Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. et al v. Huang et al
Plaintiff: Futurewei Technologies, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.
Defendant: Yiren Ronnie Huang and CNEX Labs, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: David Folsom
Case Number: 4:2017cv00893
Filed: December 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1836
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 488 REDACTION to #486 SEALED MOTION for Attorneys Fees and Costs by Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Tyz Decl, #2 Exhibit Exhibit Ex A to Tyz, #3 Exhibit Exhibit Ex B to Tyz, #4 Exhibit Exhibit Ex C to Tyz, #5 Exhibit Exhibit Ex D to Tyz, #6 Exhibit Exhibit Ex E to Tyz, #7 Exhibit Exhibit Ex F to Tyz, #8 Exhibit Exhibit Ex G to Tyz, #9 Affidavit Decl. of Dacus, #10 Affidavit Decl. of Kohm, #11 Affidavit Decl. of Fisher, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyz, Ryan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 487 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for ALL PROCEEDINGS held on 6/20/2019 and ALL PROCEEDINGS held on 6/21/2019 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, ) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Chris Bickham, on 7/15/2019. (slo)
July 11, 2019 Filing 486 SEALED MOTION for Attorneys Fees and Costs by Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Tyz Decl., #2 Exhibit Ex A to Tyz, #3 Exhibit Ex B to Tyz, #4 Exhibit Ex C to Tyz, #5 Exhibit Ex D to Tyz, #6 Exhibit Ex E to Tyz, #7 Exhibit Ex F to Tyz, #8 Exhibit Ex G to Tyz, #9 Affidavit Decl. of Dacus, #10 Affidavit Decl. of Kohm, #11 Affidavit Decl. of Fisher, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyz, Ryan)
July 11, 2019 Filing 485 MOTION for Attorney Fees and, MOTION for Bill of Costs by CNEX Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Fisher, #2 Ex A to Fisher Declaration, #3 Ex B to Fisher Declaration, #4 Ex C to Fisher Declaration, #5 Declaration of Deron Dacus, #6 Declaration of Bryan Kohm, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
July 11, 2019 Filing 484 MOTION for Order Declaring no Party Entitled to Attorneys' Fees or in the Alternative, for an Order Extending Plaintiffs' Fee-Application Deadline by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
July 2, 2019 Filing 483 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nathaniel P. Garrett on behalf of Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7334185. (Garrett, Nathaniel)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 480 JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT. This action came on for trial before the Court and a jury, the undersigned presiding, and the issues have been duly tried after the jury having duly rendered its verdict. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that Plaintiffs take nothing and that Plaintiffs' case against Defendants is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that Defendants take nothing and that Defendants' case against Plaintiffs is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that each party bear its own costs. All pending motions are DENIED, and all relief not previously granted is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/27/2019. (baf, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 479 SEALED Jury Notes. (kkc, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 478 SEALED Jury Questions for the Witnesses. (kkc, ).
June 26, 2019 Filing 477 Sealed JURY VERDICT with foreperson signature. (kkc, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 476 JURY VERDICT. (kkc, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 475 Final Trial Witness List. (kkc, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 474 Final Jury Instructions. (kkc, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 473 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial - Day 17 completed on 6/26/2019. Verdict rendered. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (kkc, )
June 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: In Chambers Charge Conference held on 6/25/2019. (kkc, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 472 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial - Day 16 held on 6/25/2019. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 471 REDACTION to #467 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
June 25, 2019 Filing 470 SEALED MOTION Motion by Defendant CNEX Labs, Inc. for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(a) by CNEX Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
June 25, 2019 Filing 469 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyz, Ryan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 468 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial Day 15 held on 6/24/2019. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (dm, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 467 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
June 24, 2019 Filing 466 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #438 Trial Brief, Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum re the Admissibility of Huawei's Bad Acts and Offer of Proof. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eugene Mar, #2 Exhibit 8 to Mar Declaration)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
June 22, 2019 Filing 465 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial - Day 14 held on 6/22/2019. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
June 22, 2019 Filing 464 REDACTION to #404 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Temporarily Seal the Pretrial Conference and All Subsequent Court Hearings by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
June 22, 2019 Filing 463 Sealed Document. Plaintiffs' Supplement to Trial Brief Regarding the Testimony of Ian D. Jestice Regarding the CNEX SDK Board (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
June 21, 2019 Filing 462 Sealed Document. Defendants' Trial Brief Opposing Excluding Trial Testimony of Ian D. Jestice. (Dacus, Deron)
June 21, 2019 Filing 461 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial - Day 13 held on 6/21/2019. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, ).
June 21, 2019 Filing 460 REDACTION to #416 Sealed Document Plaintiffs' Amended Trial Exhibit List by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
June 21, 2019 Filing 459 Sealed Document. Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Trial Brief in Support of Excluding Trial Testimony of Ian D. Jestice (Dkt. 457) (Dacus, Deron)
June 21, 2019 Filing 457 Sealed Document. Plaintiffs' Trial Brief In Support of Excluding Trial Testimony of Ian D. Jestice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
June 21, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. - PLEASE DISREGARD - ATTORNEY TO REFILE Document # 456, REDACTION SEALED DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 458 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial - Day 12 held on 6/20/2019. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 456 REDACTION to #416 Sealed Document Plaintiffs' Amended Trial Exhibit List by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
June 20, 2019 Filing 455 SEALED MOTION Defendant CNEX's Motion to Admit Statements Under Co-Conspirator Exception Under FRE 801(d)(2)(E) and Offer of Proof (Corrected) by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
June 20, 2019 Filing 454 Proposed Jury Instructions by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Jury Verdict Form)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
June 20, 2019 Filing 453 Sealed Document. Plaintiffs' Objection to Hearsay Testimony Regarding Xiamen University at Trial (Siebman, Clyde)
June 20, 2019 Filing 452 SEALED MOTION for Relief Regarding Defendants Failure to Disclose and Supplement Discovery by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2019: #5 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
June 20, 2019 Filing 451 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** SEALED MOTION Defendant CNEX's Motion to Admit Statements Under Co-Conspirator Exception Under FRE 801(d)(2)(E) and Offer of Proof by CNEX Labs, Inc.. (Fisher, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/20/2019 (baf, ).
June 20, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION TO ADMIT STATEMENTS submitted DOCUMENT #451 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 450 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial - Day 11 held on 6/19/2019. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 449 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial - Day 10 held on 6/18/2019. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 448 REDACTION to #446 Sealed Document Plaintiffs' Notice to Seal Excerpts of the Trial Testimony of Dr. Guangyuan Liu by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
June 18, 2019 Filing 447 Proposed Jury Instructions by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
June 17, 2019 Filing 446 Sealed Document. Plaintiffs' Notice to Seal Excerpts of the Trial Testimony of Dr. Guangyuan Liu (Siebman, Clyde)
June 17, 2019 Filing 445 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial- Day 9 held on 6/17/2019. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
June 17, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION TO EXCLUDE submitted DOCUMENT #444 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
June 16, 2019 Filing 444 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** SEALED MOTION to Exclude Undisclosed Opinions of Brian A. Berg by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Decl. of R. Tyz, #2 Exhibit Ex A to Decl. of R. Tyz, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyz, Ryan) Modified on 6/17/2019 (baf, ).
June 12, 2019 Filing 443 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial - Day 8 held on 6/12/2019. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, ) (Main Document 443 replaced on 6/17/2019) (kkc, ).
June 11, 2019 Filing 442 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial - Day 7 held on 6/11/2019. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 441 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #404 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Temporarily Seal the Pretrial Conference and All Subsequent Court Hearings filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants CNEX Labs, Inc. and Ronnie Huang's Motion to Strike the Supplemental Rebuttal Report of Brian A. Berg (Dkt. #418 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/11/2019. (baf, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 440 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial - Day 6 held on 6/10/2019. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 438 TRIAL BRIEF Defendants' Memorandum re the Admissibility of Huawei's Bad Acts and Offer of Proof by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nadia Arid, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2019 Filing 437 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial Day 5 held on 6/7/2019. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (dm, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 436 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial - Day 4 held on 6/6/2019. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 435 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court finds that Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Expert Reports and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone, PH.D. Regarding Damages (Dkt. #260 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/6/2019. (baf, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 434 REDACTION to #430 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike the Supplemental Rebuttal Report of Brian A. Berg by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Callaway, #2 Exhibit 8)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
June 5, 2019 Filing 433 REDACTION to #419 Sealed Document Plaintiffs' Amended Trial Exhibit List by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
June 5, 2019 Filing 432 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial - Day 3 held on 6/5/2019. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 431 REDACTION to #426 Sealed Response to Motion, Defendants' Motion to Strike the Supplemental Rebuttal Report of Brian A. Berg by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
June 5, 2019 Filing 430 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #418 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Strike the Supplemental Rebuttal Report of Brian A. Berg filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Callaway, #2 Exhibit 8)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
June 4, 2019 Filing 429 REDACTION to #425 Sealed Document Defendants' Third Amended Trial Exhibit List by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
June 4, 2019 Filing 428 REDACTION to #418 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Strike the Supplemental Rebuttal Report of Brian A. Berg by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Callaway, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
June 4, 2019 Filing 427 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial - Day 2 held on 6/4/2019. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 426 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #418 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Strike the Supplemental Rebuttal Report of Brian A. Berg filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
June 3, 2019 Filing 425 Sealed Document. Defendants' Third Amended Exhibit List. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2019 Filing 424 Sealed Document. Defendants' Third Amended Trial Exhibit List. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2019 Filing 423 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Voir Dire, Jury Selection and Jury Trial - Day 1 held on 6/3/2019. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 422 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CNEX Labs, Inc. for proceedings held on June 3, 2019 Final pretrial conference before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Mar, Eugene) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Jan Mason, on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 421 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. for proceedings held on 6/3/2019 additional final pretrial conference before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Coleman, Jesse) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Jan Mason, on 3/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 420 JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/3/2019. (baf, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 419 Sealed Document. Plaintiffs' Amended Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
June 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Additional Final Pretrial Conference held on 6/3/2019. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (kkc, )
June 2, 2019 Filing 418 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Strike the Supplemental Rebuttal Report of Brian A. Berg by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Callaway, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
June 1, 2019 Filing 417 Sealed Document. Defendants' Second Amended Exhibit List. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2019 Filing 416 Sealed Document. Plaintiffs' Amended Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 31, 2019 Filing 415 Plaintiffs' Second Amended Witness List by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
May 30, 2019 Filing 414 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CNEX Labs, Inc. for proceedings held on May 30, 2019 Telephonic conference regarding discovery dispute before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Mar, Eugene) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Jan Mason, on 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 413 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. for proceedings held on 5/30/2019 re discovery dispute before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Coleman, Jesse) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Jan Mason, on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 412 Sealed Document - Defendants' Amended Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dacus, Deron)
May 30, 2019 Filing 411 Second Amended Trial Witness List by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Dacus, Deron)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER. The Court ORDERS: CNEX'S Motion in Limine No. 10: Exclude evidence concerning Defendants' motives for and method of drafting their Counterclaims (reflected in Dkt. #352) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 16: Lay testimony or documentary evidence on matters stricken from Defendants' expert reports (reflected in Dkt. #351) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/30/2019. (baf, )
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants' Objection to Plaintiffs' Use of Huawei's Internal Chat Logs at Trial (Dkt. #372 ) is OVERRULED. The Court conditionally admits the chat log reflecting the conversation Dong Fuyang and Shen Haifeng subject to Plaintiffs making a showing during trial and by the preponderance of the evidence the existence of the conspiracy and the participation therein of the Dong Fuyang, Shen Haifeng, and Defendants. The Court further OVERRULES Defendants' objections to chat logs that were not specifically briefed in Defendants' Objection to Plaintiffs' Use of Huawei's Internal Chat Logs at Trial (Dkt. #372 ); the Court will address objections to these chat logs as they are raised during trial. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/30/2019. (baf, )
May 30, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference held regarding witness dispute on 5/30/2019 at 10:40 a.m. Court orders that Parties disclose from "will call" list those that will be brought live; but not from the "may call" list. Parties should work together on an agreement for disclosing trial witnesses. during trial. Call adjourned at 10:57 a.m. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (kkc, )
May 30, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference regarding a discovery issue set for 5/30/2019 10:40 AM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. The Court is addressing this issue during the break of an injunction hearing, so the telephone conference will be limited to five (5) minutes. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 10:35 AM: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (tls)
May 29, 2019 Filing 408 REDACTION to #402 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, Fifth Motion to Compel by CNEX Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eugene Mar, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 (Part One), #4 Exhibit 2 (Part Two), #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Declaration of Ian Jestice)(Kohm, Bryan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 407 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Shannon Elizabeth Turner on behalf of CNEX Labs, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7287737. (Turner, Shannon)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER - DENYING #348 Sealed Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/29/2019. (baf, )
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER - DENYING #326 Sealed Motion to Supplement the Record in Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Amended Counterclaims. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/29/2019. (baf, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 404 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Temporarily Seal the Pretrial Conference and All Subsequent Court Hearings by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 403 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - GRANTING #370 First SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE EXPERT REPORT OF IAN D. JESTICE filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/28/2019. (baf, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 402 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #348 Fifth SEALED MOTION to Compel filed by CNEX Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eugene Mar, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 (Part One), #4 Exhibit 2 (Part Two), #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Declaration of Ian Jestice)(Kohm, Bryan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 401 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. for proceedings held on 5/24/2019 Telehonic Hearing before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Coleman, Jesse) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Jan Mason, on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 400 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CNEX Labs, Inc. for proceedings held on May 24, 2019 Telephonic Conference before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Mar, Eugene) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Jan Mason, on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference to discuss matters related to upcoming trial held on 5/24/2019. (Court Reporter Jan Mason) (no attachment) (tls)
May 23, 2019 Filing 399 REDACTION to #396 Sealed Document, Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Certified Translations of Exhibits 1, 11 and 12 to the Declaration of Tushar Vaidya Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to CNEX's Fifth Motion to Compel by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 23, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 5/24/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 9:55 AM: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #.(tls)
May 21, 2019 Filing 397 REDACTION to #389 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider Memorandum Opinion and Order (Dkt. 349) by Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Tyz Declaration, #3 Exhibit A to Tyz Decl., #4 Exhibit B to Tyz Decl., #5 Exhibit C to Tyz Decl., #6 Exhibit D to Tyz Decl., #7 Exhibit E to Tyz Decl.)(Tyz, Ryan)
May 21, 2019 Filing 396 Sealed Document. Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Certified Translations of Exhibits 1, 11, and 12 to the Declaration of Tushar Vaidya Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to CNEX's Fifth Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 21, 2019 Filing 395 REDACTION to #390 Sealed Response to Motion, to Supplement Expert Report of Ian D Jestice by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 20, 2019 Filing 394 REDACTION to #383 Sealed Response to Motion, Fifth Motion to Compel by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 20, 2019 Filing 393 REDACTION to #384 Sealed Document, Response in Opposition to Defendants' Objection to Plaintiffs' Use of Huawei's Internal Chat Logs at Trial by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 20, 2019 Filing 392 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CNEX Labs, Inc. for proceedings held on May 20, 2019 Telephonic conference regarding deposition of third party before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Mar, Eugene) (Transcript request forwarded to Jan Mason, Court Reporter)
May 20, 2019 Filing 391 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. for proceedings held on 5/20/2019 re deposition of third party Dong before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Coleman, Jesse) (Transcript request forwarded to Jan Mason, Court Reporter)
May 20, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference held on 5/20/2019 at 8:00 a.m. Andrew Boustros, Elizabeth Forrest, Jesse Coleman, and Clyde Siebman appear on behalf of Plaintiff; Ryan Tyz appeared on behalf of Defendant Yiren Huang; Mark Fisher, Deron Dacus, Eugene Marr, and Bryan Kohn appeared on behalf of Defendant CNEX Labs, Inc. In relation to the deposition of third party Dong, the Court orders that the deposition shall take place for 10 1/2 hours, 3 1/2 hours of which the Defendants will share and Plaintiffs will have 7 hours. Parties are encouraged to cooperate and use the time effectively. Parties discuss trial witness issues. Call adjourned at 8:24 a.m. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (kkc, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 390 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #370 First SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE EXPERT REPORT OF IAN D. JESTICE filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 17, 2019 Filing 389 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider Memorandum Opinion and Order (Dkt. 349) by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Tyz Declaration, #3 Exhibit A to Tyz Decl., #4 Exhibit B to Tyz Decl., #5 Exhibit C to Tyz Decl., #6 Exhibit D to Tyz Decl., #7 Exhibit E to Tyz Decl.)(Tyz, Ryan)
May 17, 2019 Filing 388 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Pretrial Proceedings held on May 3, 2019 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-209-4013. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (213 pages) Motion to Redact due 6/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2019. (jm, )
May 17, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference regarding deposition issue set for 5/20/2019 at 8:05 a.m. before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 8:00 a.m.: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #.(kkc, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 387 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #383 Sealed Response to Motion, 5th Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 16, 2019 Filing 386 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #383 Sealed Response to Motion, 5th Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 16, 2019 Filing 385 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #383 Sealed Response to Motion, 5th Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 16, 2019 Filing 384 Sealed Document. Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendants Objection to Plaintiffs Use of Huaweis Internal Chat Logs at Trial (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 16, 2019 Filing 383 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #348 Fifth SEALED MOTION to Compel filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 16, 2019 Filing 382 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COUNTERCLAIMS by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. re #132 Sealed Document Plaintiffs' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Counterclaims (Siebman, Clyde)
May 15, 2019 Filing 381 REDACTION to #371 Sealed Document Joint Submission of Excerpts of Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Brian A. Berg, submitted in connection with Defendants' Motion to Preclude Mr. Berg by Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tyz, Ryan)
May 15, 2019 Filing 380 REDACTION to #372 Sealed Document Defendants' Objection to Plaintiffs' Use of Huawei's Internal Chat Logs at Trial by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
May 15, 2019 Filing 379 REDACTION to #370 First SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE EXPERT REPORT OF IAN D. JESTICE by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dan Callaway, #2 Exhibits 1 to 16, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
May 14, 2019 Filing 378 REDACTION to #368 Sealed Document by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 14, 2019 Filing 377 NOTICE by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. re #260 SEALED MOTION To Strike The Expert Reports and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D. Regarding Damages (Siebman, Clyde)
May 14, 2019 Filing 376 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CNEX Labs, Inc. for proceedings held on May 13, 2019 Telephonic hearing regarding opening statement exhibit objections before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Mar, Eugene) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Jan Mason, on 5/14/2019) (slo)
May 14, 2019 Filing 375 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. for proceedings held on 5/13/2019 exhibit objections before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Coleman, Jesse) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Jan Mason, on 5/14/2019) (slo)
May 13, 2019 Filing 374 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference held on 5/13/2019. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (kkc, )
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER - GRANTING #359 Motion for Approval of Agreed Juror Questionnaire. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/13/2019. (baf, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 372 Sealed Document. DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS USE OF HUAWEIS INTERNAL CHAT LOGS AT TRIAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2019 Filing 371 Sealed Document. Joint Submission of Excerpts of Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Brian A. Berg, submitted in connection with Defendants' Motion to Preclude Mr. Berg (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tyz, Ryan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 370 First SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE EXPERT REPORT OF IAN D. JESTICE by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF DAN CALLAWAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE EXPERT REPORT OF IAN D. JESTICE, #2 Exhibit 1-5 TO DECLARATION OF DAN CALLAWAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE EXPERT REPORT OF IAN D. JESTICE, #3 Exhibit 6-9 TO DECLARATION OF DAN CALLAWAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE EXPERT REPORT OF IAN D. JESTICE, #4 Exhibit 10 TO DECLARATION OF DAN CALLAWAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE EXPERT REPORT OF IAN D. JESTICE, #5 Exhibit 11 TO DECLARATION OF DAN CALLAWAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE EXPERT REPORT OF IAN D. JESTICE, #6 Exhibit 12 TO DECLARATION OF DAN CALLAWAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE EXPERT REPORT OF IAN D. JESTICE, #7 Exhibit 13 TO DECLARATION OF DAN CALLAWAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE EXPERT REPORT OF IAN D. JESTICE, #8 Exhibit 14-16 TO DECLARATION OF DAN CALLAWAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE EXPERT REPORT OF IAN D. JESTICE, #9 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT)(Callaway, Daniel)
May 10, 2019 Filing 369 Sealed Document. Defendants' Amended Objections to Plaintiffs' Opening Statement Exhibits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A FILED UNDER SEAL)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2019 Filing 368 Sealed Document. Notice of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Objections to Defendant's First Supplemental Opening Statement Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 10, 2019 Filing 367 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Duane Smith on behalf of CNEX Labs, Inc. (Smith, Gregory)
May 10, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 365, Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** (kls, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 366 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Jeffrey Mark Fisher on behalf of CNEX Labs, Inc. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
May 9, 2019 Filing 365 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED ERRONEOUSLY - SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT AT ENTRY #366 *** NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Jeffrey Mark Fisher on behalf of CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang (Fisher, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/10/2019 (kls, ).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 364 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Defendants' Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Brian A. Berg from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial (Dkt. #261 ) is DENIED; Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Ian D. Jestice as Expert Witness, Jestice Opening Expert Report, Jestice Report, and Defendants' Notice of Errata (Dkt. #262 ) is DENIED; The Court therefore finds that Defendants' Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Thomas W. Britven from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial (Dkt. #263 ) is DENIED; Defendant Huang's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Thomas W. Britven (Dkt. #270 ) is DENIED; Defendants Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Brian Berg from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial Relating to His Rebuttal Expert Report (Dkt. #296 ) is GRANTED IN PART. The Court finds that Mr. Berg's opinions are limited only to the extent that he may not engage in a legal analysis of Fifth Circuit case law and opine as to whether asserted trade secrets conform to precedent. Accordingly, the Court STRIKES paragraph 9 from Mr. Berg's Rebuttal Report. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/9/2019. (baf, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 363 REDACTION to #361 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, to Preclude Plaintiff's Expert Witness Brian Berg from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial relating to his Rebuttal Expert Report by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 7, 2019 Filing 362 REDACTION to #344 Sealed Response to Motion, Defendants' Amended Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment of No Evidence on Defendants' Counterclaims by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 6, 2019 Filing 361 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #296 First SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS EXPERT WITNESS BRIAN A. BERG FROM OFFERING CERTAIN OPINIONS AT TRIAL RELATING TO HIS REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 6, 2019 Filing 360 REDACTION to #343 Sealed Document Notice of Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' First Supplemental Opening Statement Exhibit List by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 6, 2019 Filing 359 Joint MOTION for Approval of Agreed Juror Questionnaire by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
May 6, 2019 Filing 358 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang for proceedings held on May 3, 2019 Final Pretrial Conference before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Mar, Eugene) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Jan Mason, on 5/6/2019)(slo).
May 3, 2019 Filing 357 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. for proceedings held on 5/3/2019 Final Pretrial Conference before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Coleman, Jesse) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Jan Mason, on 5/6/2019)(slo).
May 3, 2019 Filing 356 REDACTION to #342 Sealed Document Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Opening Statement Exhibits by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
May 3, 2019 Filing 355 REDACTION to #348 Fifth SEALED MOTION to Compel by CNEX Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan Kohm, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohm, Bryan)
May 3, 2019 Filing 354 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Final Pretrial Conference held on 5/3/2019. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (kkc, )
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER on #299 SEALED MOTION Defendant Huang's Motions in Limine filed by Yiren Ronnie Huang. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/3/2019. (daj, )
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER on #298 SEALED MOTION Defendant CNEX's Motions in Limine filed by CNEX Labs, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/3/2019. (daj, )
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER on #297 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by Huawei Technologies Co., LTD., Futurewei Technologies, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/3/2019. (daj, )
May 3, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference regarding exhibit objections set for 5/13/2019 at 5:00 p.m. in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 4:55 p.m.: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #.(kkc, )
May 3, 2019 **TIME CHANGE ONLY ** Telephone Conference regarding exhibit objections reset for 5/13/2019 at 5:15 p.m. before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 5:10 p.m.: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #.(kkc, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 350 Proposed Jury Instructions by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Proposed Verdict Form)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 349 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants' First Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication on Plaintiffs' Breach of Contract Claims (Dkt. #159 ) is GRANTED IN PART. Defendants' Second Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 13, 14, 15, 16, 17 and 21 of the Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. #161 ) is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on their Breach of Contract Claim for Failure to Disclose Patent Applications (Count II) (Dkt. #158 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment of no Evidence on Defendants' Counterclaims (Dkt. #160 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Amended Counterclaims (Dkt. #162 ) is GRANTED IN PART. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/2/2019. (baf, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 348 Fifth SEALED MOTION to Compel by CNEX Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan Kohm, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohm, Bryan)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Counterclaims (Dkt. #139 ) and Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims under the Texas Citizens Participation Act and Special Motion to Strike Defendants' Counterclaims under the California Anti- SLAPP Law (Dkt. #163 ) are hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/2/2019. (baf, )
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 346 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Their Answer and Counterclaims (Dkt. #209 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/2/2019. (baf, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 345 Proposed Jury Instructions by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Verdict Form)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 2, 2019 Filing 344 SEALED RESPONSE to Defendants' Amended Opposition to Motion re #160 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of No Evidence On Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 1, 2019 Filing 343 Sealed Document Notice of Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' First Supplemental Opening Statement Exhibit List. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 1, 2019 Filing 342 Sealed Document. Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Opening Statement Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2019 Filing 341 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Mahoney on behalf of Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7247807. (Mahoney, Kevin)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER - DENYING AS MOOT #131 Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/29/2019. (baf, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 339 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS EXPERT WITNESS BRIAN A. BERG FROM OFFERING CERTAIN OPINIONS AT TRIAL RELATING TO HIS REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT re #296 First SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS EXPERT WITNESS BRIAN A. BERG FROM OFFERING CERTAIN OPINIONS AT TRIAL RELATING TO HIS REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF DAN CALLAWAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS EXPERT WITNESS BRIAN A. BERG FROM OFFERING CERTAIN OPINIONS AT TRIAL RELATING TO HIS REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Dan Callaway)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 26, 2019 Filing 337 REDACTION to #331 Sealed Document Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Witness List by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 26, 2019 Filing 336 REDACTION to #329 Sealed Response to Motion, Defendants' Response and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 26, 2019 Filing 335 REDACTION to #332 Sealed Response to Motion, Defendants' Motions in Limine by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 26, 2019 In light of the May 3, 2019 Final Pretrial Conference of this case, Counsel are requested to ensure that any recently filed pleadings in excess of 20 pages are received in Chambers by Monday, April 29, and that any subsequently filed pretrial filings are thereafter sent via overnight delivery. It is not necessary to send courtesy copies of redacted pleadings. (tls)
April 25, 2019 Filing 334 NOTICE by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. Corrected Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Revised Witness List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 25, 2019 Filing 333 REDACTION to #325 Sealed Response to Motion, to Preclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Brian Berg from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial Relating to his Rebuttal Expert Report by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 24, 2019 Filing 332 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #299 SEALED MOTION Defendant Huang's Motions in Limine, #298 SEALED MOTION Defendant CNEX's Motions in Limine filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 24, 2019 Filing 331 Sealed Document. Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Witness List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 24, 2019 Filing 330 NOTICE by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang Defendants' Objections and Counter Designations to Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations (Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 24, 2019 Filing 329 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #297 SEALED MOTION in Limine Defendants' Response and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 24, 2019 Filing 328 NOTICE by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. re #319 Witness List Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Revised Witness List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 24, 2019 Filing 327 NOTICE by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. Counter Deposition Designations and Objections (Siebman, Clyde)
April 23, 2019 Filing 326 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Supplement the Record in Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Amended Counterclaims (Dkt. 162) by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Lau, #2 Exhibit A to Lau Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Lau Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Lau Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 22, 2019 Filing 325 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #296 First SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS EXPERT WITNESS BRIAN A. BERG FROM OFFERING CERTAIN OPINIONS AT TRIAL RELATING TO HIS REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 22, 2019 Filing 324 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Telephone Conference held on April 17, 2019 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-209-4013. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (49 pages) Motion to Redact due 5/13/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2019. (jm, )
April 22, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT submitted DOCUMENT #323 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 323 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** SEALED MOTION to Supplement the Record in Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Amended Counterclaims by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Lau, #2 Exhibit A to Lau Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Lau Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Lau Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/22/2019 (baf, ).
April 19, 2019 Filing 322 Amended SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #160 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of No Evidence On Defendants' Counterclaims filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 17, 2019 Filing 321 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CNEX Labs, Inc. for proceedings held on 04/17/2019 Telephonic hearing before Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. (Fisher, Jeffrey) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Jan Mason, on 4/18/2019)(slo).
April 17, 2019 Filing 320 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. for proceedings held on 4/17/2019 discovery dispute before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Coleman, Jesse) Modified on 4/18/2019 (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Jan Mason, on 4/17/2019) (slo, ).
April 17, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference to address discovery disputes held on 4/17/2019. (Court Reporter Jan Mason - no attachment) (tls)
April 17, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference RESET for 4/17/2019 01:30 PM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys instructed to call the conference number at 1:25 PM. (tls)
April 16, 2019 Filing 319 Trial Witness List by CNEX Labs, Inc.. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 16, 2019 Filing 318 Plaintiff's Notice of First Amended Witness List by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Siebman, Clyde) Modified on 4/16/2019 (kls, ).
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/16/2019. (baf, )
April 16, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference to discuss discovery dispute set for 4/17/2019 at 1:15 p.m. before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 1:10 p.m.: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #.(kkc, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 316 REDACTION to #305 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, to Preclude Plaintiff's Expert Witness Brian A. Berg from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 11, 2019 Filing 315 REDACTION to #306 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion to Exclude Testimony of Thomas W. Britven by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
April 11, 2019 Filing 314 REDACTION to #307 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, to Preclude Plaintiff's Expert Witness Thomas W. Britven from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
April 10, 2019 Filing 313 REDACTION to #299 SEALED MOTION Defendant Huang's Motions in Limine by Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Gregg)
April 10, 2019 Filing 312 REDACTION to #304 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, by CNEX Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eugene Mar, #2 Exhibit 1 to Mar Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Mar Declaration)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 10, 2019 Filing 311 REDACTION to #303 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 10, 2019 Filing 310 REDACTION to #298 SEALED MOTION Defendant CNEX's Motions in Limine by CNEX Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 10, 2019 Filing 309 REDACTION to #296 First SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS EXPERT WITNESS BRIAN A. BERG FROM OFFERING CERTAIN OPINIONS AT TRIAL RELATING TO HIS REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Callaway, #2 Exhibit 1 to Callaway Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 10, 2019 Filing 308 REDACTION to #297 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 9, 2019 Filing 307 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #263 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Thomas W. Britven from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
April 9, 2019 Filing 306 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #259 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Thomas W. Britven filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
April 9, 2019 Filing 305 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #261 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Brian A. Berg from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 9, 2019 Filing 304 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #260 SEALED MOTION To Strike The Expert Reports and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D. Regarding Damages filed by CNEX Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eugene Mar, #2 Exhibit 1 to Mar Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Mar Declaration)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 9, 2019 Filing 303 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #262 SEALED MOTION To Strike Ian D. Jestice as Expert Witness, Jestice Opening Expert Report, Jestice Rebuttal Report, and Defendants' Notice of Errata filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 9, 2019 Filing 302 REDACTION to #300 Sealed Document Joint PreTrial Order by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 9, 2019 Filing 301 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher F. Robertson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7216487. (Robertson, Christopher)
April 8, 2019 Filing 300 Sealed Document Joint Final PreTrial Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 8, 2019 Filing 299 SEALED MOTION Defendant Huang's Motions in Limine by Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Gregg)
April 8, 2019 Filing 298 SEALED MOTION Defendant CNEX's Motions in Limine by CNEX Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 8, 2019 Filing 297 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 8, 2019 Filing 296 First SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS EXPERT WITNESS BRIAN A. BERG FROM OFFERING CERTAIN OPINIONS AT TRIAL RELATING TO HIS REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT by CNEX Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF DANIEL CALLAWAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT WITNESS BRIAN A. BERG FROM OFFERING CERTAIN OPINIONS AT TRIAL RELATING TO HIS REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 TO DECLARATION OF DANIEL CALLAWAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT WITNESS BRIAN A. BERG FROM OFFERING CERTAIN OPINIONS AT TRIAL RELATING TO HIS REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT, #3 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2019 Filing 295 NOTICE by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. of Intent to File Certified Records (Siebman, Clyde)
April 5, 2019 Filing 294 NOTICE by CNEX Labs, Inc. Defendants Notice of Intent to Offer Certified Records (Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2019 Filing 293 REDACTION to #286 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, to Preclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Thomas W. Britven by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2019 Filing 292 REDACTION to #284 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, to Preclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Brian A. Berg by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2019 Filing 291 REDACTION to #285 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion by Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Tyz, Ryan)
April 4, 2019 Filing 290 REDACTION to #288 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, to Strike Expert Reports and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 4, 2019 Filing 289 REDACTION to #287 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, to Strike Ian D. Jestice as Expert Witness by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 2, 2019 Filing 288 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #260 SEALED MOTION To Strike The Expert Reports and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D. Regarding Damages filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 2, 2019 Filing 287 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #262 SEALED MOTION To Strike Ian D. Jestice as Expert Witness, Jestice Opening Expert Report, Jestice Rebuttal Report, and Defendants' Notice of Errata filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 2, 2019 Filing 286 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #263 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Thomas W. Britven from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
April 2, 2019 Filing 285 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #270 Amended SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Thomas W. Britven, #259 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Thomas W. Britven filed by Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Tyz, Ryan)
April 2, 2019 Filing 284 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #261 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Brian A. Berg from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
March 29, 2019 Filing 283 REDACTION to #276 Sealed Response to Motion, To Strike The Expert Reports and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D. Regarding Damages by CNEX Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie Skaff, #2 Ex 1 to Skaff Declaration, #3 Ex 2 to Skaff Declaration, #4 Ex 3 to Skaff Declaration, #5 Ex 4 to Skaff Declaration, #6 Ex 5 to Skaff Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Skaff, Stephanie)
March 29, 2019 Filing 282 REDACTION to #275 Sealed Response to Motion,, to Preclude Ian D. Jestice as an Expert Witness by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Fisher, #2 Ex A to Fisher Declaration, #3 Ex B to Fisher Declaration, #4 Ex C to Fisher Declaration, #5 Ex D to Fisher Declaration, #6 Ex E to Fisher Declaration, #7 Declaration of Ian D. Jestice, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
March 28, 2019 Filing 281 REDACTION to #273 Sealed Response to Motion, to Preclude Plaintiff's Expert Witness Brian A. Berg by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 28, 2019 Filing 280 REDACTION to #272 Sealed Response to Motion to Exclude Testimony of Thomas W. Britven by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 28, 2019 Filing 279 REDACTION to #274 Sealed Response to Motion, to Preclude Plaintiff's Expert Witness Thomas W. Britven by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 27, 2019 Filing 278 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang for proceedings held on March 27, 2019 Status Conference before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Mar, Eugene) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Jan Mason, on 3/27/2019) (slo).
March 27, 2019 Filing 277 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. for proceedings held on 3/27/2019 Status Conference before Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. (Coleman, Jesse) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Jan Mason, on 3/27/2019) (slo, ).
March 27, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/27/2019. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (kkc, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 276 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #260 SEALED MOTION To Strike The Expert Reports and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D. Regarding Damages filed by CNEX Labs, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie Skaff, #2 Exhibit 1 to Skaff Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Skaff Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Skaff Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Skaff Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Skaff Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Skaff, Stephanie)
March 26, 2019 Filing 275 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #262 SEALED MOTION To Strike Ian D. Jestice as Expert Witness, Jestice Opening Expert Report, Jestice Rebuttal Report, and Defendants' Notice of Errata filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian D. Jestice, #2 Declaration of Jeff Fisher, #3 Exhibit A to Fisher Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Fisher Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Fisher Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Fisher Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Fisher Declaration, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
March 26, 2019 Filing 274 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #263 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Thomas W. Britven from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 26, 2019 Filing 273 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #261 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Brian A. Berg from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 26, 2019 Filing 272 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #259 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Thomas W. Britven filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 20, 2019 Filing 271 REDACTION to #270 Amended SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Thomas W. Britven by Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyz, Ryan)
March 19, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference to discuss the trial days of this case set for Wednesday 3/27/2019 08:15 AM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 8:10 AM: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (tls)
March 18, 2019 Filing 270 Amended SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Thomas W. Britven by Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyz, Ryan)
March 14, 2019 Filing 269 REDACTION to #262 SEALED MOTION To Strike Ian D. Jestice as Expert Witness, Jestice Opening Expert Report, Jestice Rebuttal Report, and Defendants' Notice of Errata by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 14, 2019 Filing 268 REDACTION to #260 SEALED MOTION To Strike The Expert Reports and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D. Regarding Damages by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 13, 2019 Filing 267 REDACTION to #259 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Thomas W. Britven by Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Myers, Gregg)
March 13, 2019 Filing 266 REDACTION to #263 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Thomas W. Britven from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie Skaff in Support of Motion to Preclude Thomas W. Britven from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2019 Filing 265 REDACTION to #261 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Brian A. Berg from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Callaway In Support of Motion to Preclude Brian A. Berg from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2019 Filing 264 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John R. Schleppenbach on behalf of Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7175290. (Schleppenbach, John)
March 11, 2019 Filing 263 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Thomas W. Britven from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie Skaff in Support of Motion to Preclude Thomas W. Britven from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2019 Filing 262 SEALED MOTION To Strike Ian D. Jestice as Expert Witness, Jestice Opening Expert Report, Jestice Rebuttal Report, and Defendants' Notice of Errata by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 11, 2019 Filing 261 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Brian A. Berg from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Callaway In Support of Motion to Preclude Brian A. Berg from Offering Certain Opinions at Trial, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2019 Filing 260 SEALED MOTION To Strike The Expert Reports and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D. Regarding Damages by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 11, 2019 Filing 259 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Thomas W. Britven by Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Myers, Gregg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
March 11, 2019 Filing 258 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Telephone Conference held on March 7, 2019 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-209-4013. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (19 pages) Motion to Redact due 4/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2019. (jm, )
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants are to search for and produce emails of Nick Zhang and Alan Armstrong in the manner discussed in the March 7, 2019, telephonic hearing. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/8/2019. (baf, )
March 8, 2019 During the March 7, 2019 Telephone Conference, the Court granted the parties leave to exceed the 15-page limit on Daubert motions; parties were granted a 25-page limit. (tls)
March 7, 2019 Filing 256 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CNEX Labs, Inc. for proceedings held on 3/7/2019 Telephone conference before Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. (Fisher, Jeffrey) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Jan Mason, on 3/8/2019) (slo)
March 7, 2019 Filing 255 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. for proceedings held on 3/7/2019 discovery dispute before Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. (Coleman, Jesse) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Jan Mason, on 3/8/2019) (slo)
March 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference to address a discovery dispute held on 3/7/2019. (Court Reporter Jan Mason) (no attachment) (tls)
March 7, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference to address a discovery dispute set for 3/7/2019 04:15 PM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 4:15 PM: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (tls)
March 6, 2019 Filing 254 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Hotline Conference Proceedings held on 3/5/2019 before Judge Nowak. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Dipti Patel,Telephone number: 847-848-4907. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Motion to Redact due 3/27/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2019. (kls, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 HOTLINE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 3/5/2019. (baf, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 252 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang for proceedings held on March 5, 2019 Hotline Conference before Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Mar, Eugene) (To be transcribed by Dipti Patel. Forwarded to transcriber Dipti Patel on 3/5/2019)(slo)
March 5, 2019 Filing 251 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. for proceedings held on 3/5/2019 Hotline Conference before Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Coleman, Jesse) (To be transcribed by Dipti Patel. Forwarded to transcriber Dipti Patel on 3/5/2019)
March 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak: Hotline Conference held on 3/5/2019. (1:06 p.m. - 1:34 p.m.) (Court Reporter Digital Recording.) (klee, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 250 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean Kristofer Apple on behalf of Yiren Ronnie Huang (Apple, Sean)
March 4, 2019 Filing 249 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregg Aaron Myers on behalf of Yiren Ronnie Huang (Myers, Gregg)
March 4, 2019 Filing 248 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Chilton Callaway on behalf of CNEX Labs, Inc. (Callaway, Daniel)
March 1, 2019 Filing 247 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jamaica Potts Szeliga on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7162365. (Szeliga, Jamaica)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER - DENYING #238 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/28/2019. (baf, )
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER - GRANTING #244 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Discovery Deadlines filed by Huawei Technologies Co., LTD., Futurewei Technologies, Inc. Fact Discovery due by 3/31/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/26/2019. (baf, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 244 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Discovery Deadlines by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
February 22, 2019 Filing 243 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #209 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Their Answer and Counterclaims filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
February 19, 2019 Filing 242 REDACTION to #241 Sealed Response to Motion by CNEX Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dacus, Deron)
February 19, 2019 Filing 241 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #238 Fourth MOTION to Compel filed by CNEX Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dacus, Deron)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER. The Court enters the following expedited briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Fourth Motion to Compel (Dkt. #238 ). It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their Motion to Compel on Thursday, February 14, 2019, which shall be limited to 10 pages in length. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiffs' Fourth Motion to Compel on Tuesday, February 19, 2019, which shall be limited to 10 pages in length. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/15/2019. (baf, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 239 REPLY in Support re #209 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Their Answer and Counterclaims filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
February 14, 2019 Filing 238 Fourth MOTION to Compel by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
February 14, 2019 Filing 237 NOTICE by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. of Objection to Designation of Kivu Consulting, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Siebman, Clyde)
February 8, 2019 Filing 236 RESPONSE in Opposition re #209 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Their Answer and Counterclaims filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER - DENYING #221 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/8/2019. (baf, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 234 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Telephone Conference held on February 6, 2019 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-209-4013. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (47 pages) Motion to Redact due 3/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2019. (jm, )
February 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/6/2019. Telephone hearing held concerning Defendant Yiren Ronnie Huang's Opposed Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel (Dkt. #228). Court granted Defendant's motion. Court indicated Counsel may confer regarding deposition schedules, but the Court will not intervene and change the dates of the depositions currently scheduled. Discussion held concerning Defendant CNEX Labs, Inc.'s Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to Produce Certain Documents (Dkt. #226). Court denied the motion and ordered that Defendants produce the documents made subject of the motion by 5:00 p.m. today, February 6, 2019. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (no attachment) (tls)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER - GRANTING #228 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Attorney for Defendant Yiren Ronnie Huang. Attorney Jeffrey Mark Fisher; Bryan Alexander Kohm; Jeffrey G Lau; Eugene Y Mar; Michael J Sacksteder; Stephanie Powers Skaff; Nadia Arid and Deron R Dacus terminated. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/6/2019. (baf, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 232 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang for proceedings held on February 6, 2019 Telephonic discovery hearing before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Mar, Eugene) (Forwarded to Court Reporter Jan Mason on 2/6/2019)(slo)
February 6, 2019 Filing 231 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. for proceedings held on 2/06/2019 Discovery hearing before Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. (Coleman, Jesse) (Forwarded to Court Reporter Jan Mason on 2/6/2019)(slo)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER - DENYING AS MOOT #226 Motion for Extension of Time to Produce Certain Documents. It is further ORDERED that Defendants are to produce the documents made subject of the motion (Dkt. #226 ) today, February 6, 2019, by 5:00 pm. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/6/2019. (baf, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 229 RESPONSE in Opposition re #226 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Certain Documents filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
February 5, 2019 Filing 228 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyz, Ryan)
February 4, 2019 Filing 227 RESPONSE in Opposition re #221 MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony on Certain Topics filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
February 4, 2019 Filing 226 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Certain Documents by CNEX Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kohm, Bryan)
February 4, 2019 Filing 225 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erin Catherine Jones on behalf of Yiren Ronnie Huang (Jones, Erin)
February 4, 2019 Filing 224 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan A Tyz on behalf of Yiren Ronnie Huang (Tyz, Ryan)
February 4, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 2/6/2019 9:00 AM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 8:55 AM: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (tls)
January 31, 2019 Filing 223 REDACTION to #207 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Siebman, Clyde)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Reconsider Denial of Defendants; Request to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Documents Related to HUAWEI_TX_0001452 and HUAWEI_TX_0001453 and CNEX Related Communications with the Chinese Government (Dkt. #175 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/31/2019. (baf, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 221 MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony on Certain Topics by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
January 30, 2019 Filing 220 REDACTION to #208 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion to Reconsider by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER - GRANTING IN PART #146 Sealed Motion. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/29/2019. (baf, )
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER - DENYING #143 Sealed Motion. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/29/2019. (baf, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 217 REDACTION to #216 Sealed Document by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dacus, Deron)
January 28, 2019 Filing 216 Sealed Document. Defendants' Second Amended Counterclaims and Answer to Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dacus, Deron)
January 28, 2019 Filing 215 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Telephone Conference held on January 25, 2019 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-209-4013. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (73 pages) Motion to Redact due 2/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2019. (jm, )
January 27, 2019 Counsel are reminded that the Court has not opted out of this court's Local Rules concerning courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of pleadings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzants chambers. (tls)
January 25, 2019 Filing 214 REDACTION to #212 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment of No Evidence on Defendants' Counterclaims by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 213 REDACTION to #209 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Their Answer and Counterclaims by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' [Proposed] Second Amended Counterclaims and Answer to Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Defendants' [Proposed] Second Amended Counterclaims and Answer to Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Defendants' [Proposed] Second Amended Counterclaims and Answer to Second Amended Complaint, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 212 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #160 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of No Evidence On Defendants' Counterclaims filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 211 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #158 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) On Their Breach Of Contract Claim For Failure To Disclose Patent Applications (Count II) filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 210 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #162 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants Sur-Reply In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Amended Counterclaims filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 209 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Their Answer and Counterclaims by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' [Proposed] Second Amended Counterclaims and Answer to Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Defendants' [Proposed] Second Amended Counterclaims and Answer to Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Defendants' [Proposed] Second Amended Counterclaims and Answer to Second Amended Complaint, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 208 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #175 SEALED MOTION filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
January 25, 2019 Filing 207 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #161 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Second Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 13, 14, 15, 16, 17 and 21 of the Second Amended Complaint filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Siebman, Clyde)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER. The Court hereby RESETS the Final Pretrial Conference of this case, and sets the Jury Selection and Trial of this case before the undersigned, as follows: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2019 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Jury Selection/Trial set for 6/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/25/2019. (baf, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 205 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #159 SEALED MOTION Defendants' First Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication on Plaintiffs' Breach of Contract Claims filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
January 25, 2019 Filing 204 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. for proceedings held on 1/25/2019 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. (Coleman, Jesse) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Jan Mason on 1/25/2019)(slo).
January 25, 2019 Filing 203 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang for proceedings held on January 25, 2019 Telephone conference regarding discovery dispute before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Mar, Eugene) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Jan Mason on 1/25/2019) (slo).
January 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference regarding discovery disputes held on 1/25/2019. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (kkc, )
January 23, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference to address a discovery dispute set for Friday 1/25/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Amos Mazzant. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 8:55 AM: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (tls)
January 22, 2019 Filing 202 REDACTION to #197 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,, Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Second Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, and 21 of the Second Amended Complaint by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eugene Mar, #2 Exhibit 1 to Mar Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Mar Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Mar Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Mar Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Mar Declaration, #7 Declaration of Charlie Dong, #8 Exhibit 1 to Dong Declaration, #9 Declaration of Brad Bonnington, #10 Exhibit 1 to Bonnington Declaration)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
January 22, 2019 Filing 201 REDACTION to #198 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Siebman, Clyde)
January 22, 2019 Filing 200 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #163 MOTION to Dismiss (Anti-SLAPP) filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Kohm, Bryan)
January 18, 2019 Filing 199 REPLY to Response to Motion re #162 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants Amended Counterclaims filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
January 18, 2019 Filing 198 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #160 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of No Evidence On Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Siebman, Clyde)
January 18, 2019 Filing 197 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #161 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Second Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 13, 14, 15, 16, 17 and 21 of the Second Amended Complaint filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Charlie Dong, #2 Attachment to Dong Declaration, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Brad Bonnington, #4 Exhibit 1 to Bonnington Declaration, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Eugene Mar, #6 Exhibit 1 to Mar Declaration, #7 Exhibit 2 to Mar Declaration, #8 Exhibit 3 to Mar Declaration, #9 Exhibit 4 to Mar Declaration, #10 Exhibit 5 to Mar Declaration)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
January 18, 2019 Filing 196 REPLY to Response to Motion re #158 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) On Their Breach Of Contract Claim For Failure To Disclose Patent Applications (Count II) filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
January 17, 2019 Filing 195 REPLY to Response to Motion re #159 SEALED MOTION Defendants' First Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication on Plaintiffs' Breach of Contract Claims filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
January 17, 2019 Filing 194 REDACTION to #193 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Dacus, Deron)
January 17, 2019 Filing 193 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #175 SEALED MOTION filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Dacus, Deron)
January 17, 2019 Filing 192 REDACTION to #185 Sealed Response to Motion by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
January 15, 2019 Filing 191 REPLY to Response to Motion re #163 MOTION to Dismiss (Anti-SLAPP) filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
January 14, 2019 Filing 190 REDACTION to #184 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,,, Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment of No Evidence on Defendants' Amended Counterclaims by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yiren "Ronnie" Huang in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibits 1 to 5 to Huang Declaration, #3 Declaration of Eugene Mar in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibits A to KK to Mar Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey) (Attachment 5 replaced on 1/15/2019) (rpc, ).
January 14, 2019 Filing 189 REDACTION to #183 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,, for Summary Judgment (Partial) On Their Breach of Contract Claim For Failure To Disclose Patent Applications (Count II) by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shannon Turner, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Declaration of Yiren Huang, #22 Exhibit 1, #23 Exhibit 2, #24 Exhibit 3, #25 Exhibit 4, #26 Exhibit 5, #27 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohm, Bryan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 188 REDACTION to #182 Response to Non-Motion,, Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Amended Counterclaims by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yiren "Ronnie" Huang, #2 Exhibits 1 to 5 to Huang Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey) (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/15/2019) (rpc, ).
January 14, 2019 Filing 187 REDACTION to #181 Sealed Response to Motion,,, by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
January 14, 2019 Filing 186 REDACTION to #180 Sealed Response to Motion, by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
January 11, 2019 Filing 185 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #175 SEALED MOTION filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
January 10, 2019 Filing 184 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #160 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of No Evidence On Defendants' Counterclaims - Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment of No Evidence on Defendants' Counterclaims filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yiren "Ronnie" Huang in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment, #2 Ex 1 to Huang Decl, #3 Ex 2 to Huang Decl, #4 Ex 3 to Huang Decl, #5 Ex 4 to Huang Decl, #6 Ex 5 to Huang Decl, #7 Declaration of Eugene Mar in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment, #8 Ex A to Mar Decl, #9 Ex B to Mar Decl, #10 Ex C to Mar Decl, #11 Ex D to Mar Decl, #12 Ex E to Mar Decl, #13 Ex F to Mar Decl, #14 Ex G to Mar Decl, #15 Ex H to Mar Decl, #16 Ex I to Mar Decl, #17 Ex J to Mar Decl, #18 Ex K to Mar Decl, #19 Ex L to Mar Decl, #20 Ex M to Mar Decl, #21 Ex N to Mar Decl, #22 Ex O to Mar Decl, #23 Ex P to Mar Decl, #24 Ex Q to Mar Decl, #25 Ex R to Mar Decl, #26 Ex S to Mar Decl, #27 Ex T to Mar Decl, #28 Ex U to Mar Decl, #29 Ex V to Mar Decl, #30 Ex W to Mar Decl, #31 Ex X to Mar Decl, #32 Ex Y to Mar Decl, #33 Ex Z to Mar Decl, #34 Ex AA to Mar Decl, #35 Ex BB to Mar Decl, #36 Ex CC to Mar Decl, #37 Ex DD to Mar Decl, #38 Ex EE to Mar Decl, #39 Ex FF to Mar Decl, #40 Ex GG to Mar Decl, #41 Ex HH to Mar Decl, #42 Ex II to Mar Decl, #43 Ex JJ to Mar Decl, #44 Ex KK to Mar Decl, #45 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey) (Attachment 45 replaced on 1/11/2019) (baf, ).
January 10, 2019 Filing 183 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #158 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) On Their Breach Of Contract Claim For Failure To Disclose Patent Applications (Count II) filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shannon E. Turner In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 1 to Turner Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Turner Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Turner Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Turner Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Turner Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Turner Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Turner Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Turner Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Turner Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Turner Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Turner Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Turner Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 to Turner Declaration, #15 Exhibit 14 to Turner Declaration, #16 Exhibit 15 to Turner Declaration, #17 Exhibit 16 to Turner Declaration, #18 Exhibit 17 to Turner Declaration, #19 Exhibit 18 to Turner Declaration, #20 Exhibit 19 to Turner Declaration, #21 Declaration of Yiren "Ronnie" Huang In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment, #22 Exhibit 1 to Huang Declaration, #23 Exhibit 2 to Huang Declaration, #24 Exhibit 3 to Huang Declaration, #25 Exhibit 4 to Huang Declaration, #26 Exhibit 5 to Huang Declaration, #27 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohm, Bryan)
January 10, 2019 Filing 182 SEALED RESPONSE by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang to #162 Motion for Summary Judgment - Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Amended Counterclaims filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yiren "Ronnie" Huang in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment, #2 Ex 1 to Huang Declaration, #3 Ex 2 to Huang Declaration, #4 Ex 3 to Huang Declaration, #5 Ex 4 to Huang Declaration, #6 Ex 5 to Huang Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
January 10, 2019 Filing 181 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #161 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Second Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 13, 14, 15, 16, 17 and 21 of the Second Amended Complaint filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
January 10, 2019 Filing 180 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #159 SEALED MOTION Defendants' First Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication on Plaintiffs' Breach of Contract Claims filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
January 9, 2019 Filing 179 REDACTION to #178 Sealed Response to Motion, by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan Kohm, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Kohm, Bryan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 178 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #163 MOTION to Dismiss (Anti-SLAPP) filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan Kohm, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Kohm, Bryan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 177 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #139 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Counterclaims filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2019 Filing 176 REDACTION to #175 SEALED MOTION by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O)(Dacus, Deron)
January 4, 2019 Filing 175 SEALED MOTION by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O)(Dacus, Deron)
January 3, 2019 Filing 174 REDACTION to #171 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Siebman, Clyde)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER - GRANTING #172 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #163 MOTION to Dismiss (Anti-SLAPP). Responses due by 1/8/2019 at 5:00 p.m. CT; Replies due by 1/15/2019 at 5:00 p.m. CT; Sur-Replies due by 1/22/2019 at 5:00 p.m. CT. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/3/2019. (baf, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 172 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #163 MOTION to Dismiss (Anti-SLAPP) by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
December 28, 2018 Filing 171 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #139 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Counterclaims filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Siebman, Clyde)
December 28, 2018 Filing 170 REDACTION to #169 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
December 26, 2018 Filing 169 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #143 SEALED MOTION To Compel the Production of Plaintiffs' Source Code filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
December 21, 2018 Filing 168 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Telephone Conference held on December 17, 2018 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-209-4013. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (83 pages) Motion to Redact due 1/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2019. (jm, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 167 REDACTION to #166 Sealed Response to Motion Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Counterclaims by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2018 Filing 166 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #139 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Counterclaims filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2018 Filing 165 REDACTION to #161 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Second Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 13, 14, 15, 16, 17 and 21 of the Second Amended Complaint by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eugene Y. Mar, #2 Ex. 1 to Mar Decl., #3 Ex. 2 to Mar Decl., #4 Ex. 3 to Mar Decl., #5 Ex. 4 to Mar Decl., #6 Ex. 5 to Mar Decl., #7 Ex. 6 to Mar Decl., #8 Ex. 7 to Mar Decl., #9 Ex. 8 to Mar Decl., #10 Ex. 9 to Mar Decl., #11 Ex. 10 to Mar Decl., #12 Ex. 11 to Mar Decl., #13 Ex. 12 to Mar Decl., #14 Ex. 13 to Mar Decl., #15 Ex. 14 to Mar Decl., #16 Ex. 15 to Mar Decl., #17 Ex. 16 to Mar Decl., #18 Ex. 17 to Mar Decl., #19 Ex. 18 to Mar Decl., #20 Ex. 19 to Mar Decl., #21 Declaration of Yiren Ronnie Huang, #22 Declaration of Dr. Alan Armstrong, #23 Declaration of Charlie Dong, #24 Declaration of Joe DeFranco, #25 Declaration of Liao Sha, #26 Declaration of Yong Chen, #27 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2018 Filing 164 REDACTION to #159 SEALED MOTION Defendants' First Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication on Plaintiffs' Breach of Contract Claims by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Fisher, #2 Ex. 1 to Fisher Decl., #3 Ex. 2 to Fisher Decl., #4 Ex. 3 to Fisher Decl., #5 Declaration Yiren Ronnie Huang, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
December 19, 2018 Filing 163 MOTION to Dismiss (Anti-SLAPP) by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
December 19, 2018 Filing 162 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Amended Counterclaims by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
December 19, 2018 Filing 161 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Second Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 13, 14, 15, 16, 17 and 21 of the Second Amended Complaint by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eugene Y. Mar, #2 Ex. 1 to Mar Decl., #3 Ex. 2 to Mar Decl., #4 Ex. 3 to Mar Decl., #5 Ex. 4 to Mar Decl., #6 Ex. 5 to Mar Decl., #7 Ex. 6 to Mar Decl., #8 Ex. 7 to Mar Decl., #9 Ex. 8 to Mar Decl., #10 Ex. 9 to Mar Decl., #11 Ex. 10 to Mar Decl., #12 Ex. 11 to Mar Decl., #13 Ex. 12 to Mar Decl., #14 Ex. 13 to Mar Decl., #15 Ex. 14 to Mar Decl., #16 Ex. 15 to Mar Decl., #17 Ex. 16 to Mar Decl., #18 Ex. 17 to Mar Decl., #19 Ex. 18 to Mar Decl., #20 Ex. 19 to Mar Decl., #21 Declaration of Yiren Ronnie Huang, #22 Declaration of Dr. Alan Armstrong, #23 Declaration of Charlie Dong, #24 Declaration of Joe DeFranco, #25 Declaration of Liao Sha, #26 Declaration of Yong Chen, #27 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey) (Attachment 27 replaced on 12/20/2018) (baf, ).
December 19, 2018 Filing 160 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of No Evidence On Defendants' Counterclaims by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
December 19, 2018 Filing 159 SEALED MOTION Defendants' First Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication on Plaintiffs' Breach of Contract Claims by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Fisher, #2 Exhibit 1 to Fisher Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Fisher Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Fisher Decl., #5 Declaration Yiren Ronnie Huang, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey) (Attachment 6 replaced on 12/20/2018) (baf, ).
December 19, 2018 Filing 158 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) On Their Breach Of Contract Claim For Failure To Disclose Patent Applications (Count II) by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
December 19, 2018 Filing 157 REDACTION to #149 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Dacus, Deron)
December 18, 2018 Filing 156 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nadia Arid on behalf of CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7068405. (Arid, Nadia)
December 18, 2018 Filing 155 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey G Lau on behalf of CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang (Lau, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2018 Filing 154 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Eugene Y Mar on behalf of CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7067821. (Mar, Eugene)
December 18, 2018 Filing 153 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang for proceedings held on 12/17/2018 Telephonic hearing before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Fisher, Jeffrey) (Forwarded to Official Court Reporter, Jan Mason on 12/18/2018) Modified on 12/18/2018 (slo).
December 17, 2018 Filing 152 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. for proceedings held on 12/17/2018 discovery dispute before Judge Mazzant. (Coleman, Jesse) (Forwarded to Official Court Reporter, Jan Mason on 12/18/2018) Modified on 12/18/2018 (slo).
December 17, 2018 Filing 151 REDACTION to #146 SEALED MOTION to Compel Further Production of Plaintiffs' Emails by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Dacus, Deron)
December 17, 2018 Filing 150 RESPONSE in Opposition re #146 SEALED MOTION to Compel Further Production of Plaintiffs' Emails filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit of Tushar Vaidya, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
December 17, 2018 Filing 149 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #143 SEALED MOTION To Compel the Production of Plaintiffs' Source Code filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Dacus, Deron)
December 17, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference to address a discovery dispute set for 12/17/2018 at 2:30 p.m. before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 2:25 p.m.: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (kkc)(kkc, )
December 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference regarding discovery disputes held on 12/17/2018 at 2:33 p.m. Call adjourned at 4:30 p.m. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (kkc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 148 REDACTION to #147 Sealed Response to Motion, by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
December 13, 2018 Filing 147 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #143 SEALED MOTION To Compel the Production of Plaintiffs' Source Code filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
December 11, 2018 Filing 146 SEALED MOTION to Compel Further Production of Plaintiffs' Emails by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4)(Dacus, Deron)
December 11, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION TO COMPEL submitted document #145 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 145 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** SEALED MOTION to Compel Further Production of Plaintiffs' Emails by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4)(Dacus, Deron) Modified on 12/11/2018 (baf, ).
December 7, 2018 Filing 144 REDACTION to #143 SEALED MOTION To Compel the Production of Plaintiffs' Source Code by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey M. Fisher, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2018 Filing 143 SEALED MOTION To Compel the Production of Plaintiffs' Source Code by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey Fisher, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey) (Attachment 8 replaced on 12/10/2018) (baf, ).
December 7, 2018 Filing 142 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Telephone Conference held on December 3, 2018 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-209-4013. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (41 pages) Motion to Redact due 12/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2019. (jm, )
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER. The Court therefore ORDERS that the following actions shall be completed by the date indicated.1Any dates not reset herein shall continue as set forth in the Amended Scheduling Order (Dkt. #129 ). January 14, 2019 Deadline for Plaintiffs and Defendants to serve a list identifying asserted trade secrets. January 28, 2019 Disclosure of expert testimony pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) and Local Rule CV-26(b) on issues for which the party bears the burden of proof. February 25, 2019 Disclosure of expert testimony pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) and Local Rule CV-26(b) on issues for which the party does not bear the burden of proof. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/6/2018. (baf, )
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER. Within fourteen (14) days of this Order, the parties shall notify the Court of any reason why the two cases, 4:18-cv-679 and 4:17-cv-893, should not be consolidated. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/6/2018. (baf, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 139 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Counterclaims by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
December 4, 2018 Filing 138 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang for proceedings held on 12/3/2018 Telephonic dispute hearing before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Skaff, Stephanie) (Forwarded to Official Court Reporter, Jan Mason on 12/4/2018) (Main Document 138 replaced with flattened image on 12/4/2018)(slo)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER. On December 3, 2018, the Court held a telephonic hearing in which Defendants requested the production of the source code for Plaintiffs' 1812, 1813, and 1822 controllers. Any motion by Defendants concerning the above-mentioned requests must be filed no later than Friday, December 7, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. Any response must be filed no later than Thursday, December 13, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/4/2018. (baf, )
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #115 Second MOTION to Compel filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #116 Third MOTION to Compel filed by Huawei Technologies Co., LTD., Futurewei Technologies, Inc. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/4/2018. (baf, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 135 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. for proceedings held on 12/03/2018 before Judge Mazzant. (Coleman, Jesse) (Forwarded to Official Court Reporter, Jan Mason on 12/3/2018)(Main Document 135 replaced with flattened image on 12/3/2018) (slo, ). Modified on 12/3/2018 (slo, ).
November 28, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference to address a discovery dispute set for 12/3/2018 08:00 AM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 7:55 AM: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (tls)
November 21, 2018 Filing 134 RESPONSE in Opposition re #131 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims (Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims) filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
November 21, 2018 Filing 133 REDACTION to #132 Sealed Document Defendants' First Amended Counterclaims and Answer to Second Amended Complaint by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
November 21, 2018 Filing 132 Sealed Document. Defendants' First Amended Counterclaims and Answer to Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fisher, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2018 Filing 131 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
October 19, 2018 Filing 130 NOTICE by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang To The Court Regarding Defendants Second Motion To Compel (Kohm, Bryan)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2019 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 1/9/2019. Discovery due by 2/28/2019. Expert Witness List due by 1/28/2019. Jury instructions due by 4/24/2019. Motions due by 12/19/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/8/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/17/2018. (rpc, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 128 REDACTION to #127 Sealed Document by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dacus, Deron)
October 16, 2018 Filing 127 Sealed Document.Defendants' Counterclaims and Answer to Second Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dacus, Deron)
October 12, 2018 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re #116 Third MOTION to Compel filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Siebman, Clyde)
October 12, 2018 Filing 125 REPLY to Response to Motion re #115 Second MOTION to Compel filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Kohm, Bryan)
October 11, 2018 Filing 124 RESPONSE in Opposition re #116 Third MOTION to Compel [Redacted Version] filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan A. Kohm In Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Text of Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Third Motion to Compel)(Kohm, Bryan)
October 9, 2018 Filing 123 RESPONSE in Opposition re #115 Second MOTION to Compel filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
October 9, 2018 Filing 122 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #116 Third MOTION to Compel filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan A. Kohm In Support of Defendants CNEX Labs, Inc.'s and Yiren "Ronnie" Huang's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Third Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Text of Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Third Motion to Compel)(Kohm, Bryan)
October 9, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Telephone Conference held on October 4, 2018 before Judge Amos L. Mazzand. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-209-4013. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (16 pages) Motion to Redact due 10/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2019. (jm, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 120 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang for proceedings held on 10/04/2018 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2018 Filing 119 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. for proceedings held on 10/04/2018 telephone conference before Judge Mazzant. (Coleman, Jesse)
October 4, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference held on 10/4/2018. Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (kkc, )
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/2/2018. (daj, )
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #63 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/2/2018. (daj, )
October 2, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 10/4/2018 03:30 PM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 3:25 PM: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (tls)
October 1, 2018 Filing 116 Third MOTION to Compel by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
October 1, 2018 Filing 115 Second MOTION to Compel by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan A. Kohm, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohm, Bryan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 114 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Telephone Conference held on Sept. 26, 2018 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-209-4013. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (87 pages) Motion to Redact due 10/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/31/2018. (jm, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 113 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang for proceedings held on 09-26-2018 Discovery Disputes Hearing before Judge Amos L. Mazzant. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2018 Filing 112 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang for proceedings held on 09/26/2018 before Judge Mazzant. (Kohm, Bryan)
September 27, 2018 Filing 111 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. for proceedings held on 09/26/2018 before Judge Mazzant. (Coleman, Jesse)
September 27, 2018 Filing 110 Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective order by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. Agreed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Coleman, Jesse)
September 26, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Discovery Dispute held via telephone on 9/26/2018. (Court Reporter Jan Mason) (no attachment) (tls)
September 24, 2018 NOTICE of Resetting of Time of Hearing: Telephone Conference reset for 9/26/2018 02:30 PM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys directed to call the conference number at 2:25 p.m. (tls)
September 21, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference to address a discovery dispute set for Wednesday 9/26/2018 05:00 PM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 5:00 PM: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (tls)
September 19, 2018 Filing 109 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Seeking Entry of Protective Order by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Coleman, Jesse) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2018: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
August 23, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang (Dacus, Deron)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' and Defendants' separate Motions to Compel (Dkt. #83; Dkt. #88) are hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as specified herein. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/14/2018. (daj, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Mark Fisher on behalf of CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6891515. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Stephanie Powers Skaff on behalf of CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6891473. (Skaff, Stephanie)
August 2, 2018 Filing 104 REPLY to Response to Motion re #88 Amended SEALED MOTION to Compel filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan A. Kohm In Support of Defendants' Reply to the Amended Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit 1 [Filed Under Seal], #3 Exhibit 2 [Filed Under Seal], #4 Exhibit 3)(Kohm, Bryan)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #99 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal the Reply in Support of Amended Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/2/2018. (daj, )
August 1, 2018 Filing 102 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #88 Amended SEALED MOTION to Compel filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan A. Kohm In Support of Amended Motion to Compel, #2 [Sealed] Exhibit 1 to Kohm Declaration, #3 [Sealed] Exhibit 2 to Kohm Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Kohm Declaration)(Kohm, Bryan)
August 1, 2018 Filing 101 REPLY to Response to Motion re #83 Second MOTION to Compel filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Siebman, Clyde)
August 1, 2018 Filing 100 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN ERROR - ATTY CORRECTED AND REFILED AS DOCUMENT #102 ***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #99 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply to the Amended Motion to Compel and Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Declaration of Bryan A. Kohm In Support of Defendants' Reply to the Amended Motion to Compel filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan A. Kohm In Support of Defendants' Reply to the Amended Motion to Compel, #2 [Sealed] Exhibit 1 to Kohm Declaration, #3 [Sealed] Exhibit 2 to Kohm Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Kohm Declaration)(Kohm, Bryan) Modified on 8/2/2018 (daj, ).
August 1, 2018 Filing 99 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply to the Amended Motion to Compel and Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Declaration of Bryan A. Kohm In Support of Defendants' Reply to the Amended Motion to Compel by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Reply to Amended Motion to Compel)(Kohm, Bryan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 98 REDACTION to #96 Sealed Response to Motion, by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #95 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/30/2018. (daj, )
July 27, 2018 Filing 96 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #88 Amended SEALED MOTION to Compel filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
July 27, 2018 Filing 95 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document (Plaintiff's' Response to Defendants' Motion To Compel) by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
July 27, 2018 Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition re #83 Second MOTION to Compel Defendants CNEX Labs, Inc. and Yiren "Ronnie" Huang's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Compel filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan A. Kohm, #2 Declaration of Yiren "Ronnie" Huang, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohm, Bryan)
July 25, 2018 Filing 93 REDACTION to #88 Amended SEALED MOTION to Compel by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Kohm, Bryan)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #79 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/25/2018. (daj, )
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #87 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/25/2018. (daj, )
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #86 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/25/2018. (daj, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 89 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #88 Amended SEALED MOTION to Compel.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 [Sought to be Filed Under Seal], #5 Exhibit 5 [Sought to be Filed Under Seal], #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9 [Sought to be Filed Under Seal], #10 Exhibit 10 [Sought to be Filed Under Seal], #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15 [Sought to be Filed Under Seal], #16 Declaration of Rongsheng Wang In Support of Amended Motion to Compel, #17 Text of Proposed Order Granting Amended Motion to Compel)(Kohm, Bryan)
July 23, 2018 Filing 88 Amended SEALED MOTION to Compel by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibit 4, #2 Sealed Exhibit 5, #3 Sealed Exhibit 9, #4 Sealed Exhibit 10)(Kohm, Bryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2018: #5 Text of Proposed Order) (daj, ).
July 23, 2018 Filing 87 Unopposed MOTION to Seal for Leave to File Under Seal by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal)(Kohm, Bryan)
July 23, 2018 Filing 86 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Motion to Compel by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Motion to Compel)(Kohm, Bryan)
July 23, 2018 Filing 85 REDACTION to #82 SEALED MOTION to Compel by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Kohm, Bryan)
July 23, 2018 Filing 84 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #82 SEALED MOTION to Compel.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 11, #8 Exhibit 12, #9 Exhibit 13, #10 Exhibit 14, #11 Declaration of Rongsheng Wang, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohm, Bryan)
July 20, 2018 Filing 83 Second MOTION to Compel by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
July 20, 2018 Filing 82 SEALED MOTION to Compel by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Declaration of Sylvia Lai)(Kohm, Bryan)
July 20, 2018 Filing 81 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - NOTIFICATION FROM ATTORNEY FILED IN ERROR*** REDACTION to #80 MOTION to Compel by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Kohm, Bryan) Modified on 7/23/2018 (kls, ).
July 20, 2018 Filing 80 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN ERROR - TO BE REFILED*** MOTION to Compel by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan A. Kohm, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Declaration of Rongsheng Wang, #18 Declaration of Sylvia Lai, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohm, Bryan) Modified on 7/23/2018 (kls, ). Modified on 7/23/2018 (kls, ).
July 20, 2018 Filing 79 Unopposed MOTION to Seal for Leave to File Under Seal by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohm, Bryan)
July 20, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang to The Court Regarding Defendants' Motion to Compel (Kohm, Bryan)
July 20, 2018 Filing 77 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended(Folsom, David)
July 16, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Hearing Proceedings held on 7/13/2018 before Judge Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Toni Hudson,Telephone number: 361 949 2988. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Motion to Redact due 8/6/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2018. (kls, )
July 13, 2018 Filing 75 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang for proceedings held on July 13, 2018 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. (Kohm, Bryan)
July 13, 2018 Filing 74 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. for proceedings held on July 13, 2018, telephonic conference addressing discovery dispute before Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. (Coleman, Jesse)
July 13, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephonic hearing regarding discovery disputes held on 7/13/2018 at 2:02 p.m.. Parties will file any motions to compel by 7/20/2018, responses due by 7/27/18, and any replies due 8/1/18. Call adjourned at 2:30 p.m. (Court Reporter Digital Recording.) (kkc, )
July 10, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference to address a discovery dispute set for Friday 7/13/2018 02:00 PM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 1:55 pm: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (tls)
July 5, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE from 5th Circuit Court of Appeals: IT IS ORDERED that the petition for writ of mandamus is DENIED; re #70 NOTICE from 5th Circuit Court of Appeals of filing of Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Yiren Ronnie Huang and CNEX Labs, Inc. (kls, )
June 21, 2018 Filing 72 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #63 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
June 14, 2018 Filing 71 REPLY to Response to Motion re #63 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Sacksteder, Michael)
June 11, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE from 5th Circuit Court of Appeals of filing of Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Yiren Ronnie Huang and CNEX Labs, Inc. (kls, )
June 8, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang Notice of Filing of Petition for Writ of Mandamus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Petition for Writ of Mandamus], #2 Exhibit B (Part 1 of 2) [Appendix to Petition for Writ of Mandamus], #3 Exhibit B (Part 2 of 2))(Sacksteder, Michael)
June 7, 2018 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #63 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
June 1, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Mark Geiszler on behalf of Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. (Geiszler, Steven)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Emergency Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal of Defendants CNEX Labs, Inc. and Yiren Ronnie Huang (Dkt. #60 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/1/2018. (rpc, )
May 31, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. Of Mediation (Siebman, Clyde)
May 25, 2018 Filing 64 REPLY TO RESPONSE to #60 Emergency MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Sacksteder, Michael)
May 24, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael)
May 18, 2018 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #60 Emergency MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
May 9, 2018 Filing 61 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang, filed by Huawei Technologies Co., LTD., Futurewei Technologies, Inc..(Siebman, Clyde)
May 8, 2018 Filing 60 Emergency MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal and Memorandum in Support Thereof by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants CNEX Labs, Inc.'s and Yiren "Ronnie" Huang's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue and for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) (Dkt. #14 ) is hereby DENIED as moot, Defendants CNEX Labs, Inc. and Yiren Ronnie Huang's Motion for Leave to Address Issues Raised at the April 2, 2018 Hearing (Dkt. #56 ) is hereby GRANTED, and Defendants CNEX Labs, Inc. and Yiren "Ronnie" Huang's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue and for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) (Dkt. #34 ) is hereby DENIED as to the Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue and hereby GRANTED in part as to the Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is granted as to Count 21 and the Court hereby DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE corporate raiding as its own independent cause of action. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint to address the deficiencies identified as to Counts 1517, 20, and 22, and may also include the allegations of corporate raiding as part of Plaintiffs' claim for unfair competition within fourteen (14) days of this Order. The motion is denied as to the remainder of the grounds asserted. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/25/2018. (baf, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER - GRANTING #45 Motion For Leave to File Under Seal. Before the Court is Defendants CNEX Labs, Inc. and Yiren "Ronnie" Huang's Motion For Leave to File Under Seal (Dkt. #45 ). After consideration of the motion, the Court finds that it is well-taken and should be GRANTED.Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/25/2018. (baf, )
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2019 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 11/20/2018 for Plaintiff and by 12/3/2018 for Defendant. Discovery due by 2/12/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 5/9/2018. Joint Proposed Jury instructions/Form of Verdict due by 1/18/2019. Motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, or other dispositive motions due by 12/3/2018. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 4/2/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/19/2018. (baf, )
April 12, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Address Issues Raised at the April 2, 2018 Hearing by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bryan A. Kohm, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/13/2018) (baf, ).
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER - GRANTING #52 Agreed Motion; terminating #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The April 18, 2018 hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is hereby cancelled. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/12/2018. (baf, )
April 5, 2018 Filing 54 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang for proceedings held on 4/2/18 - Motion to Dismiss before Judge Amos L. Mazzant. (Kohm, Bryan)
April 5, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Motion Hearing held on April 2, 2018 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-209-4013. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (58 pages) Redaction Request due 4/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2018. (jm, )
April 4, 2018 Filing 52 Agreed MOTION by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER - DENYING AS MOOT #31 Motion to Expedite; GRANTING IN PART #35 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/4/2018. (baf, )
April 2, 2018 Filing 50 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue and for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Forrest, Elizabeth)
April 2, 2018 Filing 49 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Motion Hearing held on 4/2/2018 re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (dm, )
March 30, 2018 Filing 48 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #35 Emergency MOTION to Compel filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan Kohm, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Sacksteder, Michael)
March 30, 2018 Filing 47 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT TO MAIN DOCUMENT #46 : Exhibit A to the Declaration of Yiren Ronnie Huang attached as Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Bryan Kohm in Support of Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Sacksteder, Michael)
March 30, 2018 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue and for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan Kohm, #2 Exhibit 1)(Sacksteder, Michael)
March 30, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to the Declaration of Yiren Ronnie Huang by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael)
March 28, 2018 Filing 44 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #31 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
March 23, 2018 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #35 Emergency MOTION to Compel filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
March 23, 2018 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue and for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 23, 2018 Due to the Court's civil trial docket, the March 28, 2018 Scheduling Conference is CANCELED. The Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (tls)
March 21, 2018 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan A. Kohm, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Sacksteder, Michael)
March 16, 2018 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 Emergency MOTION to Compel Answers to Expedited Interrogatories filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bryan Kohm, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Sacksteder, Michael)
March 14, 2018 Filing 39 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Siebman, Clyde) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2018: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER FOR EXPEDITED RESPONSE: On March 9, 2018, Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Compel Answers to Expedited Interrogatories (Dkt. #35) was filed. Defendants shall file a response no later than Friday, March 16, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. (Entered by Judge Mazzant on March 14, 2018 - no attachment). (tls)
March 13, 2018 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 12, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang of Service of Defendants' Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Sacksteder, Michael)
March 12, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. of Service of Rule 26 Disclosures (Coleman, Jesse)
March 9, 2018 Filing 35 Emergency MOTION to Compel by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 9, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue and for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alan Armstrong, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration of Yiren Huang, #4 Declaration of Michael Sacksteder, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2018 at 10:30 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. GRANTING #30 MOTION for Hearing (Expedited) Regarding Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Improper Venue filed by Huawei Technologies Co., LTD., Futurewei Technologies, Inc. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/5/2018. (baf, )
March 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2018 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/4/2018. (baf, )
February 27, 2018 Filing 31 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwegmann, Christopher)
February 26, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for Hearing (Expedited) Regarding Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Improper Venue by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - GRANTING #26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gabriel S Gross terminated. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/23/2018. (baf, )
February 23, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher John Schwegmann on behalf of CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang (Schwegmann, Christopher)
February 23, 2018 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang, filed by Huawei Technologies Co., LTD., Futurewei Technologies, Inc..(Siebman, Clyde)
February 22, 2018 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gross, Gabriel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/23/2018) (baf, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/23/2018) (baf, ).
February 16, 2018 Filing 25 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Sacksteder, Michael)
February 16, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Alexander Kohm on behalf of Yiren Ronnie Huang (Kohm, Bryan)
February 16, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Sacksteder on behalf of Yiren Ronnie Huang (Sacksteder, Michael)
February 16, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Paul Hashim, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - GRANTING IN PART #12 Motion to Expedite. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/13/2018. (baf, )
February 9, 2018 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery And To Preserve Evidence filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
February 9, 2018 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Siebman, Clyde)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS - Rule 16 Management Conference set for 3/28/2018 at 2:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 3/14/2018. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/7/2018. (baf, )
February 7, 2018 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CNEX Labs, Inc. (Sacksteder, Michael)
February 2, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery And To Preserve Evidence filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael)
February 2, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alan Armstrong, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Declaration of Yiren Huang, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Declaration of Michael Sacksteder, #10 Exhibit 1, #11 Exhibit 2, #12 Exhibit 3, #13 Exhibit 4, #14 Exhibit 5, #15 Exhibit 6, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael)
February 2, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) by CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alan Armstrong, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration of Yiren Huang, #4 Declaration of Michael Sacksteder, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael)
February 2, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Alexander Kohm on behalf of CNEX Labs, Inc. (Kohm, Bryan)
January 19, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery And To Preserve Evidence by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B1, #3 Exhibit B2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
January 19, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
January 18, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Yiren Ronnie Huang to 2/20/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
January 17, 2018 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Yiren Ronnie Huang.( Gross, Gabriel)
January 16, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CNEX Labs, Inc. to 2/20/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
January 12, 2018 Filing 9 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CNEX Labs, Inc..( Sacksteder, Michael)
January 9, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Huawei Technologies Co., LTD., Futurewei Technologies, Inc.. Yiren Ronnie Huang served on 12/28/2017, answer due 1/18/2018. (Coleman, Jesse)
January 9, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Huawei Technologies Co., LTD., Futurewei Technologies, Inc.. CNEX Labs, Inc. served on 12/28/2017, answer due 1/18/2018. (Coleman, Jesse)
January 3, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael D. Wexler on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6606065. (Wexler, Michael)
December 29, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andrew S Boutros on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6604812. (Boutros, Andrew)
December 29, 2017 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. (Coleman, Jesse)
December 28, 2017 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to CNEX Labs, Inc.. (baf, )
December 28, 2017 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Yiren Ronnie Huang. (baf, )
December 28, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CNEX Labs, Inc., Yiren Ronnie Huang ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6603014.), filed by Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd., Futurewei Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siebman, Clyde)
December 28, 2017 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
December 28, 2017 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. et al v. Huang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiren Ronnie Huang
Represented By: Michael J Sacksteder
Represented By: Stephanie Powers Skaff
Represented By: Bryan Alexander Kohm
Represented By: Gregg Aaron Myers
Represented By: Nadia Arid
Represented By: Eugene Y Mar
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Ryan A Tyz
Represented By: Sean Kristofer Apple
Represented By: Erin Catherine Jones
Represented By: Christopher John Schwegmann
Represented By: Gabriel S Gross
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Fisher
Represented By: Jeffrey G Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNEX Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Powers Skaff
Represented By: Bryan Alexander Kohm
Represented By: Nadia Arid
Represented By: Michael J Sacksteder
Represented By: Eugene Y Mar
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Christopher John Schwegmann
Represented By: Daniel Chilton Callaway
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Fisher
Represented By: Jeffrey G Lau
Represented By: Gregory Duane Smith
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Futurewei Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Siebman Forrest
Represented By: Jesse M Coleman
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Jamaica Potts Szeliga
Represented By: Michael D. Wexler
Represented By: Steven Mark Geiszler
Represented By: Andrew S Boutros
Represented By: John R. Schleppenbach
Represented By: Christopher F. Robertson
Represented By: Kevin J. Mahoney
Represented By: Robyn E. Marsh
Represented By: Nathaniel P. Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huawei Technologies Co., LTD.
Represented By: Elizabeth Siebman Forrest
Represented By: Jesse M Coleman
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Jamaica Potts Szeliga
Represented By: Michael D. Wexler
Represented By: Steven Mark Geiszler
Represented By: Andrew S Boutros
Represented By: John R. Schleppenbach
Represented By: Christopher F. Robertson
Represented By: Kevin J. Mahoney
Represented By: Robyn E. Marsh
Represented By: Nathaniel P. Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: David Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?