Edwards, Jr. v. Junior Statesmen of America Foundation Inc

Plaintiff: Daniel Edwards, Jr
Defendant: Junior Statesmen of America Foundation Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00140
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order Deadlines)(Katon, Andrew)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING FAILURE TO FILE RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE REPOT AND NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL. Plaintiff shall fully comply with his Rule 26(f) obligations by conferring with counsel for Defendant and participating in the submission of a joint report no later than 4/12/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties' Rule 16 Management Conference, originally set for 4/9/2019, is hereby RESET to 5/22/2019 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 4/8/2019. (baf, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wolf, Tracy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 4/9/2019 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 4/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 2/27/2019. (baf, )
February 26, 2019 Notified Attorney for Defendant, Andrew Katon, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY ADMITTANCE LETTER EMAILED TO ANDREW KATON*** (baf, )
February 26, 2019 Notified Attorney for Plaintiff, Angel Shavonne Brown Reveles, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY ADMITTANCE LETTER EMAILED TO ANGEL SHAVONNE BROWN REVELES*** (baf, )
February 26, 2019 Notified Attorney for Plaintiff, Stacy Sylvester Lee Merritt, Sr., Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY ADMITTANCE LETTER EMAILED TO STACY SYLVESTER LEE MERRITT, SR.*** (baf, )
February 26, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
February 26, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-01263. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Transfer. The above-styled and -numbered civil action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Sherman Division. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/26/2019) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/26/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Junior Statesmen of America Foundation Inc. (Katon, Andrew) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/26/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Junior Statesmen of America Foundation Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Katon, Andrew) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/26/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division Pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(3) for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Texas filed by Junior Statesmen of America Foundation Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Andrew Katon, #3 Proposed Order)Attorney Andrew Katon added to party Junior Statesmen of America Foundation Inc(pty:dft) (Katon, Andrew) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/26/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Junior Statesmen of America Foundation Inc answer due 11/1/2018. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 10/24/2018) (rekc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/26/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Junior Statesmen of America Foundation Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Tracy Graves Wolf added to party Junior Statesmen of America Foundation Inc(pty:dft) (Wolf, Tracy) Modified text on 10/22/2018 (rekc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/26/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Order and Judgment filed 9/11/2018 are vacated. The Court advises that counsel strictly adhere to any future filing deadline(s). Case reopened. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 9/19/2018) (epm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/26/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 VACATED per #10 Order JUDGMENT: The above-styled and -numbered civil action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 9/12/2018) (axm) Modified on 9/19/2018 (epm). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/26/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 VACATED per #10 Order ORDER: Plaintiff has failed to file proof of service in accordance with this Court's prior order. IT IS THEREFORE, ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendants be DISMISSED without prejudice. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 9/12/2018) (axm) Modified on 9/19/2018 (epm). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/26/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Junior Statesmen of America Foundation Inc ; served on 8/29/2018. (Brown Reveles, Angel) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/26/2019.]
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's claims against Defendant will be dismissed without prejudice if proof of service has not been filed by 9:00 a.m. on 9/6/2018. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/17/2018) (sss) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/26/2019.]
June 2, 2018 Filing 5 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS (Civil Cover Sheet) to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Daniel Edwards, Jr. (Brown Reveles, Angel) Modified docket text on 6/4/2018 (zkc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/26/2019.]
June 2, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Daniel Edwards, Jr. (Brown Reveles, Angel) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/26/2019.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Junior Statesmen of America Foundation Inc. (ran) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/26/2019.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ran) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/26/2019.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Junior Statesmen of America filed by Daniel Edwards, jr. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9195048) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Merritt, Stacy Sylvester) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards, Jr. v. Junior Statesmen of America Foundation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Edwards, Jr
Represented By: Andrew Haughey Katon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Junior Statesmen of America Foundation Inc
Represented By: Tracy Graves Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?