Star Systems International Limited v. Neology, Inc.
Plaintiff: Star Systems International Limited
Defendant: Neology, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00574
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 27 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Beckham, Blake)
October 11, 2018 Filing 26 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Under the Texas Citizens Participation Act and Brief In Support by Star Systems International Limited. (Beckham, Blake) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2018: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/11/2018. (rpc, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 24 Defendant's Original ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by Neology, Inc..(Hellberg, Jeffrey)
October 10, 2018 Filing 23 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Star Systems International Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Portela, Jose)
October 9, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Under the Texas Citizens Participation Act and Brief In Support by Neology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Hellberg, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2018: #6 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
October 2, 2018 Filing 21 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support filed by Neology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hellberg, Jeffrey)
September 26, 2018 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support filed by Star Systems International Limited. (Beckham, Blake)
September 24, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Support re #13 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support filed by Neology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed Order)(Anderson, Lesley) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/25/2018) (rpc, ).
September 19, 2018 Filing 18 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #17 Amended Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Beckham, Blake)
September 19, 2018 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Neology, Inc., filed by Star Systems International Limited.(Beckham, Blake)
September 12, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Christopher Oldner on behalf of Star Systems International Limited (Oldner, John)
September 10, 2018 Filing 15 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #13 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Portela, Jose)
September 10, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Additional Attachments to Main Document: #13 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support [document #14 ] submitted by Star Systems International Limited. Each exhibit should be filed as a separate attachment. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** Additional Attachments to Main Document: #13 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Exhibit C-E, #3 Exhibit F-I, #4 Exhibit J-K)(Portela, Jose) Modified on 9/10/2018 (rpc, ).
September 10, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support by Star Systems International Limited. (Portela, Jose) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2018: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE by Star Systems International Limited Certificate of Interested Persons (Portela, Jose)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/11/2018. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 10/29/2018 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/7/2018. (rpc, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy Elizabeth LaValle on behalf of Neology, Inc. (LaValle, Amy)
August 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rusty Jonathan O'Kane on behalf of Neology, Inc. (O'Kane, Rusty)
August 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Wallace Hellberg, Jr on behalf of Neology, Inc. (Hellberg, Jeffrey)
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lesley David Anderson on behalf of Neology, Inc. (Anderson, Lesley)
August 21, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #6 Motion for Leave submitted by Neology, Inc. Document should be filed as notice not motion. Attorney to refile. (rlf)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION for Leave to Appear Notice of Appearance of L. David Anderson by Neology, Inc.. (Anderson, Lesley) Modified on 8/21/2018 (rlf).
August 21, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION for Leave to Appear Notice of Appearance by L. David Anderson, Jeffrey W. Hellberg, Jr., Amy E. LaValle, Rusty O'Kane #5 submitted by Neology, Inc.. The Notice of Appearance was filed as a Motion and each attorney appearing needs to file a separate document using their own login and password. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION for Leave to Appear Notice of Appearance by L. David Anderson, Jeffrey W. Hellberg, Jr., Amy E. LaValle, Rusty O'Kane by Neology, Inc.. (Anderson, Lesley) Modified on 8/21/2018 (rpc, ).
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Plaintiff's amended complaint is due thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Defendant's amended answer is due twenty (20) days from receipt of the amended complaint. Any prior deadline for Defendant's answer shall be extended to the date set by this order. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/20/2018. (rpc, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Star Systems International Limited. Neology, Inc. waiver sent on 8/15/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Portela, Jose)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against Neology, Inc., filed by Star Systems International Limited.(rpc, )
August 14, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
August 13, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Neology, Inc. from District Court of Collin County, 296th Judicial District, case number 296-03948-2018. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6895637), filed by Neology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certified Copy of State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery)(Findlay, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Star Systems International Limited v. Neology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Star Systems International Limited
Represented By: John Christopher Oldner
Represented By: Jose M Portela
Represented By: Blake Lowell Beckham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neology, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Vinay Vijay Joshi
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Jason Michael Berent
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth LaValle
Represented By: Lesley David Anderson
Represented By: Jeffrey Wallace Hellberg, Jr
Represented By: Rusty Jonathan O'Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?