Zywave, Inc. v. Cates
Plaintiff: Zywave, Inc.
Defendant: Justin Cates
Case Number: 4:2018cv00751
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss and Answer Subject Thereto filed by Zywave, Inc.. (Gollwitzer, Arthur)
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Zywave, Inc. (Forrest, Elizabeth)
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde Moody Siebman on behalf of Zywave, Inc. (Siebman, Clyde)
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Siebman Forrest on behalf of Zywave, Inc. (Forrest, Elizabeth)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Subject to Their Motoin to Dismiss by Justin Cates.(Holbrook, James)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss and Answer Subject Thereto by Justin Cates. (Holbrook, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2018: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
November 15, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Justin Cates to 11/29/2018. (rpc, )
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant's deadline to file an answer or other responsive pleading is hereby extended to November 29, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 11/15/2018. (rpc, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Justin Cates. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holbrook, James) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/14/2018) (rpc, ).
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Letter; Summons; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement; Appearance of Counsel; Exhibits 1-5 served on Justin Cates on October 25, 2018, filed by Zywave, Inc.. (Gollwitzer, Arthur)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Justin Cates. (daj, )
October 19, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, )
October 19, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (daj, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Zywave, Inc. (Gollwitzer, Arthur)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arthur Gollwitzer, III on behalf of Zywave, Inc. (Gollwitzer, Arthur)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Justin Cates ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6990412.), filed by Zywave, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gollwitzer, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zywave, Inc. v. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Cates
Represented By: Alexandra Serafina Fernandez
Represented By: Bennett Aaron Moss
Represented By: James W Holbrook, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zywave, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur Gollwitzer, III
Represented By: Elizabeth Siebman Forrest
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?