Roberts v. Johnson

Plaintiff: Curtis-Shayne Roberts
Defendant: Paul Johnson
Case Number: 4:2019cv00114
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Curtis-Shayne Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(daj, )
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Paul Johnson, #9 First MOTION to Stay re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Paul Johnson. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 8] and Motion to Stay [Dkt. 9] no later than April 26, 2019, at 5:00 p.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 4/10/2019. (daj, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Stay re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Paul Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion to Stay Discovery)(Feldt, John)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Paul Johnson. Responses due by 3/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion to Dismiss)(Feldt, John)
March 26, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #6 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12 (b)(1) and 12(b)(6) and #7 First MOTION to Stay re 6 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12 (b)(1) and 12(b)(6) submitted by Paul Johnson. The attorney signature on the Motions is from an attorney not associated with this case. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** First MOTION to Stay re #6 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12 (b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Paul Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion to Stay)(Feldt, John) Modified on 3/26/2019 (rpc, ).
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12 (b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Paul Johnson. Responses due by 3/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion to Dismiss 12(b)(6))(Feldt, John) Modified on 3/26/2019 (rpc, ).
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE - Claimant's Objection to Magistrate Hearing Administrative Case, by Curtis-Shayne Roberts (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(daj, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Curtis-Shayne Roberts. Paul Johnson served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (rpc, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Paul Johnson. (rpc, )
February 20, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number TXE 6-46021. (rlf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis-Shayne Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Johnson
Represented By: John Joseph Feldt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?