Ghist v. Intelemedia Premier Leads, LLC

Plaintiff: Nina Ghist
Defendant: Intelemedia Communications and Intelemedia Premier Leads, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00329
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint (and Affirmative Defenses) by Intelemedia Premier Leads, LLC.(Bernard, Debra)
May 23, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Intelemedia Premier Leads, LLC to 6/21/2019. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Intelemedia Premier Leads, LLC.( Bernard, Debra)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Debra R. Bernard on behalf of Intelemedia Premier Leads, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7278549. (Bernard, Debra)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition Terrance Graves served on Intelemedia Premier Leads on 05/09/2019, filed by Nina Ghist. (Baldree, Daniel)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Avi R. Kaufman on behalf of Nina Ghist. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7262184. (Kaufman, Avi)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Intelemedia Premier Leads, LLC. (baf, )
May 3, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
May 3, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Nina Ghist against Intelemedia Communications ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7254854.), filed by Nina Ghist.(Baldree, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (baf, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ghist v. Intelemedia Premier Leads, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Ghist
Represented By: Daniel Baldree
Represented By: Avi R. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intelemedia Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intelemedia Premier Leads, LLC
Represented By: Debra R. Bernard
Represented By: Ann Marie Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?