Elliot-Gyure et al v. Northwest ISD

Plaintiff: Bryce Gyure and Trevelyan Elliot-Gyure
Defendant: Northwest Independent School District and Northwest ISD
Case Number: 4:2018cv00454
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Denton
Presiding Judge: Richard A Schell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - GRANTING #7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Richard A. Schell on 8/10/2018. (baf, )
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TRANSFER ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the above-named civil action is transferred to the Honorable Richard A. Schell, effective immediately. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/6/2018. (kls, )
July 26, 2018 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Northwest ISD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss)(Crawford, Charles)
July 24, 2018 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Plaintiff's counsel Alex R. Tandy as to #5 Order. (rpc, )
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/23/2018. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 9/10/2018 at 11:30 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/19/2018. (rpc, )
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Plaintiffs' amended complaint is due thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Defendant's amended answer is due twenty (20) days from receipt of the amended complaint. Any prior deadline for Defendant's answer shall be extended to the date set by this order. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/28/2018. (rpc, )
June 27, 2018 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Petition by Northwest ISD.(rpc, )
June 27, 2018 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against Northwest ISD, filed by Bryce Gyure, Trevelyan Elliot-Gyure.(rpc, )
June 27, 2018 Notified Attorney, Alex R. Tandy, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN OUR COURT - LETTER SENT VIA EMAIL*** (rpc, )
June 27, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
June 26, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Denton County 431st District Court, case number 18-4834-431. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6831923), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit TAB A, #3 Exhibit TAB B, #4 Exhibit TAB B-1 Certified Copy of Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit TAB B-2 Plaintiff's Original Petition, #6 Exhibit TAB B-3 Return of Service - Citation, #7 Exhibit TAB B-4 Temporary INjunction (Denied), #8 Exhibit TAB B-5 Defendant's Original Answer)(Crawford, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliot-Gyure et al v. Northwest ISD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryce Gyure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevelyan Elliot-Gyure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Independent School District
Represented By: Charles Joseph Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest ISD
Represented By: Lucas Christopher Henry
Represented By: Charles Joseph Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?