Johnson et al v. United Healthcare Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Ron Johnson and Cindy Johnson
Defendant: Examworks, LLC, Examworks Group, Inc., Leonard Green & Partners, L.P., United Healthcare Insurance Company, Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC and Examworks Clinical Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00591
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendants Examworks, LLC., Examworks Clinical Solutions, LLC., Examworks Group, Inc., and Leonard Green & Partners, L.P., are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs' claims against the remaining Defendants remain pending remain pending at this time. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/3/2018. (rpc, )
September 26, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC to 10/26/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 13 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC.( Parsons, Claire)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD*** Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC.( Parsons, Claire) Modified on 9/25/2018 (rpc, ).
September 24, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for United Healthcare Insurance Company to 10/25/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re United Healthcare Insurance Company.( Reece, Amber)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - TO BE REFILED BY ATTORNEY*** Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Reece, Amber) Modified on 9/24/2018 (kls, ).
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, re #8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cindy Johnson, Ron Johnson. The Court recommends that the Notice of Dismissal (Dkt. 8) be GRANTED, and Defendants Examworks, LLC, Examworks Clinical Solutions, LLC, Examworks Group, Inc., and Leonard Green & Partners, L.P., be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE from this lawsuit with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 9/17/2018. (kls, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cindy Johnson, Ron Johnson (Akin, Gordon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2018: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to United Healthcare Insurance Company. (rpc, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Leonard Green & Partners, L.P. (rpc, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Examworks, LLC. (rpc, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Examworks Group, Inc. (rpc, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Examworks Clinical Solutions, LLC. (rpc, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC. (rpc, )
August 17, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
August 17, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (rpc, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6904385.), filed by Ron Johnson, Cindy Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Akin, Gordon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. United Healthcare Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Examworks, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Examworks Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Green & Partners, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Amber D Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC
Represented By: Claire W Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Examworks Clinical Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Johnson
Represented By: Gregory Cleve Burton
Represented By: Gordon Randall Akin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Johnson
Represented By: Gregory Cleve Burton
Represented By: Gordon Randall Akin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?