Vaughan v. Lewisville Independent School District et al
Plaintiff: Frank Vaughan
Defendant: Kronda Thimesch, Kristi Hassett, Allison Lassahn, Katherine Sells, Jenny Proznik, Angie Cox, Tracy Scott Miller and Lewisville Independent School District
Case Number: 4:2019cv00109
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1971
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory and Permanent Injunctive Relief Concerning Violations of Section 2 of the Voting Rights Act filed by Frank Vaughan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Melia, Theresa)
March 25, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Angie Cox, Kristi Hassett, Allison Lassahn, Lewisville Independent School District, Tracy Scott Miller, Jenny Proznik, Katherine Sells, Kronda Thimesch.(Walker, Meredith)
March 22, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory and Permanent Injunctive Relief Concerning Violations of Section 2 of the Voting Rights Act by Angie Cox, Kristi Hassett, Allison Lassahn, Tracy Scott Miller, Jenny Proznik, Katherine Sells, Kronda Thimesch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Meredith)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - GRANTING #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants' deadline to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to March 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 3/4/2019. (baf, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Angie Cox, Kristi Hassett, Allison Lassahn, Lewisville Independent School District, Tracy Scott Miller, Jenny Proznik, Katherine Sells, Kronda Thimesch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Meredith)
February 26, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Vaughan. Kronda Thimesch served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Brewer, William)
February 26, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Vaughan. Tracy Scott Miller served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Brewer, William)
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Vaughan. Jenny Proznik served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Brewer, William)
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Vaughan. Angie Cox served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Brewer, William)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Vaughan. Allison Lassahn served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Brewer, William)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Vaughan. Kristi Hassett served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Brewer, William)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Vaughan. Katherine Sells served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Brewer, William)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Vaughan. Lewisville Independent School District served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Brewer, William)
February 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Allison Lassahn. (baf, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Lewisville Independent School District. (baf, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Kristi Hassett. (baf, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Jenny Proznik. (baf, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Tracy Scott Miller. (baf, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Kronda Thimesch. (baf, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Katherine Sells. (baf, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Angie Cox. (baf, )
February 12, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7136308.), filed by Frank Vaughan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brewer, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughan v. Lewisville Independent School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kronda Thimesch
Represented By: Donald Craig Wood
Represented By: Christine Smith Badillo
Represented By: Meredith Prykryl Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Hassett
Represented By: Donald Craig Wood
Represented By: Christine Smith Badillo
Represented By: Meredith Prykryl Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Lassahn
Represented By: Donald Craig Wood
Represented By: Christine Smith Badillo
Represented By: Meredith Prykryl Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Sells
Represented By: Donald Craig Wood
Represented By: Christine Smith Badillo
Represented By: Meredith Prykryl Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Proznik
Represented By: Donald Craig Wood
Represented By: Christine Smith Badillo
Represented By: Meredith Prykryl Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Cox
Represented By: Donald Craig Wood
Represented By: Christine Smith Badillo
Represented By: Meredith Prykryl Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Scott Miller
Represented By: Donald Craig Wood
Represented By: Christine Smith Badillo
Represented By: Meredith Prykryl Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewisville Independent School District
Represented By: Donald Craig Wood
Represented By: Christine Smith Badillo
Represented By: Meredith Prykryl Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Vaughan
Represented By: William Andrew Brewer, III
Represented By: Michael Joseph Collins
Represented By: Theresa Lofgren Melia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?