Harris et al v. BMW of North America, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Zhen Lin, Shawn Wilson, Andrew Carrier, John May, Derrick Dunlap, George Wynn and Roderick Harris
Defendant: Bavarian Motor Works and BMW of North America, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00016
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. It is ORDERED that Defendants' motion (Dkt. #8 ) is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/8/2019. (rpc, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay Scheduling Conference and Related Discovery Deadlines by BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turano, Joseph)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) by BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turano, Joseph)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BMW of North America, LLC, filed by George Wynn, John May, Andrew Carrier, Shawn Wilson, Zhen Lin, Roderick Harris, Derrick Dunlap. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Burton, Jody)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 4/5/2019 at 2:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 3/22/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/15/2019. (baf, )
February 7, 2019 Counsel are reminded that the Court has not opted out of this court's Local Rules concerning courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of pleadings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzant's chambers. (tls)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) by BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turano, Joseph)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Wynn, John May, Andrew Carrier, Shawn Wilson, Zhen Lin, Roderick Harris, Derrick Dunlap. Bavarian Motor Works served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Burton, Jody)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Wynn, John May, Andrew Carrier, Shawn Wilson, Zhen Lin, Roderick Harris, Derrick Dunlap. BMW of North America, LLC served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Burton, Jody)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Bavarian Motor Works. (rpc, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to BMW of North America, LLC. (rpc, )
January 8, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
January 8, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Zhen Lin, Andrew Carrier, Derrick Dunlap, Roderick Harris, John May, Shawn Wilson, George Wynn. (Burton, Jody)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Zhen Lin, Andrew Carrier, Derrick Dunlap, Roderick Harris, John May, Shawn Wilson, George Wynn (Burton, Jody)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BMW of North America, LLC, Bavarian Motor Works ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7088029.), filed by George Wynn, John May, Andrew Carrier, Shawn Wilson, Zhen Lin, Roderick Harris, Derrick Dunlap. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burton, Jody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. BMW of North America, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhen Lin
Represented By: Jody Berke Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Wilson
Represented By: Jody Berke Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Carrier
Represented By: Jody Berke Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John May
Represented By: Jody Berke Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Dunlap
Represented By: Jody Berke Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Wynn
Represented By: Jody Berke Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Harris
Represented By: Jody Berke Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bavarian Motor Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Turano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?