Chenault v. Container King, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mary Wiley Chenault
Defendant: Paula Pacanins, Container King, Inc. and Cole Smith
Case Number: 4:2018cv00752
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Container King, Inc., Paula Pacanins, Cole Smith (rpc, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 Request by Mary Wiley Chenault for Clerk's Entry of Default against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(McGuire, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Wiley Chenault. Paula Pacanins served on 11/10/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (McGuire, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Wiley Chenault. Cole Smith served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (McGuire, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Wiley Chenault. Container King, Inc. served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (McGuire, Michael)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Paula Pacanins. (rpc, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Container King, Inc. (rpc, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Cole Smith. (rpc, )
October 19, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
October 19, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Mary Wiley Chenault Certificate of Interested Parties (McGuire, Michael)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6991027.), filed by Mary Wiley Chenault. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Chenualt, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Additional Consent of Perry, #4 Exhibit Additional Consent of Spearman, #5 Exhibit Additional Consent of Fairman)(McGuire, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chenault v. Container King, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Pacanins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Container King, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Wiley Chenault
Represented By: Michael Shane McGuire
Represented By: Jesse Hamilton Forester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?