Cunningham v. Grand Incentives, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Defendant: Time Travel of Pompano Beach, Inc. and Grand Incentives, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00350
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Craig Cunningham as to #11 Order, #12 Order. (kls, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Vacation, by Craig Cunningham (daj, )
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. #9 ] and Motion for Sanctions [Dkt. #10 ] no later than Monday, July 15, 2019, at 5:00 p.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 7/2/2019. (daj, )
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before: July 23, 2019. File joint report of attorney conference: August 6, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference August 21, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in the United States Courthouse Annex, 200 N. Texas, Sherman, Texas 75090. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 7/2/2019. (daj, )
June 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Sanctions by Grand Incentives, Inc., Time Travel of Pompano Beach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Kevin Langley, #2 Exhibit B-Cunningham v. Captial Advance Solutions Order, #3 Exhibit C-Cunningham v. Capital Advance Solutions Opinion, #4 Exhibit D-Cunningham v. Mark Guidubaldi & Associates Memorandum Adpoting R&R, #5 Exhibit E-Cunningham v. Mark Guidubaldi & Associates Report and Recommendation, #6 Exhibit F-Declaration of John Freeman, #7 Exhibit G-Proposed Order)(Freeman, John)
June 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Grand Incentives, Inc., Time Travel of Pompano Beach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freeman, John)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before Monday, July 08, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 6/5/2019. (daj, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Grand Incentives, Inc., Time Travel of Pompano Beach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freeman, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/5/2019) (daj, ).
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig Cunningham. Grand Incentives, Inc. served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (daj, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig Cunningham. Time Travel of Pompano Beach, Inc. served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (daj, )
May 16, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 6-47371. (mjc, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Time Travel of Pompano Beach, Inc.. (daj, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Grand Incentives, Inc.. (daj, )
May 13, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***Consent form mailed to plaintiff. (daj, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grand Incentives, Inc., Time Travel of Pompano Beach, Inc., filed by Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope(s))(daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Grand Incentives, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Travel of Pompano Beach, Inc.
Represented By: John Lacy Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Incentives, Inc.
Represented By: John Lacy Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?