Rose v. Conifer Health Solutions, LLC

Plaintiff: Coco Rose
Defendant: Conifer Health Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00540
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
0 Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
1 Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration (Dkt. #5 ) is GRANTED. The Parties shall arbitrate Plaintiff's claims in accordance with the Parties' arbitration agreement. All relief not previously granted is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/19/2018. (rpc, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Dismiss And Compel Arbitration by Conifer Health Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinson, Gavin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/19/2018) (rpc, ).
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Joint Motion to Stay Proceeding Pending Arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 9/12/2018. (daj, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceeding Pending Arbitration by Conifer Health Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinson, Gavin)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Conifer Health Solutions, LLC. (daj, )
August 3, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, )
August 3, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (daj, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Conifer Health Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6881615.), filed by Coco Rose. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wall, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. Conifer Health Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coco Rose
Represented By: John Edward Wall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conifer Health Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Gavin Samuel Martinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?