Ray v. 50 Stars Transport, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Trenton C Ray
Defendant: KNS Logistics, Inc., 50 Stars Transport, Inc and Anthony Fiorentino
Case Number: 4:2018cv00861
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
0 Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
1 Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trenton C Ray. Anthony Fiorentino served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Lenahan, Marc)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to Anthony Fiorentino. (rpc, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walters, Randall)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Trenton C Ray (Lenahan, Marc)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Grant Tyler Thornhill on behalf of All Defendants (Thornhill, Grant)
January 23, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance submitted by 50 Stars Transport, Inc, KNS Logistics, Inc. The Notice should be filed using the login and password for the attorney making the appearance. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Randall G Walters on behalf of All Defendants (Walters, Randall) Modified on 1/23/2019 (rpc, ).
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by 50 Stars Transport, Inc (Walters, Randall)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 2/20/2019 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 1/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 12/20/2018. (baf, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by 50 Stars Transport, Inc, KNS Logistics, Inc.. (Walters, Randall)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Petition by 50 Stars Transport, Inc, KNS Logistics, Inc.(rpc, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against 50 Stars Transport, Inc, KNS Logistics, Inc., filed by Trenton C Ray.(rpc, )
December 12, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
December 12, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (rpc, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KNS Logistics, Inc., 50 Stars Transport, Inc from 401st Judicial District, Collin County, Texas, case number 401-05125-2018. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7060239), filed by KNS Logistics, Inc., 50 Stars Transport, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Walters, Randall) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2018: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (rpc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray v. 50 Stars Transport, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trenton C Ray
Represented By: Thomas Boyd Cowart
Represented By: Marc Christopher Lenahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KNS Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Randall G Walters
Represented By: Grant Tyler Thornhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 50 Stars Transport, Inc
Represented By: Randall G Walters
Represented By: Grant Tyler Thornhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Fiorentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?