Aluxa Homes LLC v. Allen Deerman Corporation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Aluxa Homes LLC
Defendant: Weston Rigsby, LLC, Allen Deerman Corporation, LLC, Chad Caldwell, Allen Deerman, Erick Frank, Nameless Investments, LLC, David Lacy, EMF Enterprises, LLC and Keith Frank
Case Number: 4:2018cv00616
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #26 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is hereby extended until November 1, 2018. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/10/2018. (rpc, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Chad Caldwell, Weston Rigsby, LLC. (Sheaks, Ty)
October 5, 2018 Filing 28 Defendant's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Chad Caldwell, Weston Rigsby, LLC.( Sheaks, Ty)
October 5, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, and Motion to Preliminary Injunction #27 submitted by Chad Caldwell, Weston Rigsby, LLC. An Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint should be filed instead of a Motion. Also, a second Motion should be filed for the request for extension to respond to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Both should not be contained in the same document. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
October 5, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Weston Rigsby, LLC to 11/1/2018; Chad Caldwell to 11/1/2018. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 27 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, and Motion to Preliminary Injunction by Chad Caldwell, Weston Rigsby, LLC. (Sherry, James) Modified on 10/5/2018 (rpc, ).
October 4, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Allen Deerman to 11/1/2018; Allen Deerman Corporation, LLC to 11/1/2018; David Lacy to 11/1/2018. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Allen Deerman Corporation, LLC, Allen Deerman, David Lacy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hemingson, Tate) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/4/2018) (rpc, ).
October 3, 2018 Filing 25 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Allen Deerman Corporation, LLC, Allen Deerman, David Lacy.( Hemingson, Tate)
October 3, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earsa Rene Jackson on behalf of Allen Deerman Corporation, LLC, Allen Deerman, David Lacy (Jackson, Earsa)
October 3, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tate L Hemingson on behalf of Allen Deerman Corporation, LLC, Allen Deerman, David Lacy (Hemingson, Tate)
October 3, 2018 Filing 22 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** Defendants' Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint and Motion for Extension to Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction re Allen Deerman Corporation, LLC, Allen Deerman, David Lacy( Hemingson, Tate) Modified on 10/3/2018 (rpc, ).
October 3, 2018 Filing 21 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tate L Hemingson on behalf of Allen Deerman Corporation, LLC, Allen Deerman, David Lacy (Hemingson, Tate) Modified on 10/3/2018 (rpc, ).
October 3, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Defendants' Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint and Motion for Extension to Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #22 submitted by Allen Deerman Corporation, LLC, Allen Deerman, David Lacy. An Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint should be filed instead of a Motion. Also, a second Motion should be filed for the request for extension to respond to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Both should not be contained in the same document. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
October 3, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the NOTICE of Attorney Appearance #21 submitted by Allen Deerman Corporation, LLC, Allen Deerman, David Lacy. Each attorney must file their own Notice of Attorney Appearance using their login and password. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aluxa Homes LLC. EMF Enterprises, LLC served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (Sorden, Gary)
September 24, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aluxa Homes LLC. Erick Frank served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (Sorden, Gary)
September 24, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aluxa Homes LLC. David Lacy served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (Sorden, Gary)
September 20, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Aluxa Homes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Warren, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of Gary R. Sorden, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorden, Gary) (Attachment 11 replaced on 9/21/2018) (rpc, ).
September 19, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aluxa Homes LLC. Keith Frank served on 9/15/2018, answer due 10/8/2018. (Sorden, Gary)
September 19, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aluxa Homes LLC. Nameless Investments, LLC served on 9/15/2018, answer due 10/8/2018. (Sorden, Gary)
September 19, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aluxa Homes LLC. Weston Rigsby, LLC served on 8/29/2018, answer due 9/19/2018. (Sorden, Gary)
August 29, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Lawrence King on behalf of Aluxa Homes LLC (King, Brian)
August 29, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Douglas Davidson on behalf of Aluxa Homes LLC (Davidson, Aaron)
August 28, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to Weston Rigsby, LLC. (rpc, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to Nameless Investments, LLC. (rpc, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Keith Frank. (rpc, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Erick Frank. (rpc, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to EMF Enterprises, LLC. (rpc, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Allen Deerman. (rpc, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Allen Deerman Corporation, LLC. (rpc, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to David Lacy. (rpc, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Chad Caldwell. (rpc, )
August 28, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
August 27, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Aluxa Homes LLC (Sorden, Gary)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief in Aid of Arbitration against Allen Deerman Corporation, LLC, Chad Caldwell, Allen Deerman, EMF Enterprises, LLC, Erick Frank, Keith Frank, David Lacy, Nameless Investments, LLC, Weston Rigsby, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6917302.), filed by Aluxa Homes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W)(Sorden, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aluxa Homes LLC v. Allen Deerman Corporation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weston Rigsby, LLC
Represented By: James Eamonn Sherry
Represented By: Ty Mychael Sheaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Deerman Corporation, LLC
Represented By: Earsa Rene Jackson
Represented By: Tate L Hemingson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Caldwell
Represented By: James Eamonn Sherry
Represented By: Ty Mychael Sheaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Deerman
Represented By: Earsa Rene Jackson
Represented By: Tate L Hemingson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erick Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nameless Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lacy
Represented By: Earsa Rene Jackson
Represented By: Tate L Hemingson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMF Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aluxa Homes LLC
Represented By: Gary R Sorden
Represented By: Brian Lawrence King
Represented By: Aaron Douglas Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?