Head v. Cortland Improvements, LLC

Plaintiff: Jason Head
Defendant: Cortland Improvements, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00799
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Cortland Improvements, LLC to 1/14/2019. (rpc, )
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to Wednesday, January 14, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 12/18/2018. (rpc, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Cortland Improvements, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McAllister, Greg)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Cortland Improvements, LLC. (baf, )
November 27, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY - SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED SHOULD NOT BE FILED ON THE DOCKET. Document # 3, ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT TO MAIN DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Complaint.. (Masterson, W) Modified on 11/27/2018 (baf, ).
November 9, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
November 9, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Persons. (Masterson, W)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cortland Improvements, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7020040.), filed by Jason Head. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Masterson, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Head v. Cortland Improvements, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Head
Represented By: Alexandra Alyse Treadgold
Represented By: W D Masterson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cortland Improvements, LLC
Represented By: Greg Patrick McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?