Russell v. Car Spa Inc

Plaintiff: Schuyler L Russell
Defendant: Car Spa Inc
Case Number: 4:2018cv00521
Filed: July 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
1 Judge: Amos L Mazzant
2 Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
July 26, 2018 ***Note: Pursuant to Local Rule CV-7(j), any motions pending in another federal or state court made by any party will be considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court.*** (baf, )
July 26, 2018 Filing 12 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Referral) (baf, )
July 26, 2018 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-01371. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 5, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 10. Thu Jul 5 10:03:06 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2018.]
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Another District: Case transferred to the Sherman Division of the Eastern District of Texas on 7/26/2018, to allow any party to file an objection to Judge Boyle within 14 days after being served with a copy of this order. See FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a). If an objection is filed, the order of transfer is stayed pending further order of the Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 7/5/2018) (zkc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Car Spa Inc filed by Schuyler L Russell. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE filed by Schuyler L Russell re: #7 Judge's Questionnaire. (zkc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2018.]
June 1, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Fri Jun 1 08:27:43 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S QUESTIONNAIRE TO THE PLAINTIFF sent to Schulyer l Russell: Responses due by 7/2/2018. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 6/1/2018) (sss) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2018.]
May 30, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Schuyler L Russell. (zkc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2018.]
May 30, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Schuyler L Russell. (zkc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2018.]
May 30, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION Requesting an Extension filed by Schuyler L Russell. (zkc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2018.]
May 30, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Car Spa Inc filed by Schuyler L Russell. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2018.]
May 30, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 1, 2. Wed May 30 14:25:53 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2018.]
May 30, 2018 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (zkc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2018.]
May 30, 2018 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. Car Spa Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Car Spa Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schuyler L Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?