Berdion v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, et al

Plaintiff: Leticia Berdion
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services LLC and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00023
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Leticia Berdion PLAINTIFFS INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Lane, Robert)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Leticia Berdion PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Lane, Robert)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The Court sets this matter for a telephonic status conference on Monday, 6/3/2019 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 2/8/2019. (baf, )
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2020 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 5/23/2019 for Plaintiff and by 6/6/2019 for Defendant. Discovery due by 7/19/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 4/11/2019. Proposed Jury instructions/Form of Verdict due by 12/23/2019. Mediation Completion due by 8/1/2019. Designation of Mediator due by 6/20/2019. Motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, or other dispositive motions due by 6/6/2019. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 12/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 2/8/2019. (baf, )
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that the Rule 16 management conference set for Thursday, February 28, 2019, at 2:30pm is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 2/8/2019. (baf, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Troiano, Daniel)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 2/28/2019 at 2:30 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 2/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 1/11/2019. (baf, )
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND ADVISORY re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 1/11/2019. (baf, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company.(baf, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed by Leticia Berdion.(baf, )
January 11, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
January 11, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (baf, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank, AG for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee; Corporate Parent The Carrington Companies, LLC for Carrington Mortgage Services LLC. (Troiano, Daniel)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee -- Certificate of Interested Parties (Troiano, Daniel)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee from 211th Judicial District Court, Denton County, case number 18-11773-211. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7093714), filed by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, A-1 Docket, #2 Exhibit A-2 Petition, #3 Exhibit A-3 Citation Request, #4 Exhibit A-4 Records Request, #5 Exhibit A-5 Return Service, #6 Exhibit A-6 Answer, #7 Exhibit B CAD, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Supplemental Coversheet)(Manning, Matt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berdion v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services LLC
Represented By: Matt D Manning
Represented By: Daniel Pasquale Troiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Daniel Pasquale Troiano
Represented By: Matt D Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Berdion
Represented By: Joshua David Gordon
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?