KMCC Enterprises, LLC et al v. Savvy Chic Management, Inc. d/b/a The Sculpting Shoppe et al
Plaintiff: Marie Wall, KMCC Enterprises, LLC and Kenneth Wall
Defendant: Jessica Chandler, Sculpt Pod, Inc., Savvy Chic Management, Inc. d/b/a The Sculpting Shoppe and Savvy Chic Management, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00532
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Denton
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/11/2018. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 10/26/2018 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/6/2018. (rpc, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court for want of subject-matter jurisdiction filed by KMCC Enterprises, LLC, Kenneth Wall, Marie Wall. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip Cannatti)(Cannatti, Phillip)
August 23, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court for want of subject-matter jurisdiction filed by Sculpt Pod, Inc.. (Ollennu, Nii Amaa)
August 9, 2018 Filing 12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court for want of subject-matter jurisdiction by KMCC Enterprises, LLC, Kenneth Wall, Marie Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Motion to Remand)(Cannatti, Phillip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2018: #4 Text of Proposed Order) (daj, ).
August 8, 2018 Filing 11 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE***First MOTION to Remand to State Court for want of subject-matter jurisdiction by KMCC Enterprises, LLC, Kenneth Wall, Marie Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Motion to Remand)(Cannatti, Phillip) Modified on 8/8/2018 (daj, ).
August 8, 2018 Filing 10 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE***First MOTION to Remand to State Court for want of subject-matter jurisdiction by KMCC Enterprises, LLC, Kenneth Wall, Marie Wall. (Cannatti, Phillip) Modified on 8/8/2018 (daj, ).
August 8, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand submitted by KMCC Enterprises, LLC, Kenneth Wall, Marie Wall. Attachments not properly filed as separate attachments in compliance with Local Rule CV-5. Correction should be made by one business day. (daj, )
August 8, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (#11) submitted by KMCC Enterprises, LLC, Kenneth Wall, Marie Wall. No Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (daj, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Copy of State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Original Petition filed in State Court, #3 Exhibit State Court Citation for Chandler, #4 Exhibit State Court Return of service for Chandler, #5 Exhibit State Court Citation for Savvy, #6 Exhibit State Court Return of service for Savvy, #7 Exhibit Original Answer filed in State Court by Chandler and Savvy, #8 Exhibit Amended Petition filed in State Court, #9 Exhibit Original Answer filed in State Court by Sculpt Pod)(Ollennu, Nii Amaa)
July 30, 2018 Filing 9 ***AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jessica Chandler, Savvy Chic Management, Inc., Sculpt Pod, Inc., filed by Marie Wall, KMCC Enterprises, LLC, Kenneth Wall.(baf, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 8 ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Sculpt Pod, Inc..(baf, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 7 ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Savvy Chic Management, Inc..(baf, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 6 ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against Jessica Chandler, Savvy Chic Management, Inc., Sculpt Pod, Inc., filed by Marie Wall, KMCC Enterprises, LLC, Kenneth Wall.(baf, )
July 30, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
July 30, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Sculpt Pod, Inc. Certificate of Notice of Filing of Removal (Ollennu, Nii Amaa)
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Savvy Chic Management, Inc. d/b/a The Sculpting Shoppe (Ollennu, Nii Amaa)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sculpt Pod, Inc. (Ollennu, Nii Amaa)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Savvy Chic Management, Inc. d/b/a The Sculpting Shoppe, Sculpt Pod, Inc., Jessica Chandler from 393rd District Court of Texas, case number 17-10144-393. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6874739), filed by Savvy Chic Management, Inc. d/b/a The Sculpting Shoppe, Sculpt Pod, Inc., Jessica Chandler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement LR 81(c) Notice)(Ollennu, Nii Amaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KMCC Enterprises, LLC et al v. Savvy Chic Management, Inc. d/b/a The Sculpting Shoppe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Chandler
Represented By: Nii Amaa Ollennu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sculpt Pod, Inc.
Represented By: Nii Amaa Ollennu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savvy Chic Management, Inc. d/b/a The Sculpting Shoppe
Represented By: Nii Amaa Ollennu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savvy Chic Management, Inc.
Represented By: Nii Amaa Ollennu
Represented By: John Joseph Mongogna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Wall
Represented By: Phillip Eugene Cannatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KMCC Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Phillip Eugene Cannatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wall
Represented By: Phillip Eugene Cannatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?