Guo v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Yongtao Guo
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv00851
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Conference Report by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Inman, Sara) Modified on 1/9/2019 (rpc, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2019: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) (rpc, ).
December 27, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Rule 16 Management Conference set for 2/20/2019 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, )
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 2/20/2019 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before United States Magistrate Judge Kimberly C. Priest Johnson. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 1/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 12/20/2018. (baf, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Yongtao Guo Certificate of Interested Persons (Bergen, David)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Yongtao Guo. (Bergen, David)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara Elizabeth Inman on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Inman, Sara)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #3 Petition by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(rpc, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, filed by Yongtao Guo.(rpc, )
December 7, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
December 7, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (rpc, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by W Neil Rambin on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Rambin, W)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company from 429th Judicial District Court, Collin County, TX, case number 429-05658-2018. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7052384), filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Egeland, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guo v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yongtao Guo
Represented By: Richard D Daly
Represented By: David Loren Bergen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Egeland
Represented By: W Neil Rambin
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?