Nellis v. The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, As Trustee for the Benefit of The Certificate Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-BC3
Plaintiff: William Gary Nellis
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, As Trustee for the Benefit of The Certificate Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-BC3 and Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00495
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, )
September 9, 2018 Filing 11 Original ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, by The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, As Trustee for the Benefit of The Certificate Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-BC3.(Neff, Sabrina)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The Court sets this matter for a telephonic status conference on Monday, October 29, 2018, at 1:30 p.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 8/28/2018. (daj, )
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/3/2019 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2018. Discovery due by 2/22/2019. Expert Witness List due by 11/16/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 10/31/2018. Jury instructions due by 6/19/2019. Mediation Completion due by 1/31/2019. Designation of Mediator due by 12/14/2018. Motions due by 2/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 8/28/2018. (daj, )
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. ORDERED that the Rule 16 management conference set for Friday, September 7, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 8/28/2018. (daj, )
August 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/28/2018 at 1:50 pm. John Helstowski appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Jameson Watts appeared on behalf of Defendants. Parties discussed proposed Scheduling Order with Court. Court will enter order canceling Rule 16 and will proceed to enter proposed Scheduling Order. Counsel for Defendants shall file a notice within two weeks confirming that Plaintiff's counsel has been notified of the status of Plaintiff's application for a loan modification. Call adjourned at 1:59 pm. (Court Reporter Digital Recording.) (klee, )
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The Court sets this matter for a telephonic conference on Tuesday, August 28, 2018, at 1:30pm.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 8/24/2018. (daj, )
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Helstowski, John)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, As Trustee for the Benefit of The Certificate Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-BC3, filed by William Gary Nellis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Helstowski, John)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before: August 9, 2018. File joint report of attorney conference: August 23, 2018. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference September 7, 2018 at 2:00pm. in the United States Courthouse Annex, 200 N. Texas, Sherman, Texas 75090. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 7/19/2018. (daj, )
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 7/19/2018. (daj, )
July 19, 2018 Case referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (daj, )
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, As Trustee for the Benefit of The Certificate Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-BC3, filed by William Gary Nellis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(daj, )
July 13, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, )
July 13, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (daj, )
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, As Trustee for the Benefit of The Certificate Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-BC3, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC from 366th Judicial District Court, case number 366-03142-2018. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6853541), filed by The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, As Trustee for the Benefit of The Certificate Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-BC3, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Neff, Sabrina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nellis v. The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, As Trustee for the Benefit of The Certificate Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-BC3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, As Trustee for the Benefit of The Certificate Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-BC3
Represented By: Sabrina A Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Sabrina A Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Gary Nellis
Represented By: John Gannon Helstowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?