Juluke v. Double Horseshoe LLC et al

Plaintiff: James Joseph Juluke, Jr.
Defendant: Pabo Segundo LLC and Double Horseshoe LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00718
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12181
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Double Horseshoe LLC to 1/5/2019; Pabo Segundo LLC to 1/5/2019. (rpc, )
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants' deadline to file a response to Plaintiff's Original Complaint (Dkt. #1 ) is extended to January 5, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 12/6/2018. (rpc, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Agreed) by Double Horseshoe LLC, Pabo Segundo LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Truong, Gordan)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Joseph Juluke, Jr. Double Horseshoe LLC served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Mussman, Louis)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. #1 ) is hereby extended to and including December 5, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 10/24/2018. (rpc, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Respond) to Plaintiff's Complaint by Double Horseshoe LLC, Pabo Segundo LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Truong, Gordan)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Parker Crosland on behalf of James Joseph Juluke, Jr (Crosland, Seth)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD***
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Pabo Segundo LLC. (rpc, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Double Horseshoe LLC. (rpc, )
October 9, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
October 9, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (rpc, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Double Horseshoe LLC, Pabo Segundo LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6974742.), filed by James Joseph Juluke, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mussman, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juluke v. Double Horseshoe LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Joseph Juluke, Jr.
Represented By: Seth Parker Crosland
Represented By: Louis I Mussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pabo Segundo LLC
Represented By: Gordan Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Double Horseshoe LLC
Represented By: Gordan Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?