Shinn Fu Company Of America, Inc. v. Save Phace, Inc.

Plaintiff: Shinn Fu Company Of America, Inc.
Defendant: Save Phace, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00104
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Save Phace, Inc. (rpc, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 Request by Shinn Fu Company Of America, Inc. for Clerk's Entry of Default against Save Phace, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Claire Abernathy Henry, #2 Text of Proposed Order -- Clerk's Entry of Default)(Henry, Claire)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shinn Fu Company Of America, Inc.. Save Phace, Inc. served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Henry, Claire)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Save Phace, Inc. (rpc, )
February 11, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
February 8, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Shinn Fu Company Of America, Inc. (Fair, Andrea)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Shinn Fu Company Of America, Inc.. (Henry, Claire)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Shinn Fu Company Of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Shinn Fu Corporation for Shinn Fu Company Of America, Inc.. (Henry, Claire)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Save Phace, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7132923.), filed by Shinn Fu Company Of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - ODA Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Captain America Graphic, #4 Exhibit C - Burning Skull Graphic, #5 Exhibit D - Ripped Graphic, #6 Exhibit E - U.S. Copyright Registration No. VA0002098179, #7 Exhibit F - U.S. Copyright Registration No. VA0002098189, #8 Exhibit G - U.S. Copyright Registration No. VA0002076952, #9 Exhibit H - Email exchange)(Henry, Claire)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shinn Fu Company Of America, Inc. v. Save Phace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Save Phace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shinn Fu Company Of America, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: John David Denkenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?