ORDER ADOPTING 203 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. ORDERED that Defendant MRI Centers of Texas, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Costs and Attorney's Fees (Dkt. # 136 -1) is GRANTED, and the objections of Plaintiff are OVERRULED. It is further ORDERED that the Motion in Limine by MRI Centers of Texas, LLC (Dkt. # 163 ) and the Motion in Limine by Virtual Chart Solutions I., Inc. (Dkt. # 165 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/20/2019. (rpc, )
|
February 5, 2019 |
Filing
149
ORDER ADOPTING 138 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. ORDERED that Defendant MRI Centers of Texas, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. # 114 ) is GRANTED, and the objections of Plaintiff are OVERRULED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's trade secret misappropriation claim against MCT is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/5/2019. (rpc, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Virtual Chart Solutions I, Inc. v. Meredith et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Virtual Chart Solutions I, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Ronald William Burns, Jr |
Represented By: |
Mazin Ahmad Sbaiti |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Brian Lee Meredith |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Tracie Dawn Davis |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Virtual Chart Network, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Virtualasc.com |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Virtual Chart Solutions, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Surgical Notes, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Surgical Notes MDP, LP |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Surgical Notes GP, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Surgical Notes RCM, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: MRI Centers Of Texas, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?