Oakmont Country Club Estates Property Owners Association, et al v. Baca et al
Plaintiff: Oakmont Country Club Estates Property Owners Association
Defendant: Michael Baca
Intervenor Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., United States of America (IRS), Housing and Urban Development, United States of America and Department of Housing and Urban Development
Intervenor Plaintiff: Sony Wessel
Case Number: 4:2018cv00795
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by United States of America re #2 Notice (Other) Second Supplement to the Record (Attachments: #1 Supplement Second Supplemental State Court Documents to the Record)(Herrin, Thomas)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 2/8/2019 at 3:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 1/21/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/17/2018. (baf, )
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND ADVISORY re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/17/2018. (baf, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Department of Housing and Urban Development of Disclaimer of Interest (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yeager, Ruth)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 ***PETITION IN INTERVENTION AND APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sony Wessel.(baf, )
November 8, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
November 8, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by United States of America (IRS) of Supplement to the Record from State Court (Attachments: #1 Supplement State Court Documents)(Herrin, Thomas)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America (IRS) from 158th Judicial District Denton County, Texas, case number 17-2453-158., filed by United States of America (IRS). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet)(Herrin, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakmont Country Club Estates Property Owners Association, et al v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: United States of America (IRS)
Represented By: Thomas Michael Herrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas Michael Herrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Ruth Harris Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sony Wessel
Represented By: Dorwin Lee Sargent, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakmont Country Club Estates Property Owners Association
Represented By: Dorwin Lee Sargent, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?