OGD Equipment Co. v. Overhead Door Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
OGD Equipment Co. |
Defendant: |
Overhead Door Corporation and Overhead Door Company of Lubbock, Inc. |
Case Number: |
4:2017cv00898 |
Filed: |
December 29, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas |
Office: |
Sherman Office |
County: |
Denton |
Presiding Judge: |
Kimberly C Priest Johnson |
Presiding Judge: |
Amos L. Mazzant |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 31, 2019 |
Filing
199
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 195 MOTION for Reconsideration re 184 Memorandum & Opinion,, Order and 198 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re 184 Memorandum & Opinion,, Order, 195 MOTION for Reconsideration re 184 Memorandu m & Opinion,, Order, and Objection to Magistrat Judge's Order filed by Overhead Door Corporation. The Court has reviewed the Motions to Reconsider and hereby issues this Order to clarify the October 25, 2019, Order 184 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 10/31/2019. (rpc, )
|
October 28, 2019 |
Filing
188
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING 170 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. OGD Equipment Co.'s Request for Rule 56(d) Relief (Dkt. #123) is hereby GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/28/2019. (rpc, )
|
October 25, 2019 |
Filing
184
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. ORDERED that counsel shall properly confer, and attempt in good faith to resolve, any remaining disputes regarding the production of documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 10/25/2019. (kls, )
|
September 8, 2019 |
Filing
133
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING 98 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Defendants Overhead Door Corporation and Overhead Door Company of Lubbock, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Exceeding the Court's Order Granting Leave to Amend (Dkt. # 82 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/8/2019. (rpc, )
|
August 12, 2019 |
Filing
99
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING 80 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Defendant Overhead Door Corporation's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. # 51 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendant Overhead Door Company of Lubbock, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. # 55 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/12/2019. (rpc, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?