Ashdown v. Denton County Texas et al
Plaintiff: Phillip B Ashdown
Defendant: NFN Edgar, Denton County Correctional Health, Clair Barnes, Jane Doe, Dewayne Dockery, Ethan Keith, Denton County Jail, Texas Denton County, NFN Miksits, Matt Richardson, Tracy. Murphy, NFN Alambar, NFN Kaver, Michael Tutt, NFN Boggs, Marty Buchannan, Denton County Administration, NFN Karbacher, J Karakashivich, NFN Gothwald, NFN Coats, M Sanders, Paul Johnson, John Kissenger and NFN Gourley
Case Number: 4:2019cv00099
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for granting of order for immediate securement and subpoena of electronically stored evidence of video camera footage files and also of digital camera photos, by Phillip B Ashdown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(daj, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Removal of Magistrate Judge Nowak by Phillip B Ashdown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2, #3 Envelope(s))(daj, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 22 OBJECTION to #18 Report and Recommendations by Phillip B Ashdown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2, #3 Envelope(s))(daj, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Phillip B Ashdown as to #18 Report and Recommendations.(daj, )
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying as premature #17 Motion for discovery and subpoena of video footage. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 3/19/2019. (daj, )
March 12, 2019 Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Phillip B Ashdown as to #16 Order Re Collection and Payment of Full Filing Fee. (daj, )
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Phillip B Ashdown. It is accordingly recommended that Plaintiff's #15 motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 3/12/2019. (daj, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Discovery Request and Subpoena of Video Footage by Phillip B Ashdown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(daj, )
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Re Collection and Payment of Full Filing Fee: pla to pay $350.00, the balance of the full filing fee. The agency having custody of the Plaintiff shall deduct 20% of each deposit made to the Plaintiff's inmate trust account and forward payments to the Court on a regular basis provided the account exceeds $10.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 3/4/2019. (daj, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Phillip B Ashdown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2, #3 Exhibit #3, #4 Exhibit #4, #5 Exhibit #5, #6 Exhibit #6, #7 Envelope(s))(daj, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Phillip B Ashdown. (Attachments: #1 Data sheets, #2 Cover letter, #3 Envelope(s))(daj, )
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DEFICIENCY ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff has thirty days from the receipt of this order to either pay the $400 filing fee or submit a new application to proceed in forma pauperis on the standardized form, along with a Certificate of Inmate Account Balance certified by the inmate trust fund officer and a current resident account summary. The Clerk shall accept no other documents from Plaintiff until he complies with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 2/8/2019. (daj, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, )
February 7, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***Consent form mailed to plaintiff. (daj, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00106. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 9, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTION, AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER, AND TRANSFERRING CASE. Ashdown's objection is therefore OVERRULED. The Court AFFIRMS Judge Horan's #5 order transferring this action and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to transfer this action to the Sherman Division of the Eastern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/6/2019) (rekc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/7/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION filed by Phillip B Ashdown re: #5 Order Transferring to Another District. (rekc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/7/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/31/2019) (Judge Jane J. Boyle) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/7/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 Status Request by Phillip B Ashdown with Deputy Clerk Response. (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/7/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: Under Section 1391(b) and the undersigned's authority granted by Rule 2(a)(3) of the Court's Miscellaneous Order No. 6, this action will be transferred to the Sherman Division of the Eastern District of Texas on February 6, 2019 to allow any party to file an objection to Judge Boyle within 14 days after being served with a copy of this order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/16/2019) (epm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/7/2019.]
January 16, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Wed Jan 16 15:58:50 CST 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/7/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Phillip Ashdown. (epm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/7/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against NFN Alambar, Clair Barnes, NFN Boggs, Marty Buchannan, NFN Coats, Denton County Administration, Denton County Correctional Health, Denton County Jail, Denton County Texas, NFN Dewayne, Jane Doe, Jane Doe, NFN Edgar, NFN Gothwald, NFN Gourley, Paul Johnson, J Karakashivich, NFN Karbacher, NFN Kaver, Ethan Keith, John Kissenger, NFN Miksits, Tracy Murphy, Matt Richardson, M Sanders, Michael Tutt filed by Phillip Ashdown. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (epm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/7/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (epm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/7/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/7/2019.]
January 14, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Mon Jan 14 18:19:53 CST 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashdown v. Denton County Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip B Ashdown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denton County Correctional Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clair Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewayne Dockery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denton County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Denton County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Miksits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Alambar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Kaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Tutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Buchannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denton County Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Karbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Karakashivich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Gothwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kissenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Gourley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?