Hamilton v. AMCOL Systems, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Harold Hamilton, Sr.
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC., Trans Union, LLC., AMCOL Systems, Inc and Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00327
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 9:30 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 8/6/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/1/2019. (baf, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax by Harold Hamilton, Sr (Jaffer, Shawn)
June 13, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Equifax Information Services, LLC.. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 19 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Equifax Information Services, LLC..( Seger, Forrest)
June 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Trans Union, LLC..(Wood, Lauren)
June 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Harold Hamilton, Sr (Jaffer, Shawn)
May 31, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC, Other Affiliate CENTRAL SOURCE LLC, Other Affiliate ONLINE DATA EXCHANGE LLC, Other Affiliate NEW MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC, Other Affiliate VANTAGESCORE SOLUTIONS LLC, Other Affiliate OPT-OUT SERVICES LLC for Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (Anthony, Rebecca)
May 31, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc..(Anthony, Rebecca)
May 30, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Equifax Information Services, LLC. to 6/13/2019. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.. (Seger, Forrest)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Equifax Information Services, LLC..( Seger, Forrest)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement Pending Settlement by Harold Hamilton, Sr (Jaffer, Shawn)
May 29, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Trans Union, LLC. to 6/13/2019. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Trans Union, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC.. (Wood, Lauren)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Trans Union, LLC..( Wood, Lauren)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harold Hamilton, Sr. Equifax Information Services, LLC. served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harold Hamilton, Sr. Trans Union, LLC. served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harold Hamilton, Sr. AMCOL Systems, Inc served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harold Hamilton, Sr. Experian Information Solutions Inc. served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Trans Union, LLC. (rpc, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Experian Information Solutions Inc. (rpc, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (rpc, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to AMCOL Systems, Inc. (rpc, )
May 3, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
May 3, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7254305.), filed by Harold Hamilton, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jaffer, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. AMCOL Systems, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC.
Represented By: Forrest Mathew Seger, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC.
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCOL Systems, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Wernicke Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Hamilton, Sr.
Represented By: Shawn Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?