Gibson v. Moorman

Plaintiff: Jacqueline Gibson
Defendant: Rose Boddie Moorman
Case Number: 4:2019cv00282
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
April 16, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-03105. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Sherman Division. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/15/2019) (zkc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division Transfer Venue filed by Rose Boddie Moorman with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Christopher T Colby added to party Rose Boddie Moorman(pty:dft) (Colby, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Rose Boddie Moorman. (zkc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to issue Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Jacqueline Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s) Affidavit in Support of Motion for Entry of Default, #2 Proposed Order Proposed form for Clerk's Entry of Default, #3 Certificate of Service) (Carse, Tom) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Rose Boddie Moorman; served on 2/15/2019. (Carse, Tom) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to Rose Boddie Moorman. (ala) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Jacqueline Gibson. (Carse, Tom) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Rose Boddie Moorman; served on 12/6/2018. (Carse, Tom) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Rose Boddie Moorman filed by Jacqueline Gibson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Carse, Tom) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Nowhere in this complaint is the United States mentioned as a defendant. Within ten days of this date, the plaintiff shall show cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 11/30/2018) (epm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Rose Boddie Moorman. (zkc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by jacqueline gibson. (Carse, Tom) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against rose moorman filed by jacqueline gibson. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9601089) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Carse, Tom) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 4/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Moorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Gibson
Represented By: Tom A Carse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Boddie Moorman
Represented By: Christopher T Colby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?