C.C. et al v. Baylor Scott & White Health et al

Plaintiff: D. C., C. C., H. C., C. S., S. M. and L. C.
Defendant: Baylor Scott & White Holdings, Baylor Scott & White Health, Baylor Scott and White Health and Welfare Plan and Scott and White Health Plan
Case Number: 4:2018cv00828
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Updated for All Defendants. (rpc, )
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants' deadline to file a response to Plaintiff's Original Complaint (Dkt. #1 ) is extended to January 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 12/19/2018. (rpc, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Baylor Scott & White Health, Baylor Scott & White Holdings, Baylor Scott and White Health and Welfare Plan, Scott and White Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cody, Jeffery)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by S. M., D. C., L. C., H. C., C. C., C. S.. Baylor Scott & White Holdings served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Bouer-Josephson, Jodi)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by S. M., D. C., L. C., H. C., C. C., C. S.. Baylor Scott and White Health and Welfare Plan served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Bouer-Josephson, Jodi)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by S. M., D. C., L. C., H. C., C. C., C. S.. Baylor Scott & White Health served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Bouer-Josephson, Jodi)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by S. M., D. C., L. C., H. C., C. C., C. S.. Scott and White Health Plan served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Bouer-Josephson, Jodi)
November 23, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Baylor Scott & White Holdings. (rpc, )
November 23, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Scott and White Health Plan. (rpc, )
November 23, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Baylor Scott and White Health and Welfare Plan. (rpc, )
November 23, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Baylor Scott & White Health. (rpc, )
November 23, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
November 21, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (rpc, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7035484.), filed by S. M., D. C., c L s, L. C., H. C., c. c., C. S.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bouer-Josephson, Jodi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.C. et al v. Baylor Scott & White Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baylor Scott & White Holdings
Represented By: Jeffery A Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baylor Scott & White Health
Represented By: Jeffery A Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baylor Scott and White Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: Jeffery A Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott and White Health Plan
Represented By: Jeffery A Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. C.
Represented By: Jodi Felice Bouer-Josephson
Represented By: Austin Hinds England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. C.
Represented By: Jodi Felice Bouer-Josephson
Represented By: Austin Hinds England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. C.
Represented By: Jodi Felice Bouer-Josephson
Represented By: Austin Hinds England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. S.
Represented By: Jodi Felice Bouer-Josephson
Represented By: Austin Hinds England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. M.
Represented By: Jodi Felice Bouer-Josephson
Represented By: Austin Hinds England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. C.
Represented By: Jodi Felice Bouer-Josephson
Represented By: Austin Hinds England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?