Neil Gilmour, Trustee for the Grantor Trust of Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, et al v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, et al

Plaintiff: Neil Gilmour, Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP, Victory Medical Center Plano, LP, Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP, Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP, Victory Parent Company, LLC and Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP
Defendant: Capital Blue Cross Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Indiana, Regence Bluecross Blueshield of Oregon, Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Anthem Blue Cross of Ohio, BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield Hallmark, Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Virginia, Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Blue Shield of Northeastern New York, Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Highmark, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Highmark Health, Regence Blueshield, Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company, Highmark West Virginia Inc., Noridian Mutual Insurance Company, Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., QCC Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Premera Blue Cross, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Carefirst of Maryland Inc, Regence Bluecross Blueshield of Utah, BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc., Wellmark, Inc., Independence Health Group, Inc., Capital Hospital Service, Healthnow New York Inc., Empire HealthChoice, Inc., Blue Cross of California, BCBS Care First of Maryland, Lifetime Healthcare, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Community Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of New York, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., Capital BlueCross, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company and Blue Cross Blue Shield Anthem National Account
Case Number: 4:2019cv00160
Filed: March 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
March 7, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 192 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 5:17-cv-00518. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #152 Motion to Dismiss ; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #157 Motion to Dismiss ; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #158 Motion to Change Venue; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #159 Motion to Dismiss ; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #182 Motion to Dismiss; It is Further Ordered that this case is hereby TRANSFERRED TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, SHERMAN DIVISION. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
November 12, 2018 Filing 190 PLAINTIFF'S OMNIBUS SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Neil Gilmour, III, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP, Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP, Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP, Victory Medical Center Plano, LP, Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP, Victory Parent Company, LLC, Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP, re #158 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, #157 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, #149 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Noridian Mutual Insurance Company, Defendant BCBSM, Inc., Defendant Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Defendant Regence BlueShield, #152 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, Defendant Community Insurance Company, Defendant Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Defendant Capital BlueCross, Defendant Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Defendant Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Defendant Highmark West Virginia Inc., Defendant Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc., Defendant Wellmark, Inc., Defendant Noridian Mutual Insurance Company, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Defendant Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Defendant BCBSM, Inc., Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield Highmark, Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Defendant RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Defendant Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Defendant Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Defendant Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Defendant Highmark Health, Defendant Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Defendant Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Defendant Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Defendant Premera Blue Cross, Defendant Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Defendant Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., Defendant Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Defendant Empire HealthChoice, Inc., Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Defendant Independence Health Group, Inc., Defendant Regence BlueShield, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa, #159 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Defendant Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #188 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. Plaintiffs may file, on or before November 12, 2018, an omnibus sur-reply of no more than 15 pages. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 189 Certain Defendant's Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., re #188 MOTION for Leave to File Omnibus Sur-Reply filed by Plaintiff Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP, Plaintiff Victory Parent Company, LLC, Plaintiff Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP, Plaintiff Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP, Plaintiff Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP, Plaintiff Neil Gilmour, III, Plaintiff Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, Plaintiff Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP, Plaintiff Victory Medical Center Plano, LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 188 MOTION for Leave to File Omnibus Sur-Reply by Neil Gilmour, III, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP, Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP, Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP, Victory Medical Center Plano, LP, Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP, Victory Parent Company, LLC, Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 187 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, re #157 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan (Garcia, Juan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 186 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company, BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Noridian Mutual Insurance Company, Regence BlueShield, re #149 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Noridian Mutual Insurance Company, Defendant BCBSM, Inc., Defendant Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Defendant Regence BlueShield (Herman, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 185 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., re #159 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., Defendant CareFirst of Maryland, Inc. (Lambert, Kenneth) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 184 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, re #158 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama (Herman, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 183 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross of California, Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc., Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company, BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Capital BlueCross, Community Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice, Inc., Healthnow New York Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Health Group, Inc., Lifetime Healthcare, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Noridian Mutual Insurance Company, Premera Blue Cross, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Wellmark, Inc., re #152 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, Defendant Community Insurance Company, Defendant Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Defendant Capital BlueCross, Defendant Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Defendant Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Defendant Highmark West Virginia Inc., Defendant Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc., Defendant Wellmark, Inc., Defendant Noridian Mutual Insurance Company, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Defendant Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Defendant BCBSM, Inc., Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield Highmark, Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Defendant RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Defendant Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Defendant Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Defendant Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Defendant Highmark Health, Defendant Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Defendant Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Defendant Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Defendant Premera Blue Cross, Defendant Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Defendant Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., Defendant Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Defendant Empire HealthChoice, Inc., Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Defendant Independence Health Group, Inc., Defendant Regence BlueShield, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #181 Motion to Join. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Lifetime Healthcare, Inc. adopts Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, Dkt. No. 152, as if it were its own, and that the statements, arguments, and authorities within be adopted by reference and incorporated by reference on behalf of Defendant Lifetime Healthcare, Inc. in this case. Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 182 MOTION to Dismiss by Healthnow New York Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Herman, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 181 MOTION to Join Motion to Adopt Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue by Lifetime Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Naranjo, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #179 Motion entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin ("BCBSWI") adopts Certain Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, Dkt. No. 152, as if it were its own, and that the statements, arguments, and authorities within be adopted by reference and incorporated by reference on behalf of BCBSWI in this case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Healthnow New York Inc. answer due 10/3/2018; Lifetime Healthcare, Inc. answer due 10/3/2018. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #176 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Lifetime Healthcare, Inc. to file an answer or responsive pleading is extended to October 3, 2018. Any responsive pleading shall comply with all orders issued by the Court, including but not limited to the undersigned's May 21, 2018 Order, Dkt. No. 147. Various Defendants have filed consolidated motions to dismiss in this case, and should Lifetime wish to file a similar motion it may, to the extent appropriate, join one or more of the previously filed motions rather than filing a separate motion. Lifetime's deadline to file or join any such motion is the same as its deadline to file a responsive pleading. Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #173 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant HealthNow New York Inc. to file an answer or responsive pleading is extended to October 3, 2018. Any responsive pleading shall comply with all orders issued by the Court, including but not limited to the undersigned's May 21, 2018 Order, Dkt. No. 147. Various Defendants have filed consolidated motions to dismiss in this case, and should HealthNow wish to file a similar motion it may, to the extent appropriate, join one or more of the previously filed motions rather than filing a separate motion. HealthNows deadline to file or join any such motion is the same as its deadline to file a responsive pleading. Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 180 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 179 MOTION to Adopt Certain Defendants' re #152 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion to Adopt). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 178 Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Neil Gilmour, III, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP, Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP, Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP, Victory Medical Center Plano, LP, Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP, Victory Parent Company, LLC, Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP, re #158 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, #157 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, #149 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Noridian Mutual Insurance Company, Defendant BCBSM, Inc., Defendant Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Defendant Regence BlueShield, #152 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, Defendant Community Insurance Company, Defendant Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Defendant Capital BlueCross, Defendant Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Defendant Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Defendant Highmark West Virginia Inc., Defendant Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc., Defendant Wellmark, Inc., Defendant Noridian Mutual Insurance Company, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Defendant Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Defendant BCBSM, Inc., Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield Highmark, Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Defendant RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Defendant Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Defendant Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Defendant Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Defendant Highmark Health, Defendant Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Defendant Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Defendant Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Defendant Premera Blue Cross, Defendant Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Defendant Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., Defendant Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Defendant Empire HealthChoice, Inc., Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Defendant Independence Health Group, Inc., Defendant Regence BlueShield, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa, #159 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Defendant Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 177 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly A. Klinsport on behalf of Lifetime Healthcare, Inc. (Klinsport, Kimberly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 176 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond by Lifetime Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Naranjo, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 175 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lifetime Healthcare, Inc.. (Naranjo, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 174 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A. Naranjo on behalf of Lifetime Healthcare, Inc.. Attorney Michael A. Naranjo added to party Lifetime Healthcare, Inc.(pty:dft) (Naranjo, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 173 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #145 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Healthnow New York Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Herman, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 172 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Healthnow New York Inc.. (Herman, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 171 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Marc Herman on behalf of Healthnow New York Inc. (Herman, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 170 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Marc Herman on behalf of Healthnow New York Inc.. Attorney Jonathan Marc Herman added to party Healthnow New York Inc.(pty:dft) (Herman, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 169 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neil Gilmour, III. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin served on 8/27/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 168 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neil Gilmour, III. Healthnow New York Inc. served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 167 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neil Gilmour, III. Lifetime Healthcare, Inc. served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 166 Summons Issued as to Healthnow New York Inc., Lifetime Healthcare, Inc.. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 165 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Neil Gilmour, III, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP, Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP, Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP, Victory Medical Center Plano, LP, Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP, Victory Parent Company, LLC, Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #162 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. The Response will be due on or before September 14, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (RBF) Modified date on 8/16/2018 (wg). [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 164 Summons Issued as to Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 163 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Neil Gilmour, III, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP, Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP, Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP, Victory Medical Center Plano, LP, Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP, Victory Parent Company, LLC, Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 162 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #158 MOTION to Change Venue , #157 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, #149 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #152 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, #159 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Neil Gilmour, III, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP, Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP, Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP, Victory Medical Center Plano, LP, Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP, Victory Parent Company, LLC, Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 161 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #149 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #152 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue by BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company, Regence BlueShield. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Drew, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 160 ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL, AFFIDAVIT HAS NO COVER PAGE, NO ATTY. SIGNATURE, OR CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED. ****DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #155 Affidavit in Support, #156 Affidavit in Support, #154 Affidavit in Support, (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 159 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Declaration of Wanda Lessner). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Lambert, Kenneth) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 158 MOTION to Change Venue by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Herman, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 157 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Hathaway, Bridget) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 156 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT, NO COVER PAGE, NO ATTY. SIGNATURE, OR CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ***AFFIDAVIT in Support of #149 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #152 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue by BCBSM, Inc.. (Drew, Michael) Modified on 7/20/2018 (wg). [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 155 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT, NO COVER PAGE, NO ATTY. SIGNATURE OR CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ***AFFIDAVIT in Support of #149 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina. (Drew, Michael) Modified on 7/20/2018 (wg). [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 154 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT, NO COVER PAGE, NO ATTY. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ***AFFIDAVIT in Support of #149 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company. (Drew, Michael) Modified on 7/20/2018 (wg). [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 153 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #149 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Exhibits of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. and Noridian Mutual Insurance Company, dba Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Dakota, In Support of Certain Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims on Non-ERISA Plans for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Noridian Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary Dauenhauer, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Gary Dauenhauer, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Gary Dauenhauer, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Gary Dauenhauer, #5 Declaration of Holly Graves)(Naranjo, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 152 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross Blue Shield Highmark, Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc., Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company, BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Capital BlueCross, Community Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice, Inc., Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Highmark Health, Highmark West Virginia Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Health Group, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Noridian Mutual Insurance Company, Premera Blue Cross, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Wellmark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 151 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #149 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Richard Theisen, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Grabowski)(Hathaway, Bridget) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 150 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #149 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Glaser, Courtney) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 149 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company, BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Noridian Mutual Insurance Company, Regence BlueShield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Herman, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #148 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. The filing deadline referenced in the Court's May 21, 2018 order is extended to July 19, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 148 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions/Answers by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross of California, Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc., Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Capital BlueCross, CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Community Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice, Inc., Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Health Group, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Noridian Mutual Insurance Company, Premera Blue Cross, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Wellmark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER that within forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order, those Defendants desiring to object to venue in this district shall file an appropriate motion. Defendants are encouraged to coordinate with eachother to present a written motion(s) in a format that is digestible to the reader. Defendants should avoid filing multiple motions that are unnecessarily repetitive and overlapping. The Victory Plaintiffs response shall be due on or before forty-five (45) days after the last-filed of any such timely filed motion. Replies shall be due within thirty (30) days after the last-filed timely response. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER DISMISSING AS MOOT re #98 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, ET.AL., #63 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, ET.AL., #61 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, ET.AL., #60 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Capital BlueCross, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.,ET.AL., Defendants shall REFRAINfrom filing any Rule 12 motions in this case until they receive instructions from the Magistrate Judge on whether and how such motions can be filed.Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 145 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs amending, filed by Victory Parent Company, LLC, Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, Neil Gilmour, III, Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP, Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP, Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP, Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP, Victory Medical Center Plano, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49)(Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 144 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hallmark Services Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MacRae, Andrew) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #143 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file an amended complaint as permitted by the District Court, Dkt. No. 141, is extended to May 4, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 143 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Neil Gilmour, III, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP, Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP, Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP, Victory Medical Center Plano, LP, Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP, Victory Parent Company, LLC, Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
March 28, 2018 Filing 142 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly A. Klinsport on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc., Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Capital BlueCross, Noridian Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney Kimberly A. Klinsport added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kimberly A. Klinsport added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City(pty:dft), Attorney Kimberly A. Klinsport added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska(pty:dft), Attorney Kimberly A. Klinsport added to party Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kimberly A. Klinsport added to party Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kimberly A. Klinsport added to party Capital BlueCross(pty:dft), Attorney Kimberly A. Klinsport added to party Noridian Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Klinsport, Kimberly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #136 Report and Recommendations, DENIED IN PART/DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN PART #25 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer filed by Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., DENIED IN PART/DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN PART #23 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer filed by CareFirst of Maryland, Inc. The Victory plaintiffs are PERMITTED to file, on or before April 27, 2018, an amended complaint to address the venue issues discussed by the Magistrate Judge in the Report andRecommendation and to cure or clarify other allegations, as requested in their response. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case remains referred to the Magistrate Judge for further pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER GRANTING re #135 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. filed by Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP, Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP, Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, Victory Parent Company, LLC, Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP, Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP, Victory Medical Center Plano, LP, Motions terminated: #135 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. filed by Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP, Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP, Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, Victory Parent Company, LLC, Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP, Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP, Victory Medical Center Plano, LP., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. terminated. Attorney Amelia S. Harris terminated.. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
March 21, 2018 Filing 139 CERTAIN DEFENDANT'S LIMITED OBJECTION to #136 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate by Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada, Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Virginia, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc... (Johnson, Blaire) Modified text on 3/22/2018 (wg). [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 138 DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION to #136 Report and Recommendations by CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc. (Lambert, Kenneth) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 137 PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION to #136 Report and Recommendations by Neil Gilmour, III, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP, Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP, Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP, Victory Medical Center Plano, LP, Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP, Victory Parent Company, LLC, Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP.. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 136 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #23 Motion to Dismiss filed by CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., #25 Motion to Dismiss filed by Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc. The United States District Clerk shall serve a copy of this report and recommendation on all parties by electronic transmittal to all parties represented by attorneys registered as a filing user with the clerk of court, or by mailing a copy by certified mail, return receipt requested, to those not registered. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
February 14, 2018 Filing 135 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. by Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP, Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP, Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP, Victory Medical Center Plano, LP, Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP, Victory Parent Company, LLC, Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Meade, Andrew) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 134 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Original Complaint by Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of New York, Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc. re #61 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #132 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
December 13, 2017 Filing 133 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP, Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP, Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP, Victory Medical Center Plano, LP, Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP, Victory Parent Company, LLC, Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP, re #63 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Defendant Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Defendant Highmark Health, Defendant Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company, Defendant BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas, Defendant Highmark West Virginia Inc., Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Defendant Wellmark, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, Defendant Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Defendant Premera Blue Cross, Defendant Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Defendant Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., Defendant QCC Insurance Company, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Defendant Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Defendant Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Defendant BCBSM, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield Highmark, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Defendant Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Defendant Independence Health Group, Inc., Defendant Regence BlueShield, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa, #23 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., #64 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in Dismissal Motions MOTION to Transfer Case in te Alternative to Dismissal filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., #60 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Defendant Capital BlueCross, Defendant Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Defendant Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc., Defendant Noridian Mutual Insurance Company, #25 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., #61 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Indiana, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, Defendant Community Insurance Company, Defendant Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross of California, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Ohio, Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Defendant Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada, Defendant Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Defendant Empire HealthChoice, Inc., Defendant Hallmark Services Corporation, Defendant Anthem Blue Cross of Ohio, Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Defendant RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of New York, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. Plaintiffs' Omnibus Sur-Reply (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
December 13, 2017 Filing 132 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Neil Gilmour, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
December 7, 2017 Filing 131 Certain Defendant's Reply in Support of #126 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada, Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Virginia, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Blue Cross of Ohio, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Indiana, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, Blue Cross Blue Shield of New York, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas, BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Empire HealthChoice, Inc., Hallmark Services Corporation, Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Highmark Health, Highmark West Virginia Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Wellmark, Inc., Independence Health Group, Inc., Cambia Health Solutions, California Physicians Service, Inc., d/b/a Blue Shield of California, Regence Blue Shield of Idaho, Inc., Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield; Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Kansas City; Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Nebraska; Noridian Mutual Insurance Company; and Capital BlueCross, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(wg) Modified Added Filers on 12/8/2017 (wg). [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #130 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
December 6, 2017 Filing 130 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada, Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Virginia, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit A&B). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
December 6, 2017 Filing 129 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., re #23 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., #25 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc. (Lambert, Kenneth) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
December 6, 2017 Filing 128 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada, Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Virginia, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., re #61 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Indiana, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, Defendant Community Insurance Company, Defendant Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross of California, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Ohio, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Defendant Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada, Defendant Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Defendant Empire HealthChoice, Inc., Defendant Hallmark Services Corporation, Defendant Anthem Blue Cross of Ohio, Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Defendant RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of New York, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
December 6, 2017 Filing 127 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., re #64 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in Dismissal Motions MOTION to Transfer Case in te Alternative to Dismissal filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. (Beauchamp, Keith) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #125 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Richard B Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
November 14, 2017 Filing 126 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP, Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP, Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP, Victory Medical Center Plano, LP, Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP, Victory Parent Company, LLC, Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP, re #98 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, Defendant Community Insurance Company, Defendant Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Defendant Capital BlueCross, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross of California, Defendant Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company, Defendant BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Defendant BCBS Care First of Maryland, Defendant Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc., Defendant Wellmark, Inc., Defendant CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Defendant Capital Blue Cross Blue Shield, Defendant Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Defendant Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Defendant BCBSM, Inc., Defendant Anthem Blue Cross of Ohio, Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Virginia, Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Defendant Capital Hospital Service, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield Highmark, Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of New York, Defendant Lifetime Healthcare, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Indiana, Defendant Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield Anthem National Account, Defendant Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Defendant Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company, Defendant Healthnow New York Inc., Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Defendant Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada, Defendant Blue Shield of Northeastern New York, Defendant Empire HealthChoice, Inc., Defendant Hallmark Services Corporation, Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield Hallmark, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Defendant Independence Health Group, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., #63 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Defendant BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas, Defendant Highmark West Virginia Inc., Defendant Wellmark, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Defendant Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Defendant BCBSM, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield Highmark, Defendant Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Defendant Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Defendant Highmark Health, Defendant Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, Defendant Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Defendant Premera Blue Cross, Defendant Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Defendant QCC Insurance Company, Defendant Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., Defendant Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Defendant Independence Health Group, Inc., Defendant Regence BlueShield, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa, #23 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., #64 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in Dismissal Motions MOTION to Transfer Case in te Alternative to Dismissal filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., #60 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Capital BlueCross, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc., Defendant Noridian Mutual Insurance Company, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Defendant Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, #25 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., #61 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, Defendant Community Insurance Company, Defendant Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross of California, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Ohio, Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Defendant Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Defendant Anthem Blue Cross of Ohio, Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Defendant RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of New York, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Indiana, Defendant Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada, Defendant Empire HealthChoice, Inc., Defendant Hallmark Services Corporation, Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Walter J. Cicack, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
November 14, 2017 Filing 125 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Neil Gilmour, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B Farrer. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #124 Motion to Continue entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. IT IS ORDERED THAT the deadline for the parties to conduct their Rule 26(f) conference is continued until twenty (20) days after the Court rules on the last motion to dismiss pending in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the deadline for the parties to submit a proposed scheduling order is continued until twenty-one (21) days following the Rule 26(f) conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 124 Joint MOTION to Continue Order for Scheduling Recommendations Deadlines by Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B Farrer. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 123 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Highmark BCBSD, Inc.. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 122 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Highmark West Virginia Inc.. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 121 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Highmark. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 120 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Highmark Health. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 119 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of California. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 118 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 117 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Regence BlueShield. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 116 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc.. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 115 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 114 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 113 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Independence Health Group, Inc.. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 112 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 111 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 110 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 109 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 108 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BCBSM, Inc.. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 107 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 106 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 105 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wellmark, Inc.. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 104 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 103 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 102 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 AMENDED PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER, GRANTED re #100 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #63 MOTION to Dismiss , #23 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer, #64 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in Dismissal Motions MOTION to Tr filed by Neil Gilmour, III,. Signed by Judge Richard B Farrer. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 100 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #63 MOTION to Dismiss , #23 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer, #64 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in Dismissal Motions MOTION to Transfer Case in te Alternative to Dismissal, #60 MOTION to Dismiss , #25 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer, #61 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Neil Gilmour, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B Farrer. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING #94 Motion Preliminary Scheduling Order Signed by Judge Richard B Farrer. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 98 DEFENDANT'S MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada, Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Virginia, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Blue Cross of Ohio, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield Anthem National Account, Blue Cross Blue Shield Hallmark, Blue Cross Blue Shield Highmark, Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Indiana, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, Blue Cross Blue Shield of New York, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company, BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Empire HealthChoice, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., Hallmark Services Corporation, Healthnow New York Inc., Independence Health Group, Inc., Lifetime Healthcare, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Wellmark, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Richard B Farrer. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in light of Docket Numbers 51 and 72. Entered by Judge Richard B Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #62 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Richard B Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #97 Motion to Withdraw. Docket No. 93 is hereby WITHDRAWN. Entered by Judge Richard Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 97 MOTION to Withdraw 93 Response in Support of Motion, by Neil Gilmour, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard Farrer. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 10, 2017 Notice of Correction: ****NOTIFIED COUNSEL THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN EDITED TO REFLECT IT IS A PROPOSED ORDER NOT A MOTION AS FILED****re #96 Proposed Order re #94 Unopposed MOTION (rf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 9, 2017 Filing 96 Proposed Order] re #94 Unopposed MOTION for Preliminary Scheduling Order by Neil Gilmour, III.. (Cicack, Walter) Modified on 10/10/2017, to edit text to reflect this is a Proposed Order not a Motion as filed (rf). [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 9, 2017 Filing 95 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A. Naranjo on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Capital BlueCross, Noridian Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney Michael A. Naranjo added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A. Naranjo added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A. Naranjo added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A. Naranjo added to party Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A. Naranjo added to party Capital BlueCross(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A. Naranjo added to party Noridian Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Naranjo, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 9, 2017 Filing 94 Unopposed MOTION for Preliminary Scheduling Order by Neil Gilmour, III.. Motions referred to Judge Richard Farrer. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 6, 2017 Filing 92 Certificate of Interested Parties by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Herman, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 6, 2017 Filing 91 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hallmark Services Corporation. (MacRae, Andrew) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #46 Motion to Substitute Attorney. IT IS ORDERED THAT attorneys Covert J. Geary, Michael C. Drew, and Tyler J. Rench are hereby substituted as counsel of record for Defendants Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, and Regence BluShield ("Regence Defendants"). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT attorneys D. Ronald Reneker and Tracy L. McCreight, of the law firm Munsh Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C. are WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for the Regence Defendants. Entered by Judge Richard Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard Farrer. Signed by Judge Fred Biery.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Richard Farrer. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 29, 2017 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Parties shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 88 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. (Garcia, Juan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING #67 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order.; GRANTING #68 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order.; GRANTING #70 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order.; GRANTING #71 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 86 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee. (Glaser, Courtney) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 85 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 84 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc.. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 83 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Empire HealthChoice, Inc.. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 82 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Community Insurance Company. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 81 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc.. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 80 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross of California. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 79 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 78 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 77 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc.. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 76 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc.. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 75 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Anthem Health Plans, Inc.. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 74 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 73 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re #51 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Order on Motion for Hearing,,. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 71 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Juan Carlos Garcia on behalf of Bridget M. Hathaway ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9976778) by on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Garcia, Juan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 70 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Juan Carlos Garcia on behalf of Rebecca D'Arcy O'Reilly ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9975705) by on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Garcia, Juan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 69 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc.. (Harris, Amelia) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 68 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bryan Gerald Rutherford on behalf of Shelley Tolman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9975707) by on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rutherford, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 67 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bryan Gerald Rutherford on behalf of Keith Beauchamp ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9975590) by on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rutherford, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Juan Carlos Garcia on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. Attorney Juan Carlos Garcia added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(pty:dft) (Garcia, Juan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 12, 2017 Filing 65 SUPPLEMENT to #60 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For More Definite Statement by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc., Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Capital BlueCross, Noridian Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Gonzalez, Henry) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in Dismissal Motions, MOTION to Transfer Case in te Alternative to Dismissal by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex A-1 - BluePreferred, #3 Exhibit Ex A-2 - BluePreferred, #4 Errata Ex A-3 Sprouts, #5 Sealed Document proposed order)(Harris, Amelia) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss by Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross Blue Shield Highmark, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa, Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas, Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Highmark Health, Highmark West Virginia Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Health Group, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Premera Blue Cross, QCC Insurance Company, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., Wellmark, Inc.. (Drew, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 62 Joint MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Blue Cross of Ohio, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Indiana, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of New York, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Blue Cross of California, BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Community Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice, Inc., Hallmark Services Corporation, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 61 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Blue Cross of Ohio, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Indiana, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of New York, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Blue Cross of California, BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Community Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice, Inc., Hallmark Services Corporation, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Johnson, Blaire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc., Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Capital BlueCross, Noridian Mutual Insurance Company. (Gonzalez, Henry) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 59 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Noridian Mutual Insurance Company. (Gonzalez, Henry) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 58 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska. (Gonzalez, Henry) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 57 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Henry) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 56 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City. (Gonzalez, Henry) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 55 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Capital BlueCross. (Gonzalez, Henry) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 54 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Henry) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 53 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Henry) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry B. Gonzalez, III on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc., Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Capital BlueCross, Noridian Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney Henry B. Gonzalez, III added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Henry B. Gonzalez, III added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City(pty:dft), Attorney Henry B. Gonzalez, III added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska(pty:dft), Attorney Henry B. Gonzalez, III added to party Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Henry B. Gonzalez, III added to party Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Henry B. Gonzalez, III added to party Capital BlueCross(pty:dft), Attorney Henry B. Gonzalez, III added to party Noridian Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Gonzalez, Henry) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #47 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #49 Motion for Hearing; The motions and supplemental motion are GRANTED to the extent that all deadlines related to motions to dismiss are HELD IN ABEYANCE until further Order of the Court. The motions and supplemental motion are DENIED such that the Court declines to enter a preliminary scheduling order at this time. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 1, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield Association by Neil Gilmour, III (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 1, 2017 Filing 49 Supplemental MOTION for Hearing re #39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docs 23 and 25) and for a Preliminary Scheduling Order by Neil Gilmour, III. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
September 1, 2017 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docs 23 and 25) and for a Preliminary Scheduling Order, #23 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer, #25 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer by Neil Gilmour, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
August 18, 2017 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer, #25 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer by Neil Gilmour, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
August 11, 2017 Filing 46 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
August 10, 2017 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Neil Gilmour, III, re #39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docs 23 and 25) and for a Preliminary Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Neil Gilmour, III (Masten, Jeremy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
August 4, 2017 Filing 44 Remark: Letter of Non-Admission to the WDTX/Forwarded to Atty: Keith Beauchamp. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
August 4, 2017 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Neil Gilmour, III as to Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc.. Waiver sent on 7/26/2017, answer due 9/25/2017. (Masten, Jeremy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
August 4, 2017 Filing 42 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. on 7/26/17 by Neil Gilmour, III (Masten, Jeremy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
August 3, 2017 Filing 41 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada, Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Virginia, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Blue Cross of Ohio, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross Blue Shield Anthem National Account, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company, BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Empire HealthChoice, Inc., Hallmark Services Corporation, Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Health Group, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Premera Blue Cross, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Wellmark, Inc., re #39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docs 23 and 25) and for a Preliminary Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Neil Gilmour, III (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Herman, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 31, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew F. MacRae on behalf of Hallmark Services Corporation. Attorney Andrew F. MacRae added to party Hallmark Services Corporation(pty:dft) (MacRae, Andrew) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 27, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docs 23 and 25) and for a Preliminary Scheduling Order by Neil Gilmour, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 27, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tyler J. Rench on behalf of Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa, Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas, Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Highmark Health, Highmark West Virginia Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Health Group, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Premera Blue Cross, Wellmark, Inc.. Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party BCBSM, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party Highmark BCBSD, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party Highmark Health(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party Highmark West Virginia Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party Independence Health Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party Premera Blue Cross(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party Wellmark, Inc.(pty:dft) (Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 27, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Covert J. Geary on behalf of Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa, Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas, Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Highmark Health, Highmark West Virginia Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Health Group, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Premera Blue Cross, Wellmark, Inc.. Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield(pty:dft), Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party BCBSM, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island(pty:dft), Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa(pty:dft), Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey(pty:dft), Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina(pty:dft), Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina(pty:dft), Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas(pty:dft), Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party Highmark BCBSD, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party Highmark Health(pty:dft), Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party Highmark West Virginia Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey(pty:dft), Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party Independence Health Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party Premera Blue Cross(pty:dft), Attorney Covert J. Geary added to party Wellmark, Inc.(pty:dft) (Geary, Covert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 27, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael C. Drew on behalf of Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa, Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas, Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Highmark Health, Highmark West Virginia Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Health Group, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Premera Blue Cross, Wellmark, Inc.. Attorney Michael C. Drew added to party Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Drew added to party BCBSM, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Drew added to party Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Drew added to party Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Drew added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Drew added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Drew added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Drew added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Drew added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Drew added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Drew added to party BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Drew added to party Highmark BCBSD, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Drew added to party Highmark Health(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Drew added to party Highmark West Virginia Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Drew added to party Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Drew added to party Independence Health Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Drew added to party Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Drew added to party Premera Blue Cross(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Drew added to party Wellmark, Inc.(pty:dft) (Drew, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 26, 2017 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Neil Gilmour, III as to Blue Cross Blue Shield of California. Waiver sent on 7/18/2017, answer due 9/18/2017; Blue Cross Blue Shield of Indiana. Waiver sent on 7/18/2017, answer due 9/18/2017; Blue Cross Blue Shield of New York. Waiver sent on 7/18/2017, answer due 9/18/2017; Blue Cross Blue Shield of Ohio. Waiver sent on 7/18/2017, answer due 9/18/2017. (Masten, Jeremy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 26, 2017 Filing 34 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Indiana, Blue Cross Blue Shield of New York, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Ohio on 7/18/17 by Neil Gilmour, III (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 25, 2017 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer, #25 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer by Neil Gilmour, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Masten, Jeremy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 21, 2017 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Neil Gilmour, III as to Noridian Mutual Insurance Company. Waiver sent on 7/12/2017, answer due 9/11/2017. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 21, 2017 Filing 31 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Noridian Mutual Insurance Company on 7/12/17 by Neil Gilmour, III (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING re #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, (Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond) filed by BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, #14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, filed by Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueShield, BlueShield of Tennessee answer due 8/15/2017; Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon answer due 8/15/2017; Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah answer due 8/15/2017; Regence BlueShield answer due 8/15/2017; Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc. answer due 8/15/2017. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew K. Meade. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order.; GRANTING #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Brian Keith Norman). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 28 Remark: Letter of Non-Admission to the WDTX forwarded to Atty: Kimberly A. Klinsport. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 18, 2017 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Neil Gilmour, III as to Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.. Waiver sent on 7/12/2017, answer due 9/11/2017; Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City. Waiver sent on 7/12/2017, answer due 9/11/2017; Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska. Waiver sent on 7/12/2017, answer due 9/11/2017; Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.. Waiver sent on 7/12/2017, answer due 9/11/2017; Capital BlueCross. Waiver sent on 7/12/2017, answer due 9/11/2017. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 18, 2017 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Capital BlueCross, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., and Noridian Mutual Insurance Company on 7/12/17 by Neil Gilmour, III (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 14, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer by Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.. (Lambert, Kenneth) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 14, 2017 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Parties by Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.. (Lambert, Kenneth) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 14, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer by CareFirst of Maryland, Inc.. (Lambert, Kenneth) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 14, 2017 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Parties by CareFirst of Maryland, Inc.. (Lambert, Kenneth) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 14, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth John Lambert on behalf of CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.. Attorney Kenneth John Lambert added to party CareFirst of Maryland, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth John Lambert added to party Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (Lambert, Kenneth) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 14, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth John Lambert ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9780563) by on behalf of CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lambert, Kenneth) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Bruce Shely on behalf of BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee. Attorney John Bruce Shely added to party BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee(pty:dft) (Shely, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Courtney Blaire Glaser on behalf of BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee. Attorney Courtney Blaire Glaser added to party BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee(pty:dft) (Glaser, Courtney) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, (Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond) by BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shely, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Neil Gilmour, III as to QCC Insurance Company. Waiver sent on 7/6/2017, answer due 9/5/2017. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to QCC Insurance Company on 7/6/17 by Neil Gilmour, III (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 12, 2017 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reneker, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 11, 2017 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Neil Gilmour, III as to Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. Waiver sent on 7/10/2017, answer due 9/8/2017. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
July 11, 2017 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association on July 10, 2017 by Neil Gilmour, III (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
June 27, 2017 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama as to Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. Waiver sent on 6/27/2017, answer due 8/28/2017. (Herman, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
June 27, 2017 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama (on behalf of Plaintiff by agreement of counsel) on June 27, 2017 by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama (Herman, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
June 27, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Marc Herman on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. Attorney Jonathan Marc Herman added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama(pty:dft) (Herman, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
June 27, 2017 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Neil Gilmour, III as to Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada. Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017; Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Virginia. Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017; Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017; Anthem Blue Cross of Ohio. Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017; Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc.. Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017; Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc.. Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017; Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017; Anthem Health Plans, Inc.. Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017; Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.. Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017; Blue Cross Blue Shield Anthem National Account. Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017; Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc.. Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017; Blue Cross of California. Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017; Community Insurance Company. Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017; Empire HealthChoice, Inc.. Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017; RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc.. Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017; Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Walter J. Cicack for Andrew K. Meade ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9714000) by on behalf of Neil Gilmour, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
June 16, 2017 Filing 6 Letter to attorney ANDREW K. MEADE regarding Admission to Practice in the Western District of Texas. (dtg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
June 15, 2017 Filing 5 Summons Re-Issued as to Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada, Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Virginia, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Blue Cross of Ohio, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, BCBS Care First of Maryland, BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross Blue Shield Anthem National Account, Blue Cross Blue Shield Hallmark, Blue Cross Blue Shield Highmark, Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Indiana, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, Blue Cross Blue Shield of New York, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross of California, Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc., Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company, Blue Shield of Northeastern New York, BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas, BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Capital Blue Cross Blue Shield, Capital BlueCross, Capital Hospital Service, CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Community Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., Hallmark Services Corporation, Healthnow New York Inc., Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Highmark Health, Highmark West Virginia Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Health Group, Inc., Lifetime Healthcare, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Noridian Mutual Insurance Company, Premera Blue Cross, QCC Insurance Company, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Neil Gilmour, III, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP, Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP, Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP, Victory Medical Center Plano, LP, Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP, Victory Parent Company, LLC, Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada, Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Virginia, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Blue Cross of Ohio, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, BCBS Care First of Maryland, BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross Blue Shield Anthem National Account, Blue Cross Blue Shield Hallmark, Blue Cross Blue Shield Highmark, Blue Cross Blue Shield of California, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Indiana, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, Blue Cross Blue Shield of New York, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross of California, Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc., Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company, Blue Shield of Northeastern New York, BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas, BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Capital Blue Cross Blue Shield, Capital BlueCross, Capital Hospital Service, CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Community Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., Hallmark Services Corporation, Healthnow New York Inc., Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Highmark Health, Highmark West Virginia Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Health Group, Inc., Lifetime Healthcare, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Noridian Mutual Insurance Company, Premera Blue Cross, QCC Insurance Company, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Wellmark, Inc.. (mgr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
June 12, 2017 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Neil Gilmour, III, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP, Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP, Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP, Victory Medical Center Plano, LP, Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP, Victory Parent Company, LLC, Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP. (Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
June 12, 2017 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Primomo. (dtg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
June 12, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dtg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]
June 11, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9674182). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Victory Parent Company, LLC, Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, Neil Gilmour, III, Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP, Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP, Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP, Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP, Victory Medical Center Plano, LP. (Attachments: #1 Schedule 1, #2 Schedule 2, #3 Schedule 3, #4 Schedule 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cicack, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neil Gilmour, Trustee for the Grantor Trust of Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP, et al v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Blue Cross Blue Shield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Iowa
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, a Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Indiana
Represented By: Thomas F.A. Hetherington
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Represented By: Kate H. Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regence Bluecross Blueshield of Oregon
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Represented By: Tracy L. McCreight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross of Ohio
Represented By: Thomas F.A. Hetherington
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Represented By: Kate H. Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee
Represented By: Courtney Blaire Glaser
Represented By: John Bruce Shely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Ohio
Represented By: Thomas F.A. Hetherington
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Represented By: Kate H. Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield Hallmark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Health Plans, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas F.A. Hetherington
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Represented By: Kate H. Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Represented By: Tracy L. McCreight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Virginia
Represented By: Thomas F.A. Hetherington
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Represented By: Kate H. Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCBSM, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc.
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Shield of Northeastern New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas F.A. Hetherington
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Represented By: Kate H. Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield Highmark
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska
Represented By: Kimberly A. Klinsport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly A. Klinsport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highmark Health
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regence Blueshield
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Represented By: Tracy L. McCreight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada
Represented By: Thomas F.A. Hetherington
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Represented By: Kate H. Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highmark West Virginia Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noridian Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberly A. Klinsport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc
Represented By: Thomas F.A. Hetherington
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Represented By: Kate H. Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of California
Represented By: Thomas F.A. Hetherington
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Represented By: Kate H. Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly A. Klinsport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QCC Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas F.A. Hetherington
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Represented By: Kate H. Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premera Blue Cross
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas F.A. Hetherington
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Represented By: Kate H. Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carefirst of Maryland Inc
Represented By: Brian Keith Norman
Represented By: Kenneth John Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regence Bluecross Blueshield of Utah
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Represented By: Tracy L. McCreight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas F.A. Hetherington
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Represented By: Kate H. Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of Idaho Care Plus, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly A. Klinsport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmark, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independence Health Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Hospital Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthnow New York Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Herman
Represented By: Charles W. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire HealthChoice, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas F.A. Hetherington
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Represented By: Kate H. Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of California
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCBS Care First of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifetime Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly A. Klinsport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City
Represented By: Kimberly A. Klinsport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Insurance Company
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highmark BCBSD, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of New York
Represented By: Thomas F.A. Hetherington
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Represented By: Kate H. Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan
Represented By: Juan Carlos Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Keith Norman
Represented By: Kenneth John Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital BlueCross
Represented By: Kimberly A. Klinsport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas F.A. Hetherington
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Represented By: Kate H. Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield Anthem National Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Gilmour
Represented By: Jeremy M. Masten
Represented By: Andrew K Meade
Represented By: Walter J Cicack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, LP
Represented By: Andrew K Meade
Represented By: Walter J Cicack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victory Medical Center Plano, LP
Represented By: Andrew K Meade
Represented By: Walter J Cicack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, LP
Represented By: Andrew K Meade
Represented By: Walter J Cicack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victory Medical Center Southcross, LP
Represented By: Andrew K Meade
Represented By: Walter J Cicack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victory Medical Center Landmark, LP
Represented By: Andrew K Meade
Represented By: Walter J Cicack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victory Medical Center Beaumont, LP
Represented By: Andrew K Meade
Represented By: Walter J Cicack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victory Parent Company, LLC
Represented By: Andrew K Meade
Represented By: Walter J Cicack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, LP
Represented By: Andrew K Meade
Represented By: Walter J Cicack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?