Lynn v. LNU
Plaintiff: Crystal Lynn
Defendant: Jenny LNU
Case Number: 4:2018cv00503
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. ORDER #7 mailed to CRYSTAL LYNN RETURNED marked "RETURN TO SENDER - UNCLAIMED - UNABLE TO FORWARD". (baf, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, MAGISTRATE REFERRAL, CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM mailed to CRYSTAL LYNN RETURNED MARKED "RETURN TO SENDER - ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN - UNABLE TO FORWARD". (baf, )
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that within thirty (30) days of receipt of this Order Plaintiff shall either pay the requisite filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 7/18/2018. (baf, )
July 17, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (kls, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 6 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Referral) (kls, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-01613. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 25, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Mon Jun 25 14:32:46 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/17/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: The state proceedings underlying the allegations in this action occurred in Denton County. This action will be transferred to the Sherman Division of the Eastern District of Texas on 7/17/2018, to allow any party to file an objection to Judge Scholer within 14 days after being served with a copy of this order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 6/25/2018) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/17/2018.]
June 21, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Thu Jun 21 12:29:58 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/17/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Jenny LNU filed by Crystal Lynn. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ajb)[Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/17/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ajb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/17/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/17/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynn v. LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?