Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha et al v. Partsites, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha and Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Defendant: Scott Anderson and Partsites, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00908
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
0 Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
1 Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Elizabeth K. Rucki, #2 Exhibit 1a, #3 Exhibit 1b, #4 Exhibit 1c, #5 Exhibit 1d, #6 Exhibit 1e, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4a, #10 Exhibit 4b, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12, #19 Exhibit 13a, #20 Exhibit 13b, #21 Exhibit 13c, #22 Exhibit 13d, #23 Exhibit 14, #24 Exhibit 15, #25 Exhibit 16, #26 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/15/2019. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 3/20/2019 at 01:30 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 2/11/2019. (rpc, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel J. Barsky on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7133114. (Barsky, Daniel)
February 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Harris J. Koroglu on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7132951. (Koroglu, Harris)
February 8, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance and #15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance submitted by Scott Anderson, Partsites, LLC. Each document should be refiled using the login and passoword for the attorney making the appearance. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 15 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Vincent Jerome Allen on behalf of Scott Anderson, Partsites, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7131437. (Allen, Vincent) Modified on 2/8/2019 (rpc, ).
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Vincent Jerome Allen on behalf of Scott Anderson, Partsites, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7131435. (Allen, Vincent) Modified on 2/8/2019 (rpc, ).
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Partsites, LLC (Allen, Vincent)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Scott Anderson, Partsites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Vincent) (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/8/2019) (rpc, ).
January 24, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Partsites, LLC to 2/7/2019; Scott Anderson to 2/7/2019. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Scott Anderson, Partsites, LLC.( Allen, Vincent)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tyler M. Beas on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Beas, Tyler)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth King Rucki on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rucki, Elizabeth)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul J Reilly on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Reilly, Paul)
January 15, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Partsites, LLC to 1/24/2019. (daj, )
January 15, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Scott Anderson to 1/24/2019. (daj, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. Partsites, LLC served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Reilly, Paul) Modified on 1/15/2019 (daj, ).
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. Scott Anderson served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Reilly, Paul) Modified on 1/15/2019 (daj, ).
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Scott Anderson. (rpc, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Partsites, LLC. (rpc, )
January 2, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
December 28, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (rpc, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (Siebman, Clyde)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Siebman, Clyde)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scott Anderson, Partsites, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7078768.), filed by Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siebman, Clyde)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha et al v. Partsites, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Paul J Reilly
Represented By: Elizabeth Siebman Forrest
Represented By: Tyler M. Beas
Represented By: Elizabeth King Rucki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Paul J Reilly
Represented By: Elizabeth Siebman Forrest
Represented By: Tyler M. Beas
Represented By: Elizabeth King Rucki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Anderson
Represented By: Harris J. Koroglu
Represented By: Vincent Jerome Allen
Represented By: Daniel J. Barsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partsites, LLC
Represented By: Harris J. Koroglu
Represented By: Vincent Jerome Allen
Represented By: Daniel J. Barsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?