Cairns v. Greenway Village, Ltd.

Plaintiff: Anthony Cairns
Defendant: Greenway Village, Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00507
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by Greenway Village, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Neal, Bryan)
September 11, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding Document 5 - Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint submitted by Greenway Village, Ltd.. Application cannot be granted. Request must be made by motion to the court. Correction should be made by one business day. (daj, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE AS MOTION***Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Greenway Village, Ltd..( Neal, Bryan) Modified on 9/11/2018 (daj, ).
August 16, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Greenway Village, Ltd. to 9/14/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( daj, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Greenway Village, Ltd..( Neal, Bryan)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Cairns. Greenway Village, Ltd. served on 7/26/2018, answer due 8/16/2018. (Schapiro, Douglas)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Greenway Village, Ltd. (rpc, )
July 18, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
July 18, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Injunctive Relief Sought against Greenway Village, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6858756.), filed by Anthony Cairns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schapiro, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cairns v. Greenway Village, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Cairns
Represented By: Emil Lippe, Jr
Represented By: Douglas Steven Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenway Village, Ltd.
Represented By: Bryan Patrick Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?