Vine et al v. PLS Financial Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kristy Pond and Lucinda Vine
Defendant: PLS Financial Services, Inc. and PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00450
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Sherman Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2018 121 REPLY to Response to Motion re #110 MOTION for Reconsideration re #37 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion to Compel, #53 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Stay filed by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Patton, Jonathan)
August 9, 2018 120 REPLY to Response to Motion re #109 for Class Certification filed by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Dutko, Daniel) Modified on 8/9/2018 (daj, ).
August 9, 2018 119 Featured Case ORDER granting #114 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/9/2018. (daj, )
August 7, 2018 118 NOTICE by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc. Of Update to Certificate of Conference Regarding Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit [Dkt. 114] (Patton, Jonathan)
August 6, 2018 117 RESPONSE in Opposition re #110 MOTION for Reconsideration re #37 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion to Compel, #53 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Stay filed by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Dutko, Daniel)
August 2, 2018 116 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #115 Response in Opposition to Motion.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 2, #2 Appendix Part 3)(Patton, Jonathan)
August 2, 2018 115 RESPONSE in Opposition re #109 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class filed by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Jonathan)
August 2, 2018 114 MOTION for Leave to File Document that Exceeds Page Limit by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Jonathan)
August 2, 2018 113 NOTICE by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc. Of Withdrawal Of Unopposed Motion for Extension (Patton, Jonathan)
August 2, 2018 112 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #109 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Jonathan)
July 25, 2018 111 Featured Case ORDER granting #108 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/25/2018. (daj, )
July 24, 2018 110 MOTION for Reconsideration re #37 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion to Compel, #53 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Stay by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 109 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pond CSA, #2 Exhibit B - Blank CSA, #3 Exhibit C - Memrandum Opinion, #4 Exhibit D - Memorandum Opinion, #5 Exhibit E - Appleseed Complaint, #6 Exhibit F - Collin CO DA, #7 Exhibit G- WC Affs, #8 Exhibit H - First Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit I - Memorandum Opinion, #10 Exhibit J - Vine Depo, #11 Exhibit K - Pond Depo, #12 Exhibit L - Class Action Pet - Henry, #13 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Clacc Cert)(Dutko, Daniel)
July 19, 2018 108 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dutko, Daniel)
July 19, 2018 107 Featured Case ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before: August 9, 2018. File joint report of attorney conference: August 23, 2018. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on Monday, September 10, 2018, at 3:30 p.m. at the Paul Brown United States Courthouse, 101 E. Pecan Street, Sherman, Texas 75090. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/19/2018. (daj, )
July 18, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Document #106) submitted by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine. Document seeking leave to be filed was not filed separately and in compliance with Local Rule CV-7(k).. Correction should be made by one business day. (daj, ) Modified on 7/18/2018 (daj, ).
July 18, 2018 106 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE***Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Leave to Exceed Page Limits, #2 Exhibit Motion for Class Certification, #3 Exhibit A to MCC, #4 Exhibit B to MCC, #5 Exhibit C to MCC, #6 Exhibit D to MCC, #7 Exhibit E to MCC, #8 Exhibit F to MCC, #9 Exhibit G to MCC, #10 Exhibit H to MCC, #11 Exhibit I to MCC, #12 Exhibit J to MCC, #13 Exhibit K to MCC, #14 Exhibit L to MCC, #15 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Class Certification)(Dutko, Daniel) Modified on 7/18/2018 (daj, ).
July 18, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Plaintiff's "Motion for Class Certification and Incorporated Memorandum of Law" (Document #105) submitted by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine. Document exceeds page limit and does not contain a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (daj, )
July 17, 2018 105 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE*** MOTION to Certify Class by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Dutko, Daniel) Modified on 7/18/2018 (daj, ).
June 29, 2018 104 ***NOTE: Pursuant to Local Rule CV-7(a), any motions pending in another federal or state court made by any party will be considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court.*** (baf, )
June 26, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
June 26, 2018 103 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 3:16-cv-00031. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 25, 2018 102 Featured Case Memorandum Opinion and Order Transferring Cause to the Sherman Division of the Eastern District of Texas. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
May 25, 2018 101 RESPONSE to #99 Order to Show Cause, by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Tillotson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
May 25, 2018 100 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs to #99 Order to Show Cause, by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine. (Dutko, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
May 16, 2018 99 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that should any party wish to SHOW CAUSE as to why this cause should not be transferred to the ShermanDivision of the Eastern District of Texas, that party must file a writtenresponse to this Order by no later than May 25, 2018, at 5:00 p.m..Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
May 15, 2018 98 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip R. Martinez: Civil Docket Call held on 5/15/2018 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Walter Chiriboga.)(dt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
April 27, 2018 97 RESPONSE Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' to #96 Status Report by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine. (Dutko, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
April 27, 2018 96 STATUS REPORT by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Tillotson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
April 25, 2018 95 RESPONSE to Order Requiring Status Update to #94 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dutko, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
April 20, 2018 94 Featured Case ORDER REQUIRING STATUS UPDATE, ( Status Report due by 4/27/2018, at 10:00 a.m.Mountain Standard Time). Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
April 16, 2018 93 Featured Case ORDER SETTING DOCKET CALL, ( Docket Call set for 5/15/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Philip R. Martinez,). Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
February 15, 2018 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip R. Martinez: Docket Call held on 2/15/2018 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Walter Chiriboga.)(scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
February 2, 2018 91 NOTICE of Change of Address by M. Mitchell Moss (Moss, M.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
January 16, 2018 90 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #83 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
January 16, 2018 89 Featured Case ORDER SETTING DOCKET CALL, ( Docket Call set for 2/15/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Philip R. Martinez,). Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
November 17, 2017 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip R. Martinez: Docket Call held on 11/17/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Walter Chriboga.)(scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
November 3, 2017 87 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., Defendant PLS Financial Services, Inc. (Patton, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
October 27, 2017 86 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine, re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., Defendant PLS Financial Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G PART 1, #8 Exhibit G PART 2, #9 Exhibit G PART 3, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Proposed Order Order)(Dutko, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
October 25, 2017 85 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine, re #71 MOTION to Certify Class and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiff Kristy Pond, Plaintiff Lucinda Vine (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Dutko, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
October 13, 2017 84 APPENDIX to #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 2, #2 Appendix Part 3, #3 Appendix Part 4, #4 Appendix Part 5)(Patton, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
October 13, 2017 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
October 13, 2017 Featured Case Text Order GRANTING #79 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (zz) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
October 11, 2017 Notice of Correction: re #81 Response in Opposition to Motion, #82 Response in Opposition to Motion. DOCUMENT #82 IS AN AMENDED VERSION OF #81. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
October 11, 2017 82 AMENDED Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., re #71 MOTION to Certify Class and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiff Kristy Pond, Plaintiff Lucinda Vine (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1 of 6, #2 Appendix 2 of 6, #3 Appendix 3 of 6, #4 Appendix 4 of 6, #5 Appendix 5 of 6, #6 Appendix 6 of 6)(Patton, Jonathan) Modified on 10/12/2017 (scf). [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
October 11, 2017 81 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., re #71 MOTION to Certify Class and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiff Kristy Pond, Plaintiff Lucinda Vine (Patton, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
October 10, 2017 80 Featured Case ORDER SETTING DOCKET CALL, ( Docket Call set for 11/17/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Philip R. Martinez,). Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
October 10, 2017 79 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Motion for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support)(Patton, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
October 4, 2017 Featured Case Text Order MOOTING #72 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Philip R. Martinez. Moot in light of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (zz) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
October 3, 2017 78 ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc..(Tillotson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
September 26, 2017 77 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING #75 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED that the Preliminary Scheduling Order [Dkt. 64, 70] is hereby modified as follows: Defendants shall file an answer to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint on or before October 3, 2017; Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification on or before October 11, 2017; and Plaintiffs shall file any reply in support of their Motion for Certification on or before October 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
September 26, 2017 76 PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc. amending, filed by Lucinda Vine, Kristy Pond.(scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
September 26, 2017 Featured Case Text Order GRANTING #74 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (zz) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
September 20, 2017 75 Agreed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Patton, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
September 19, 2017 74 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order Order)(Dutko, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
September 15, 2017 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan R. Patton on behalf of PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. Attorney Jonathan R. Patton added to party PLS Financial Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan R. Patton added to party PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.(pty:dft) (Patton, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
September 15, 2017 72 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Patton, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
September 12, 2017 71 MOTION to Certify Class and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Plaintiffs' Appendix, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dutko, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
September 1, 2017 70 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING #69 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED Preliminary Scheduling Order (Dkt. 64) is hereby modified as follows: Plaintiff's shall file any motion for class certification no later than 9/12/2017, Defendants shall file any response to a motion for class certification by 9/22/2017, Plaintiffs shall file any reply to a response to a motion for class certification no later than 10/2/2017. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
August 31, 2017 69 Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Patton, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
August 16, 2017 68 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel R. Dutko (Dutko, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
August 11, 2017 67 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip R. Martinez: Docket Call held on 8/11/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Walter Chriboga.)(scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
July 21, 2017 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Mark Tillotson on behalf of PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. Attorney Jeffrey Mark Tillotson added to party PLS Financial Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Mark Tillotson added to party PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.(pty:dft) (Tillotson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
July 10, 2017 65 Featured Case ORDER SETTING DOCKET CALL, ( Docket Call set for 8/11/2017 08:00 AM before Judge Philip R. Martinez,). Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
June 26, 2017 64 Featured Case PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties comply with any Local Rules of the Court, specifically Appendix A which governs class certification motions.. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
June 26, 2017 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip R. Martinez: Status Conference held on 6/26/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Walter Chiriboga.)(dt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
June 20, 2017 62 Featured Case ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, ( Status Conference set for 6/26/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Philip R. Martinez,). Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
June 19, 2017 61 Proposed Scheduling Order by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Osborn, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
June 12, 2017 60 Featured Case Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall, separate and apart from the Proposed Scheduling Order, JOINTLY FILE the Case Management Report as outlined in this Order by no later than June 19, 2017. Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 6/19/2017. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
June 12, 2017 Case No Longer Stayed (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
June 12, 2017 59 Featured Case ORDER LIFTING STAY. IT IS ORDERED THAT ANY AND ALL STAYS IMPOSED BY THE COURT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CAUSE ARE HEREBY LIFTED. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
June 12, 2017 58 Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE Affirming Appeal Record Accepted and Available Electronically, #55 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) filed by PLS Financial Services, Inc., Appeal Record Accepted and Available Electronically, Appeal Record Accepted and Available Electronically, #43 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) filed by PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., PLS Financial Services, Inc., Appeal Record Sent to USCA, Notice of Appeal,, filed by PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., PLS Financial Services, Inc., Appeal Record Accepted and Available Electronically, Appeal Record Accepted and Available Electronically, Notice of Appeal,, filed by PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., PLS Financial Services, Inc., Appeal Record Sent to USCA. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
February 15, 2017 Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re Notice of Appeal,,. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
September 15, 2016 Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re Notice of Appeal,,. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
August 26, 2016 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re Notice of Appeal, 16-50847 (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
August 24, 2016 57 NOTICE Certificate of No Request for Transcript by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc. (Rivas, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
August 22, 2016 56 Certified Mail Return Receipt of #53 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Stay (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
August 19, 2016 NOTICE OF APPEAL following #55 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out #Form DKT-13 (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
August 19, 2016 55 Featured Case Amended Appeal of Order entered by District Judge #53 , #37 by PLS Financial Services, Inc.. No filing fee submitted (Howard-Gonzalez, Jose) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
August 12, 2016 54 Certified Mail Receipt of #53 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Stay (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
August 11, 2016 Case Stayed (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
August 11, 2016 53 Featured Case ORDER DENYING #39 Motion for Reconsideration ; GRANTING #44 Motion to Stay Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
August 10, 2016 52 NOTICE to the Court of Supplemental Authority by PLS Financial Services, Inc. (Howard-Gonzalez, Jose) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
August 10, 2016 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip R. Martinez: Docket Call held on 8/10/2016 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Laura Stewart.)(scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
August 9, 2016 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jose Abelardo Howard-Gonzalez on behalf of PLS Financial Services, Inc. (Howard-Gonzalez, Jose) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
August 8, 2016 Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re Notice of Appeal,,. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
August 3, 2016 Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re Notice of Appeal,,. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
July 29, 2016 Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re Notice of Appeal,,. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
July 19, 2016 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re Notice of Appeal,, 16-50847 (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
July 15, 2016 49 NOTICE Certificate of No Request for Transcript by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc. (Rivas, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
July 15, 2016 48 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., re #44 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Defendants' Motion to Reconsider and Interlocutory Appeal filed by Defendant PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., Defendant PLS Financial Services, Inc. (Rivas, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
July 14, 2016 47 Featured Case ORDER SETTING DOCKET CALL, ( Docket Call set for 8/10/2016 08:15 AM before Judge Philip R. Martinez,). Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
July 8, 2016 46 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine, re #44 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Defendants' Motion to Reconsider and Interlocutory Appeal filed by Defendant PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., Defendant PLS Financial Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burck, H.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
July 8, 2016 Featured Case Text Order GRANTING #45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Philip R. Martinez. Defendants are not required to file a response to Plaintiffs' motion for class certification until seven days after the Court rules on Defendants' motion to reconsider and motion to stay--or any related stay is lifted. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (co) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
July 7, 2016 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #30 MOTION to Certify Class by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rivas, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
July 1, 2016 NOTICE OF APPEAL by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. Filing fee $ 0, receipt number XXXXX. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out #Form DKT-13 (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (mg2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
July 1, 2016 44 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Defendants' Motion to Reconsider and Interlocutory Appeal by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rivas, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
July 1, 2016 43 Featured Case Appeal of Order entered by District Judge #37 by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0542-8629235) (Rivas, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
June 30, 2016 42 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., re #39 MOTION for Reconsideration re #37 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion to Compel, filed by Defendant PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., Defendant PLS Financial Services, Inc. (Rivas, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
June 23, 2016 41 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine, re #39 MOTION for Reconsideration re #37 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion to Compel, filed by Defendant PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., Defendant PLS Financial Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Burck, H.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
June 20, 2016 40 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc..(Rivas, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
June 17, 2016 39 MOTION for Reconsideration re #37 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion to Compel, by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Rivas, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
June 9, 2016 Featured Case Text Order GRANTING #38 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Philip R. Martinez. Defendants must submit their RESPONSE by no later than July 8, 2016, 5:00 p.m. Mountain Standard Time. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sv) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
June 7, 2016 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rivas, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
June 6, 2016 Featured Case Text Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #36 Motion to Stay entered by Judge Philip R. Martinez. Defendants must file their response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class by no later than June 10, 2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (co) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
June 6, 2016 Featured Case Text Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #34 Motion to Stay entered by Judge Philip R. Martinez. Defendants must file their response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class by no later than June 10, 2016.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (co) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
June 6, 2016 37 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S TO ARBITRATION. ORDER DENYING #18 Motion to Dismiss ; DENYING #19 Motion to Dismiss ; DENYING #20 Motion to Compel Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
June 2, 2016 36 Second MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rivas, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
May 13, 2016 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip R. Martinez: Docket Call held on 5/13/2016 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Laura Stewart.)(scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
May 11, 2016 34 Unopposed MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rivas, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
May 9, 2016 33 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., re #31 MOTION for Order Finding Allegations in Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint are Admitted filed by Plaintiff Kristy Pond, Plaintiff Lucinda Vine (Rivas, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
May 5, 2016 32 Certified Mail RETURN Receipt of #26 Order on Motion for Leave to File,,, (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
May 5, 2016 31 MOTION for Order Finding Allegations in Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint are Admitted by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Finding Allegations Admitted)(Burck, H.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
May 5, 2016 30 MOTION to Certify Class by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order Order Granting Class Certification)(Burck, H.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
April 29, 2016 29 Certified Mail Receipt of #26 Order on Motion for Leave to File,,, (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
April 29, 2016 28 RESPONSE in Support, filed by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Proceedings and to Compel Kristy Pond to Arbitration filed by Defendant PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., Defendant PLS Financial Services, Inc., #19 MOTION to Dismiss Proceedings and to Compel Lucinda Vine to Arbitration filed by Defendant PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., Defendant PLS Financial Services, Inc. (Rivas, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
April 28, 2016 27 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., re #20 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendants filed by Plaintiff Kristy Pond, Plaintiff Lucinda Vine (Rivas, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
April 27, 2016 26 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING #24 Motion for Leave to File; GRANTING #25 Motion for Leave to File. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Parties are WARNED that no other untimely submissions will be considered without sufficient good cause. Parties are ADVISED to ask for extensions before deadline lapse. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
April 22, 2016 25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, and Compel Plaintiffs to Arbitration by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1-D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 1-E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 1-F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 1-G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 1-H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 1-I, #11 Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave)(Burck, H.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
April 22, 2016 24 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Motion to Compel Discovery by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Rivas, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
April 18, 2016 23 Certified Mail RETURN Receipt of #21 Order, Set Hearings (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
April 11, 2016 22 Certified Mail Receipt of #21 Order, Set Hearings (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
April 11, 2016 21 Featured Case ORDER SETTING DOCKET CALL, ( Docket Call set for 5/13/2016 10:00 AM before Judge Philip R. Martinez,). Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
April 8, 2016 20 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendants by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Burck, H.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
March 23, 2016 19 MOTION to Dismiss Proceedings and to Compel Lucinda Vine to Arbitration by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Rivas, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
March 23, 2016 18 MOTION to Dismiss Proceedings and to Compel Kristy Pond to Arbitration by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Rivas, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
March 11, 2016 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants amending, filed by Lucinda Vine, Kristy Pond.(Burck, H.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
March 1, 2016 16 Certified RETURN/RECD Mail Receipt of #11 Order on Motion to Continue (mg2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
February 29, 2016 15 Proposed Scheduling Order by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Rivas, Shelly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
February 29, 2016 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by H. Mark Burck on behalf of Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine (Burck, H.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
February 22, 2016 13 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine. (Burck, H.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
February 12, 2016 12 Certified Mail Receipt of #11 Order on Motion to Continue (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
February 11, 2016 11 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Continue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE COURT'S "ORDER SETTING DOCKET CALL" (ECF No. 6) IS VACATED. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
February 9, 2016 10 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduled Docket Call by Kristy Pond, Lucinda Vine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burck, H.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
February 4, 2016 9 Certified Mail return Receipt of #6 Order, Set Hearings, #3 Order, #5 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order, #7 Letter/Correspondence, #4 Order (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
January 28, 2016 8 Certified Mail Receipt of #6 Order, Set Hearings, #3 Order, #5 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order, #7 Letter/Correspondence, #4 Order (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
January 27, 2016 7 Letter/Correspondence re Reapply for Admission (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
January 27, 2016 6 Featured Case ORDER SETTING DOCKET CALL, ( Docket Call set for 2/19/2016 08:15 AM before Judge Philip R. Martinez,). Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
January 27, 2016 5 Featured Case Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 2/29/2016,. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
January 27, 2016 4 Featured Case ORDER TO RETAIN LOCAL COUNSEL. IT IS ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS RETAIN LOCAL COUNSEL AS SOON AS POSSIBLE, BUT IN NO EVENT LATER THAN 02/29/2016. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
January 27, 2016 3 Featured Case STANDING ORDER TO REPLEAD IN REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
January 26, 2016 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (jg1) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
January 26, 2016 Case Assigned to Judge Philip R. Martinez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jg1) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
January 26, 2016 2 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by PLS Financial Services, Inc., PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.. (Bonner, Richard) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]
January 26, 2016 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., PLS Financial Services, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-8144840), filed by PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc., PLS Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit)(Bonner, Richard) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/26/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vine et al v. PLS Financial Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Pond
Represented By: Daniel R. Dutko
Represented By: M. Mitchell Moss
Represented By: H Mark Burck
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucinda Vine
Represented By: Daniel R. Dutko
Represented By: M. Mitchell Moss
Represented By: H Mark Burck
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLS Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Tillotson
Represented By: J. Austen Irrobali
Represented By: Jonathan R. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLS Loan Store of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Tillotson
Represented By: J. Austen Irrobali
Represented By: Jonathan R. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?