Roger K. Hubele Living Trust v. Sante Fe Petroleum Inc.
Plaintiff: Roger K. Hubele Living Trust
Defendant: Sante Fe Petroleum Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00810
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schurr, Patrick)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Roger K. Hubele Living Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schurr, Patrick)
December 7, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 1/28/2019 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 1/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 12/7/2018. (baf, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sante Fe Petroleum Inc..(Wachendorfer, Edward)
November 25, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger K. Hubele Living Trust. Sante Fe Petroleum Inc. served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Schurr, Patrick)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Sante Fe Petroleum Inc.. (baf, ) (baf, ).
November 13, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
November 13, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sante Fe Petroleum Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7022572.), filed by Roger K. Hubele Living Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons(es), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schurr, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roger K. Hubele Living Trust v. Sante Fe Petroleum Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sante Fe Petroleum Inc.
Represented By: Edward R Wachendorfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger K. Hubele Living Trust
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Schurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?