BioTE Medical, LLC v. Jacobsen et al
Plaintiff: BioTE Medical, LLC
Defendant: Mark P. Burns, Evexias Metrita-Columbia, LLC, North American Custom Laboratories, LLC a/k/a Farmakeio, Evexias Health Solutions, LLC, EvexiPEL, Jeff Hill, Evexias HRT, LLC f/k/a Hormonal Health and Wellness Centers, LLC, Sutherland Solutions, LLC, Jeff DeNeui, Farmakeio Outsourcing, LLC, Michael S. Cole, Farmakeio Nutraceuticals, LLC, Terri J. DeNeui, Evexias-Anthem Columbia, LLC, Daniel D. DeNeui, Kent Jacobsen, Nilus, LLC, Evexias Medical Centers, PLLC f/k/a Terri Suresh ACNP, PLLS a/k/a Hormonal Health Wellness & Skin Center a/k/a Hormonal Health Wellness and Aesthetics Center a/k/a Hormonal Health & Wellness, Michael Sheffield, MD, Jeni Guinn, Evexias Holding Co, LLC, Neal Rouzier, MD, Martin Groves, Justin Graves, Kimberly Meegan, Wendy Sandoval, Dan Mikals, Gunther Mueller, Robert Alan Harris, John Thomas, Nicole Turcotte, Lisa Mikals, Evexias-Anthem Alaska, LLC, Dominic Verrilli, Andrea C. Jones, Forget About It, Inc., Dustin C. DeNeui, Evexias Management, LLC, Evexias Medical Centers, PLLC, North American Custom Laboratories, Hormonal Health, Hormonal Health Wellness and Aesthetics Center, Hormonal Health Wellness, Farmakeio and Evexias HRT, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00866
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a reply brief in support of its Application for Preliminary Injunctive Relief is extended to Friday, February 15, 2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/8/2019. (rpc, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #69 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,, #68 Response to Motion,, Application for Preliminary Injunction by BioTE Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Extension of Time)(Lurich, Ryan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/7/2019) (rpc, ).
February 1, 2019 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief and Application filed by Michael S. Cole, Daniel D. DeNeui, Dustin C. DeNeui, Jeff DeNeui, Terri J. DeNeui, EvexiPEL, Evexias HRT, LLC, Evexias Health Solutions, LLC, Evexias Holding Co, LLC, Evexias Management, LLC, Evexias Medical Centers, PLLC, Evexias Metrita-Columbia, LLC, Evexias-Anthem Alaska, LLC, Evexias-Anthem Columbia, LLC, Farmakeio Nutraceuticals, LLC, Farmakeio Outsourcing, LLC, Forget About It, Inc., Justin Graves, Martin Groves, Jeni Guinn, Robert Alan Harris, Kent Jacobsen, Dan Mikals, Lisa Mikals, Gunther Mueller, Nilus, LLC, North American Custom Laboratories, Neal Rouzier, MD, Wendy Sandoval, Michael Sheffield, MD, John Thomas, Nicole Turcotte. (Attachments: #1 Appendix in support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Application for Injunctive Relief, #2 Exhibit A in support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Application for Injunctive Relief, #3 Exhibit B (Part 1) in support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Application for Injunctive Relief, #4 Exhibit B (Part 2) in support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Application for Injunctive Relief, #5 Exhibit B (Part 3) in support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Application for Injunctive Relief, #6 Exhibit C in support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Application for Injunctive Relief, #7 Exhibit D in support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Application for Injunctive Relief, #8 Exhibit E in support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Application for Injunctive Relief, #9 Exhibit F (part 1) in support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Application for Injunctive Relief, #10 Exhibit F (part 2) in support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Application for Injunctive Relief, #11 Exhibit F (part 3) in support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Application for Injunctive Relief)(Clift, Gregory)
February 1, 2019 Filing 68 RESPONSE to Motion re #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief and Application filed by Mark P. Burns, Jeff Hill, Andrea C. Jones, Kimberly Meegan, Dominic Verrilli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 Declaration of Andrea Jones, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 Declaration of Mark Burns, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 Declaration of Jeff Hill, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 Declaration of Dominic Verrilli, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 Declaration of Kimberley Meegan, #6 Text of Proposed Order Order Denying BioTE Medical, LLC's Application for Injunctive Relief)(Babb, Kenneth)
February 1, 2019 Filing 67 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Mark P. Burns served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 31, 2019 Filing 66 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Michael S. Cole waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Daniel D. DeNeui waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Dustin C. DeNeui waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Jeff DeNeui waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Terri J. DeNeui waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; EvexiPEL waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Evexias HRT, LLC waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Evexias Health Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Evexias Holding Co, LLC waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Evexias Management, LLC waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Evexias Medical Centers, PLLC waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Evexias Metrita-Columbia, LLC waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Evexias-Anthem Alaska, LLC waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Evexias-Anthem Columbia, LLC waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Farmakeio Nutraceuticals, LLC waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Farmakeio Outsourcing, LLC waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Forget About It, Inc. waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Justin Graves waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Martin Groves waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Jeni Guinn waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Robert Alan Harris waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Kent Jacobsen waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Dan Mikals waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Lisa Mikals waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Gunther Mueller waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Nilus, LLC waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; North American Custom Laboratories waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Neal Rouzier, MD waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Wendy Sandoval waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Michael Sheffield, MD waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; John Thomas waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Nicole Turcotte waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 31, 2019 Filing 65 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Robert Alan Harris served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 30, 2019 Counsel are reminded that the Court has not opted out of this court's Local Rules concerning courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of pleadings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzant's chambers. Please use tabs and dividers for exhibits. (tls)
January 30, 2019 Filing 64 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Andrea C. Jones waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 30, 2019 Filing 63 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Nicole Turcotte served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 62 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Kimberly Meegan served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Justin Graves served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. John Thomas served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 59 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Jeff Hill served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 58 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Kent Jacobsen served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 57 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Dominic Verrilli served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 56 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Dan Mikals served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Nilus, LLC served on 1/19/2019, answer due 2/11/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Lisa Mikals served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Dustin C. DeNeui served on 1/19/2019, answer due 2/11/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Jeni Guinn served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Neal Rouzier, MD served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Michael Sheffield, MD served on 1/21/2019, answer due 2/11/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) by Mark P. Burns, Jeff Hill, Andrea C. Jones, Kimberly Meegan, Dominic Verrilli. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order to Dismiss)(Babb, Kenneth)
January 29, 2019 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Martin Groves served on 1/21/2019, answer due 2/11/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Jeff DeNeui served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Gunther Mueller served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/18/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BioTE Medical, LLC. Forget About It, Inc. served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/18/2019. (Lurich, Ryan)
January 23, 2019 The parties are hereby notified that the Court will enter an Order granting in part the Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief and Application by Evexias Health Solutions, LLC. The Court will extend the response deadline to February 1, 2019. (no attachment) (tls)
January 23, 2019 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief and Application filed by BioTE Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lurich, Ryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2019: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER extending deadline: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any response to Dkt. #41 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Dkt. #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief and Application no later than 2:00 p.m. on January 23, 2018. Entered by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/23/2019. (tls)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re #41 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief and Application. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any response no later than12:00 p.m. on January 23, 2018. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/22/2019. (rpc, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 42 ***NOW ATTACHED TO #41 . PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Additional Attachments to Main Document (Proposed Order): #41 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief and Application .. (Clift, Gregory) Modified on 1/18/2019 (rpc, ).
January 18, 2019 Filing 41 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief and Application by Evexias Health Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Federal Enlargement Appendix)(Clift, Gregory) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/18/2019: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
January 9, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief and Application by BioTE Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit 1B, #4 Exhibit 1C, #5 Exhibit 1D, #6 Exhibit 1E, #7 Exhibit 1F, #8 Exhibit 1G, #9 Exhibit 1H, #10 Exhibit 1I, #11 Exhibit 1J, #12 Exhibit 1K, #13 Exhibit 1L, #14 Exhibit 2, #15 Exhibit 3, #16 Exhibit 4, #17 Exhibit 5, #18 Exhibit 6, #19 Exhibit 7)(Lurich, Ryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2019: #20 Proposed Preliminary Injunction) (rpc, ).
December 14, 2018 Filing 39 SUMMONS Issued as to Wendy Sandoval. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 38 SUMMONS Issued as to Terri J. DeNeui. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 37 SUMMONS Issued as to Sutherland Solutions, LLC. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 36 SUMMONS Issued as to Robert Alan Harris. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 35 SUMMONS Issued as to North American Custom Laboratories. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 34 SUMMONS Issued as to Nilus, LLC. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 33 SUMMONS Issued as to Nicole Turcotte. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 32 SUMMONS Issued as to Neal Rouzier, MD. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS Issued as to Michael Sheffield, MD. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS Issued as to Michael S. Cole. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS Issued as to Martin Groves. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS Issued as to Mark P. Burns. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS Issued as to Lisa Mikals. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS Issued as to Kimberly Meegan. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS Issued as to Justin Graves. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS Issued as to John Thomas. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS Issued as to Jeni Guinn. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS Issued as to Jeff Hill. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Issued as to Jeff DeNeui. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Issued as to Kent Jacobsen. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Issued as to Gunther Mueller. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Issued as to Forget About It, Inc. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Issued as to Farmakeio Outsourcing, LLC. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Issued as to Farmakeio Nutraceuticals, LLC. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Issued as to EvexiPEL. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued as to Evexias-Anthem Columbia, LLC. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued as to Evexias-Anthem Alaska, LLC. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued as to Evexias Metrita-Columbia, LLC. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to Evexias Medical Centers, PLLC. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to Evexias Management, LLC. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Evexias HRT, LLC. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Evexias Holding Co, LLC. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Evexias Health Solutions, LLC. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Dustin C. DeNeui. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Dominic Verrilli. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Daniel D. DeNeui. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Dan Mikals. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrea C. Jones. (rpc, )
December 14, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
December 13, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Application for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7062824.), filed by Evexias Metrita-Columbia, LLC, Evexias Management, LLC, Robert Alan Harris, Jeff DeNeui, Sutherland Solutions, LLC, Dominic Verrilli, Kent Jacobsen, Kimberly Meegan, Evexias HRT, LLC f/k/a Hormonal Health and Wellness Centers, LLC, Nicole Turcotte, Forget About It, Inc., Evexias Health Solutions, LLC, EvexiPEL, Jeff Hill, Justin Graves, Michael Sheffield, MD, Gunther Mueller, Evexias Medical Centers, PLLC f/k/a Terri Suresh ACNP, PLLS a/k/a Hormonal Health Wellness & Skin Center a/k/a Hormonal Health Wellness and Aesthetics Center a/k/a Hormonal Health & Wellness, Evexias-Anthem Alaska, LLC, Dan Mikals, Martin Groves, Mark P. Burns, Neal Rouzier, MD, Evexias Holding Co, LLC, Michael S. Cole, Nilus, LLC, Jeni Guinn, North American Custom Laboratories, LLC a/k/a Farmakeio, John Thomas, Lisa Mikals, Wendy Sandoval, Dustin C. DeNeui, Farmakeio Outsourcing, LLC, Daniel D. DeNeui, Evexias-Anthem Columbia, LLC, Farmakeio Nutraceuticals, LLC, Andrea C. Jones, Terri J. DeNeui. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lurich, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BioTE Medical, LLC v. Jacobsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark P. Burns
Represented By: Kenneth Patrick Babb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evexias Metrita-Columbia, LLC
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Custom Laboratories, LLC a/k/a Farmakeio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evexias Health Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EvexiPEL
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Hill
Represented By: Kenneth Patrick Babb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evexias HRT, LLC f/k/a Hormonal Health and Wellness Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutherland Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff DeNeui
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmakeio Outsourcing, LLC
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Cole
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmakeio Nutraceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri J. DeNeui
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evexias-Anthem Columbia, LLC
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel D. DeNeui
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Jacobsen
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nilus, LLC
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evexias Medical Centers, PLLC f/k/a Terri Suresh ACNP, PLLS a/k/a Hormonal Health Wellness & Skin Center a/k/a Hormonal Health Wellness and Aesthetics Center a/k/a Hormonal Health & Wellness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sheffield, MD
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeni Guinn
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evexias Holding Co, LLC
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal Rouzier, MD
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Groves
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Graves
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Meegan
Represented By: Kenneth Patrick Babb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Sandoval
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Mikals
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gunther Mueller
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Alan Harris
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thomas
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Turcotte
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Mikals
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evexias-Anthem Alaska, LLC
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Verrilli
Represented By: Kenneth Patrick Babb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea C. Jones
Represented By: Kenneth Patrick Babb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forget About It, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin C. DeNeui
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evexias Management, LLC
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evexias Medical Centers, PLLC
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Custom Laboratories
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hormonal Health
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hormonal Health Wellness and Aesthetics Center
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hormonal Health Wellness
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmakeio
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evexias HRT, LLC
Represented By: Gregory M Clift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BioTE Medical, LLC
Represented By: Ryan K Lurich
Represented By: Eric Michael Friedman
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?