Gibson Brands, Inc. v. Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gibson Brands, Inc.
Defendant: John Doe 1-10 and Concordia Investment Partners, LLC
Counter Claimant: Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00358
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 500 SEALED Jury Notes. (kkc, )
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 499 SEALED Jury Questions of the Witnesses. (kkc, )
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 498 JURY VERDICT. (kkc, )
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 496 Trial Admitted Exhibits List by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List pgs. 171-216)(kkc, )
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 495 Trial Admitted Exhibits List by Gibson Brands, Inc. (kkc, )
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 494 Trial Witness List by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (kkc, )
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 493 Trial Witness List by Gibson Brands, Inc. (kkc, )
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 492 Jury Instructions. (kkc, )
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 491 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial completed on 5/27/2022. Verdict published. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 490 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial Day 9 held on 5/26/2022. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER - granting #485 Motion to Seal Defendants' Trial Deposition Designations. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/26/2022. (baf, )
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 487 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial - Day 8 held on 5/25/2022. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 486 Sealed Defendants' Trial Deposition Designations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 485 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Trial Deposition Designations by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 488 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial Day 7 held on 5/24/2022. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 484 NOTICE by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC of Defendants' Amended Offer of Proof (Hubbard, Emileigh)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 483 NOTICE by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation), Concordia Investment Partners, LLC of Filing Defendants' Offer of Proof (Hubbard, Emileigh)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 482 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial - Day 6 held on 5/23/2022. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 481 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial Day 5 held on 5/20/2022. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 480 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial - Day 4 held on 5/19/2022. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 479 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial - Day 3 held on 5/18/2022. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 478 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Trial - Day 2 held on 5/17/2022. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 477 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Jury Selection, Voir Dire, and Jury Trial - Day 1 held on 5/16/2022. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/16/2022. (baf, )
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 475 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Final Pretrial Conference (re-convene for remaining issues) held on 5/13/2022. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER re Pretrial Conference.. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/13/2022. (mcg)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Continuation of Final Pretrial Conference set for Friday 5/13/2022 2:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. (tls)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference held on 5/13/2022 regarding discovery disputes. Court sets the matter for continuation of final pretrial conference for 5/13/2022 at 2:30 p.m. in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBERS SIX AND SEVEN. It is ORDERED Plaintiff Gibson Brands, Inc.s Motions in Limine #344 Six and Seven are hereby GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 05/12/2022. (las, )
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 472 JOINT AMENDED FINAL PRE-TRIAL ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 05/12/2022. (las, )
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT (de #356 ). Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 05/12/2022. (las, )
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE (de #344 ). Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 05/12/2022. (las, )
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTIONS IN LIMINE (de #346 ). Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 05/12/2022. (las, )
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference regarding Order Dkt. #473 set for Friday 5/13/2022 9:30 AM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 9:25 AM: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (tls)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 468 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Final Pretrial Conference held on 5/11/2022. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER granting #465 Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Defendants' Trial Exhibit List. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/11/2022. (mcg)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER granting #456 Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement its Trial Exhibit List. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/11/2022. (mcg)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order (ORAL) ORDER withdrawing #219 Sealed Motion by Parties based on the Court's ruling.. Issued by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 05/11/2022. (kkc, )
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order (ORAL) ORDER granting #443 Supplemental Motion in Limine as Agreed by the Parties. Issued by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/11/2022. (kkc, )
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 465 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Defendants' Trial Exhibit List by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 464 Proposed Pretrial Order Joint Amended Final Pre-Trial Order by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gibson's Witness List, #2 Exhibit B - Armadillo and Concordia's Witness List, #3 Exhibit C - Gibson's Amended Trial Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit D - Armadillo and Concordia's Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 463 NOTICE by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc. re #440 Sealed Document,, Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.'s Sur-Reply Opposing Gibson's Objections to Deposition Evidence and Brief in Support (Hubbard, Emileigh)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER ON TIME LIMITS. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/2/2022. (ch, )
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 461 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Elyse E McNamara on behalf of Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8896999. (McNamara, Elyse)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER - granting #459 Motion to Seal its Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement its Trial Exhibit List. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/28/2022. (baf, )
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 459 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement its Trial Exhibit List by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER - granting #450 Motion to Seal Document. It is therefore ORDERED that Gibson's Reply in Support of its Objections to Deposition Evidence is hereby SEALED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/27/2022. (baf, )
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER - granting #451 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff is hereby permitted to file its Reply in Support of Gibson's Objections to Deposition Evidence that are eleven (11) pages in length. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/27/2022. (baf, )
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION TO SEAL submitted DOCUMENT #455 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 456 SEALED MOTION Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement its Trial Exhibit List by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement its Trial Exhibit List by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea) Modified on 4/27/2022 (baf, ).
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 454 RESPONSE to #445 Response to Non-Motion Gibson's Objections to Amended Proposed Jury Instruction No. 31 filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 453 REPLY to Response to Motion re #443 Supplemental MOTION in Limine and Brief in Support filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 452 Sealed Document. Reply in Support of Gibson's Objections to Deposition Evidence (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrea Bates, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration)(Bates, Andrea)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 451 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Reply in Support of Gibson's Objections to Deposition Evidence by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 450 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Reply in Support of Gibson's Objections to Deposition Evidence by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER granting #446 Motion to Seal. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Armadillo's Opposition to Plaintiff Gibson Brand's Objections to Deposition Evidence and Brief in Support is hereby SEALED and will not be visible to the public.. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/26/2022. (baf, )
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER - Unopposed Motion to Seal Armadillos Opposition to Plaintiff Gibson Brands Objections to Deposition Evidence and Brief in Support (Dkt. #438) granted. ORDERED that Armadillos Opposition to Plaintiff Gibson Brands Objections to Deposition Evidence and Brief in Support is hereby SEALED and will not be visible to the public.. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/25/2022. (ch, )
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 447 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit of Patrick Rodgers, #4 Exhibit 1, Part 1, #5 Exhibit 1, Part 2, #6 Exhibit 2, Part 1, #7 Exhibit 2, Part 2, #8 Exhibit 3, Part 1, #9 Exhibit 3, Part 2, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, Part 1, #12 Exhibit 5, Part 2, #13 Exhibit 6, #14 Exhibit 7, #15 Exhibit 8, #16 Exhibit 9, #17 Exhibit 10, #18 Exhibit 11)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 446 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.'s Opposition to Gibson's Objections to Deposition Evidence and Brief in Support by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 445 RESPONSE to #433 Proposed Jury Instructions Objections to Defendants Amended Proposed Jury Instruction No. 31 filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bates, Andrea)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 444 RESPONSE in Opposition re #443 Supplemental MOTION in Limine and Brief in Support filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 443 Supplemental MOTION in Limine and Brief in Support by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER - granting #439 Motion to Seal Objections to Defendants' witness list, deposition extracts, trial exhibits, and FRE 1006 summary charts. It is further ORDERED that Gibson's Objections to Defendants' witness list, deposition extracts, trial exhibits, and FRE 1006 summary charts (Dkt. #440 ) is hereby SEALED and will not be visible to the public. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/11/2022. (baf, )
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER - granting #437 Motion to Seal Objections to Deposition Evidence. It is further ORDERED that Gibson's Objections to Deposition Evidence and Brief in Support (Dkt. #438 ) is hereby SEALED and will not be visible to the public. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/11/2022. (baf, )
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 440 Sealed Document. Objections to Defendants witness list, deposition extracts, trial exhibits, and FRE 1006 summary charts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T)(Bates, Andrea)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 439 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Objections to Defendants witness list, deposition extracts, trial exhibits, and FRE 1006 summary charts by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 438 Sealed Document. Objections to Deposition Evidence and Brief in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Objections to Deposition Evidence, #2 Exhibit B1 to Objections to Deposition Evidence, #3 Exhibit B2 to Objections to Deposition Evidence, #4 Exhibit C to Objections to Deposition Evidence, #5 Text of Proposed Order Objections to Deposition Evidence, #6 Text of Proposed Order Objections to Deposition Evidence, #7 Text of Proposed Order Objections to Deposition Evidence, #8 Text of Proposed Order Objections to Deposition Evidence, #9 Text of Proposed Order Objections to Deposition Evidence, #10 Text of Proposed Order Objections to Deposition Evidence, #11 Text of Proposed Order Objections to Deposition Evidence, #12 Text of Proposed Order Objections to Deposition Evidence, #13 Text of Proposed Order Objections to Deposition Evidence, #14 Text of Proposed Order Objections to Deposition Evidence, #15 Text of Proposed Order Objections to Deposition Evidence)(Bates, Andrea)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 437 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Objections to Deposition Evidence and Brief in Support by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 436 NOTICE by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC re #353 Proposed Pretrial Order, Defendants' Supplemental Objections and Counter-Designations to Gibson's Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 435 NOTICE by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC re #353 Proposed Pretrial Order, Defendants' Objections to Gibson's Trial Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Objections to Gibson's Trial Exhibits)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 434 NOTICE by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC re #353 Proposed Pretrial Order, Objections to Gibson's Witnesses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Objections to Gibson's Witnesses)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 433 Proposed Jury Instructions by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone conference held on 4/5/2022 at 8:13 a.m. Stephen Howen appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Anna Naydonov, Emileigh Hubbard, Vic Henry, Douglas Rettew and Patrick Rodgers appeared on behalf of Defendants. Defendants ordered to produce discovery documents as soon as they can be produced. Court takes under advisement the issue of the timed trial and the amount to be allotted for each side. Parties will submit highlighted hard copy transcripts with objections and the Court will review those and make determinations prior to trial. Call adjourned at 8:43 a.m. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Combined Motion to Compel Defendants to Supplement Discovery Responses and Motion for Expedited Relief (Dkt. #430 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/4/2022. (baf, )
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER granting #429 Motion to Seal Document #430 SEALED MOTION Motion to Compel Defendants to supplement Discovery Responses and Motion for expedited relief. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/4/2022. (baf, )
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 4/5/2022 at 8:15 a.m. in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call in at 8:10 a.m. to 1-888-363-4749, access code 1588844#. (kkc, )
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 430 SEALED MOTION Motion to Compel Defendants to supplement Discovery Responses and Motion for expedited relief by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Declaration, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 429 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Motion to Compel Defendants to supplement Discovery Responses and Motion for expedited relief by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER granting #427 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the parties to file objections to witnesses, exhibits, and deposition extracts is hereby extended to April 8, 2022. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/7/2022. (daj, )
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 427 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Witnesses, Deposition Extracts, and Exhibits by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER RESETTING TRIAL. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2022 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Jury Selection/Trial set for 5/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/3/2021. (baf, )
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference held on 11/3/2021. Court addressed questions and procedures related to trial. Court will enter an Order setting the Final Pretrial Conference for 5/11/22 and Jury Selection/Trial for 5/16/22. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (No attachment.) (tls)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference at the parties' request set for Wednesday 11/3/2021 8:05 AM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 8:00 AM: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (tls)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order In accordance with the Court's notification to the parties on 10/8/2021, the final pretrial conference and trial of this case are hereby CONTINUED. The Court will continue to work with the parties via email to reset the case. (tls)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 425 NOTICE by Gibson Brands, Inc. Updated Objections and Counter-Designations to Armadillo's and Concordia's Video and Oral Deposition Designations (Bates, Andrea)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 424 NOTICE by Gibson Brands, Inc. Updated Designations of Deposition Testimony (Bates, Andrea)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 423 NOTICE by Gibson Brands, Inc. of its Proposed Jury Questionnaire (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bates, Andrea)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 422 REPLY IN SUPPORT by Gibson Brands, Inc. re #420 OBJECTIONS TO #401 Proposed Jury Instructions (Bates, Andrea)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 421 RESPONSE to #420 Notice (Other) Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Objections to Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Hubbard, Emileigh)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 420 OBJECTIONS by Gibson Brands, Inc. re #401 Proposed Jury Instructions Objections to Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions (Bates, Andrea)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 419 RESPONSE to #410 Notice (Other) Defendants Objections to Gibsons Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER SETTING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2021 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 11/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/3/2021. (baf, )
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER - granting #414 Motion to Seal Defendants' Sur-Reply Opposing Gibson's Motions in Limine. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/30/2021. (baf, )
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER - granting #413 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/30/2021. (baf, )
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference held on 4/30/2021 at 8:30 a.m. Andrea Bates, Kurt Schuettinger and Stephen Howen appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Anna Naydonov, Emileigh Hubbard and Patrick Rodgers appeared on behalf of Defendants. Parties agree case will take 2 weeks for trial. Court will impose 20 hour time limit per side. Court will enter order setting trial in November and schedule final pretrial conference. Call adjourned at 8:43 a.m. (Digital recording) (kkc, )
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 415 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #344 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Patrick Rodgers in Support of Defendants' Sur-Reply Opposing Gibson's Motions in Limine, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 414 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Sur-Reply Opposing Gibson's Motions In Limine by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 413 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER - granting #408 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/29/2021. (baf, )
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER granting #407 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/29/2021. (ch, )
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 410 NOTICE by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC re #394 Proposed Jury Instructions Objections to Gibson's Proposed Jury Instructions (Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 409 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #356 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrea Bates, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration)(Bates, Andrea)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 408 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Surreply in Opposition of Defendants Omnibus Motion in Limine by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 407 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER - granting #399 Motion to Seal Defendant's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Armadillo's Notice of Intent to Offer Certified Records. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/26/2021. (baf, )
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER - granting #398 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/26/2021. (baf, )
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER - granting #395 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/26/2021. (baf, )
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER - granting #392 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/26/021. (baf, )
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER - granting #391 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is therefore ORDERED that Gibson's Reply in Support of Gibson's Motion in Limine may exceed the Local Rules' page limitation by fourteen (14) pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/19/358. (baf, )
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 401 Proposed Jury Instructions by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Jury Verdict Form)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 400 SEALED SUR-REPLY by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc. to #337 Sealed Document, Gibson's Objections to Armadillo's Notice of Intent to Offer Certified Records filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov in Support of Armadillo's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Gibson's Objections to Armadillo's Notice of Intent to Offer Certified Records, #2 Exhibit 1)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 399 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendant's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Gibson's Objections to Armadillo's Notice of Intent to Offer Certified Records by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 398 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 397 Sealed Document. Proposed Findings of Fact andConclusions of Law (Bates, Andrea)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 396 NOTICE by Gibson Brands, Inc. PROPOSED VERDICT FORM (Attachments: #1 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Bates, Andrea)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 395 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Proposed Jury Instructions by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 393 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #344 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrea Bates, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration)(Bates, Andrea)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 392 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Reply in Support of its Motion in Limine by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 391 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER - granting #387 Motion to Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/22/2021. (baf, )
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER - granting #386 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/22/2021. (baf, )
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 388 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #356 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Patrick Rodgers in Support of Defendants' Reply In Support of its Omnibus Motion in Limine, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 387 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Reply In Support of Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 386 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 385 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion to Strike the Unsworn Declaration of Basil Imburgia (Dkt. #315 ) is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/20/2021. (baf, )
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 384 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #200 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. Eugene Ericksen filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/20/2021. (baf, )
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER granting #379 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 04/19/2021. (klc, )
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER granting #378 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 04/19/2021. (klc, )
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER granting #375 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Witnesses, Deposition Extracts, and Exhibits in Pre-Trial Order. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/16/2021. (rpc, )
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 380 Sealed Document. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Objections to Armadillo's Notice of Intent to offer Certified records. (Bates, Andrea)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 379 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Reply in Support of its Objections to Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.s Notice of Intent to Offer Certified Records by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 378 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER - granting #373 Motion to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Gibson's Motions in Limine. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/16/2021. (baf, )
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER - granting #372 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is therefore ORDERED that Armadillo and Concordia are permitted to file their Opposition to Gibson's Motion in Limine that is thirty (30) pages in length (excluding table of contents, table of authorities, cover page, and signature blocks). Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/16/2021. (baf, )
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Witnesses, Deposition Extracts, and Exhibits by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 374 SEALED RESPONSE by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc. to #344 Sealed Motion,, filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Gibson's Motions in Limine, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 373 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Gibson's Motions in Limine by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 372 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER - granting #368 Motion to Seal Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition of Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/15/2021. (baf, )
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER - granting #367 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is therefore ORDERED that Gibson's Brief in Opposition of Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine may exceed the Local Rules' page limitation by thirteen (13) pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/15/2021. (baf, )
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 369 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #356 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrea Bates, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration)(Bates, Andrea)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 368 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Brief in Opposition of Defendants Omnibus Motion in Limine by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference for the limited purpose of discussing trial scheduling set for 4/30/2021 8:30 AM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. The Final Pretrial Conference is CANCELLED, to be reset closer to the time of trial. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 8:25 AM: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (tls)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER granting #363 Motion to Seal Armadillo's Opposition to Gibson's Objections to Armadillo's Notice of Intent to Offer Certified Records. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/13/2021. (baf, )
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER - granting #362 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is therefore ORDERED that Armadillo is permitted to file motion in limine that is nineteen (19) pages in length (excluding table of contents, table of authorities, cover page, and signature blocks). Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/13/2021. (baf, )
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 364 SEALED RESPONSE by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc. to #337 Sealed Document, Gibson's Objections to Armadillo's Notice of Intent to Offer Certified Records, filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov in Support of Armadillo's Opposition to Gibson's Objections to Armadillo's Notice of Intent to Offer Certified Records, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 363 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Armadillo's Opposition to Gibson's Objections to Armadillo's Notice of Intent to Offer Certified Records by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 362 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER - granting #358 Motion for Leave to Extend Deadlines. It is therefore ORDERED that the deadline for the parties to file objections to witnesses, deposition extracts, and exhibits listed in the pre-trial order is hereby extended to April 23, 2021. All other deadlines shall remain as previously set by the Court's amended scheduling order (Dkt. #322). Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/6/2021. (baf, )
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER - granting #352 Motion to Seal Exhibits A & F to the Joint Final Pre-Trial Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Gibson's Exhibits A & F to the Joint Final Pre-Trial Order are hereby SEALED and will not be visible to the public. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/6/2021. (baf, )
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER - granting #351 Motion to Seal Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine is hereby SEALED and will not be visible to the public. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/6/2021. (baf, )
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 358 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Sealed AMENDED Additional Attachment to Main Document #353 - Joint Final Pre-Trial Order. Amended/Corrected Exhibit F to the Joint Final Pre-Trial order [Dkt. No. 353] (Bates, Andrea)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 356 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Patrick Rodgers in Support of Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 355 Sealed Additional Attachment to Main Document #353 Joint Final Pre-Trial Order. Exhibit F to the Joint Final Pre-Trialorder [Dkt. No. 353] (Bates, Andrea)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 354 Sealed Additional Attachment to Main Document #353 Joint Final Pre-Trial Order. Exhibit A to the Joint Final Pre-Trialorder [Dkt. No. 353] (Bates, Andrea)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 353 Proposed Pretrial Order Jointly filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gibson's Witness List, #2 Exhibit B - Armadillo Witness List, #3 Exhibit C - Concordia Witness List, #4 Exhibit D - Gibson's Witness List Depo Designations, #5 Exhibit E - Armadillo and Concordia Depo Designations, #6 Exhibit F - Gibson's Trial Exhibit List, #7 Exhibit G & H - Armadillo's and Concordia's Trial Exhibit List)(Bates, Andrea)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 352 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibits A & F to the Joint Final Pre-Trial Order by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 351 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER granting #345 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/1/2021. (rpc, )
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting #343 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/1/2021. (rpc, )
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER granting #342 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/1/2021. (rpc, )
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting #341 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/1/2021. (rpc, )
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 346 SEALED MOTION Unopposed Motions in Limine by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 345 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Unopposed Motions in Limine by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 344 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrea Bates, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit Q-1, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 343 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Motions in Limine by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 342 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 341 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER - granting #336 Motion to Seal its Objections to Armadillo Distribution Enterprise, Inc's Notice of Intent to Offer Certified Records in Evidence at Trial or Hearing. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/31/2021. (baf, )
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 339 NOTICE by Gibson Brands, Inc. re #334 Notice (Other) of Objections and Counter-Designations to Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.'s and Concordia Investment Partners, LLC's Video and Oral Deposition Designations (Bates, Andrea)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 338 NOTICE by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC re #335 Notice (Other) of Objections and Counter-Designations to Gibson's Deposition Designations (Hubbard, Emileigh)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Sealed Document. Gibson's Objections to Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.s Notice of Intent to Offer Certified Records in Evidence at Trial or Hearing (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrea Bates, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit J-1, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V)(Bates, Andrea)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 336 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Gibson's Objections to Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.s Notice of Intent to Offer Certified Records in Evidence at Trial or Hearing by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 335 NOTICE by Gibson Brands, Inc. of Deposition Testimony Designation (Bates, Andrea)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 334 NOTICE by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC of Video and Oral Deposition Designations (Hubbard, Emileigh)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 333 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Basil Imburgia (Dkt. #195 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/18/2021. (rpc, )
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 332 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Mike Rock (Dkt. #194 ) is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/15/2021. (baf, )
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 331 NOTICE by Gibson Brands, Inc. of Intent to Offer Certified Records (Bates, Andrea)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 330 NOTICE by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC of Intent to Offer Certified Records in Evidence at Trial or Hearing (Hubbard, Emileigh)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Supplement the Updated George Gruhn Expert Report (Dkt. #186 ) is hereby GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Gibson may depose Gruhn for a total of two hours concerning all the supplemental third-party data. This includes the hour the Court previously permitted. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/11/2021. (rpc, )
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER - granting #326 Motion to Seal Its Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike the Unsworn Declaration of Basil Imburgia. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/4/2021. (baf, )
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 327 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #315 SEALED MOTION to Strike Unsworn Declaration of Basil Imburgia filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Bates, Andrea)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Sur-Reply in Opposition of Defendants Motion to Strike the Unsworn Declaration of Basil Imburgia by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting #323 Unopposed Motion to Seal Reply. ORDERED that Armadillo's Unopposed Motion to Seal Armadillo's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Unsworn Declaration of Basil Imburgia is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Armadillo's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Unsworn Declaration of Basil Imburgia is hereby SEALED and will not be visible to the public. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/24/2021. (kls, )
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 324 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #315 SEALED MOTION to Strike Unsworn Declaration of Basil Imburgia filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Hubbard, Emileigh)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Armadillo's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike the Unsworn Declaration of Basil Imburgia by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER - granting in part #318 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Gibson Brands, Inc. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2021 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Proposed Jury instructions/Form of Verdict due by 4/23/2021. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 4/1/2021. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/23/2021. (baf, )
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER - granting #319 Motion to Seal Plaintiff's Response Brief in Opposition of Defendants' Motion to Strike the Unsworn Declaration of Basil Imburgia. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/22/2021. (baf, )
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 320 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #315 SEALED MOTION to Strike Unsworn Declaration of Basil Imburgia filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Bates, Andrea)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Response in Opposition of Defendants Motion to Strike the Unsworn Declaration of Basil Imburgia by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/3/2021. (baf, )
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER - granting #314 Motion to Seal Armadillo's Motion to Strike Unsworn Declaration of Basil Imburgia. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/3/2021. (baf, )
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 315 SEALED MOTION to Strike Unsworn Declaration of Basil Imburgia by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 314 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Armadillo's Motion to Strike Unsworn Declaration of Basil Imburgia by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER granting #309 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/29/2021. (slo, )
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER granting #307 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/29/2021. (slo, )
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER granting #305 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/29/2021. (slo, )
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 310 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #194 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Mike Rock filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Bates, Andrea)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Sur-Reply in Opposition of Defendants Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mike Roc by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 308 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #200 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. Eugene Ericksen filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Bates, Andrea)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Sur-Reply in Opposition of Defendants Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Eugene Ericksen by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 306 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #195 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Basil Imburgia filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Bates, Andrea)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 305 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Sur-Reply in Opposition of Defendants Motion to Exclude Basil Imburgia by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/28/2021. (ch, )
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 303 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/28/2021. (ch, )
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 302 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/28/2021. (ch, )
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER - granting #298 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/27/2021. (baf, )
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER - granting #182 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. It is therefore ORDERED that Armadillo has until and including November 30, 2020 to conduct the remaining third-party depositions. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/27/2021. (baf, )
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 299 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #219 SEALED MOTION First Motion in Limine filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov in Support of Armadillo's Surreply to Gibson's First Motion In Limine, #2 Exhibit 1)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 298 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Armadillo's Surreply in Opposition to Gibson's First Motion In Limine by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER - granting #288 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/25/2021. (baf, )
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER - granting #286 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/25/2021. (baf, )
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER - granting #282 Motion to Seal its Replies to Motions. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/25/2021. (baf, )
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER - granting #280 Motion to Seal its Objections to Armadillo Distribution enterprises, Inc.'s Evidence in Support of its Opposition to Summary Judgment Motion. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/25/2021. (baf, )
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER - granting #278 Motion to Seal Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of George Gruhn. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/25/2021. (baf, )
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER - granting #277 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/25/2021. (baf, )
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER - granting #275 Motion to Seal its Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/25/2021. (baf, )
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER - granting #274 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/25/2021. (baf, )
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 289 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #197 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov in Support of Concordia's Reply in Support of Concordia's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Affidavit of Evan Rubinson in Support of Concordia's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit 1)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 287 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #196 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov in Support of Armadillo's Reply in Support of Armadillo's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 285 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #200 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. Eugene Ericksen filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 284 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #195 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Basil Imburgia filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov in Support of Armadillo's Reply in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude Basil Imburgia, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 283 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #194 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Mike Rock filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov in Support of Armadillo's Reply in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude Mike Rock, #2 Exhibit A)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Replies to Motions by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 281 SEALED Objections to Defendant Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.s Evidence in Support of its Opposition to Summary Judgment Motion by Gibson Brands, Inc. to #241 Sealed Response to Motion,,, filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Objections to Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.s Evidence in Support of its Opposition to Summary Judgment Motion by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 279 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #188 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF GEORGE GRUHN filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Bates, Andrea)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Gibsons Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of George Gruhn by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 277 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Gibsons Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of George Gruhn by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 276 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #199 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Bates, Andrea)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Gibsons Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Gibsons Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER - granting #265 Motion to Seal Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Exclude Defendant's Rebuttal Survey of Dr. Michael J. Barone. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/22/2021. (baf, )
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER - granting #264 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/22/2021. (baf, )
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER - granting #262 Motion to Seal Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Rebuttal Expert Report and Testimony of George Gruhn. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/22/2021. (baf, )
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER - granting #261 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/22/2021. (baf, )
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff Gibson Brands, Inc's Motion to Exclude Defendant's Rebuttal Survey of Dr. Michael J. Barone (Dkt. #192 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/22/2021. (baf, )
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Report and Testimony of George Gruhn (Dkt. #190 ) hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/22/2021. (baf, )
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff Gibson Brands, Inc's Motion to Exclude Defendant's Expert Report and Testimony of George Gruhn (Dkt. #188 ) hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/22/2021. (baf, )
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 266 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #192 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS REBUTTAL SURVEY OF DR. MICHAEL J. BARONE filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger, #2 Exhibit A)(Bates, Andrea)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Exclude Defendants Rebuttal Survey of Dr. Michael J. Barone by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Exclude Defendants Rebuttal Survey of Dr. Michael J. Barone by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 263 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #190 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF GEORGE GRUHN filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Bates, Andrea)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Rebuttal Expert Report and Testimony of George Gruhn by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Exclude the Rebuttal Expert Report and Testimony of George Gruhn by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER - granting #258 Motion to Seal Document #258 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Reply in Support of its First Motion in Limine. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Gibson's Reply in Support of its First Motion in Limine is hereby SEALED and will not be visible to the public. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/21/2021. (baf, )
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 259 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #219 SEALED MOTION First Motion in Limine filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bates, Andrea)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Reply in Support of its First Motion in Limine by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER granting #249 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/19/2021. (rpc, )
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting #247 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/19/2021. (rpc, )
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER granting #246 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/19/2021. (rpc, )
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER granting #244 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/19/2021. (rpc, )
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting #242 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/19/2021. (rpc, )
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting #240 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/19/2021. (rpc, )
January 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 251 CORRECTED SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #196 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger, #4 Exhibit A-EE, #5 Declaration of Andrea Bates, #6 Exhibit A-Z, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 250 SEALED OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT ARMADILLODISTRIBUTION ENTERPRISES, INC.S SUMMARY JUDGMENT EVIDENCE by Gibson Brands, Inc. to #196 Sealed Motion,,,,,,, filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen Howen, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea) (Attachment 5 replaced on 1/19/2021) (baf, ).
January 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Objections to Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.s Summary Judgment Evidence by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #196 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C-DD, #5 Declaration of Andrea Bates, #6 Exhibit A-Z, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Response to Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Response to Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 245 SEALED Objections to Summary Judgment Evidence by Gibson Brands, Inc. to #197 Sealed Motion,, filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea) (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/19/2021) (baf, ).
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Objections to Concordia Investment Partners, LLCs Summary Judgment Evidence by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #197 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Response to Concordia Investment Partners, LLCs Motion for Summary Judgment by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #199 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov in Support of Armadillo's Opposition to Gibson's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Appendix of Exhibits to Declaration of Anna Naydonov, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Affidavit of Evan Rubinson in Support of Armadillo's Opposition to Gibson's Motion for Summary Judgment, #17 Appendix of Exhibits to Declaration of Evan Rubinson, #18 Exhibit 1, #19 Exhibit 2, #20 Exhibit 3, #21 Exhibit 4, #22 Exhibit 5, #23 Exhibit 6, #24 Exhibit 7, #25 Exhibit 8, #26 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Armadillo's Opposition to Gibson's Motion for Summary Judgment by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting #236 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/13/2021. (rpc, )
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting #234 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/13/2021. (rpc, )
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 237 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #186 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Updated George Gruhn Expert Report filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Stephen Howen)(Bates, Andrea)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Sur-Reply in Support of Response to Defendants Motion to Supplement the Expert Report of George Gruhn by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #219 SEALED MOTION First Motion in Limine filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov in Support of Armadillo's Opposition to Gibson's First Motion In Limine, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Armadillo's Opposition to Gibson's First Motion in Limine by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation), Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting #231 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/6/2021. (rpc, )
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #186 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Updated George Gruhn Expert Report filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov in Support of Armadillo's Reply in Support of its Motion for Leave to Supplement the Updated George Gruhn Expert Report, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Armadillo's Reply in Support of its Motion for Leave to Supplement the Updated George Gruhn Expert Report by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting #207 Joint Motion for Leave to Extend Deadlines for Briefs on the Outstanding Motions for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions. The Court finds the motion should be granted to the extent that the Court approves the requested extensions of the deadlines set forth herein. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/30/2021. (tls)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER - granting #222 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/30/2020. (baf, )
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER - granting #220 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/30/2020. (baf, )
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER - granting #218 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/30/2020. (baf, )
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER - granting #216 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/30/2020. (baf, )
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER - granting #214 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/30/2020. (baf, )
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER - granting #208 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/30/2020. (baf, )
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 223 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #200 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. Eugene Ericksen filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Eugene Ericksen by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 221 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #195 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Basil Imburgia filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Basil Imburgia, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude Basil Imburgia by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 219 SEALED MOTION First Motion in Limine by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document First motion in Limine by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #186 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Updated George Gruhn Expert Report filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger in Support, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Declaration, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea) (Attachment 9 replaced on 12/30/2020) (baf, ).
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Response to Defendants Motion to Supplement the Expert Report of George Gruhn including First motion in Limine by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION IN LIMINE AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT submitted DOCUMENT #213 - DOCUMENT IS A TWO-PART PLEADING. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR - THE DOCUMENT SEEKING LEAVE TO BE SEALED HAS BEEN DEEMED DEFICIENT***. Document # 212, MOTION TO SEAL. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 215 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #194 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Mike Rock filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mike Rock by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #186 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Updated George Gruhn Expert Report filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger in Support, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Declaration, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea) Modified on 12/29/2020 (baf, ).
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ***PLEASE DISREGARD***Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiff's first Motion inLimine and Response to Defendants' Motion to Supplement the expert report of George Gruhn by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea) Modified on 12/29/2020 (baf, ).
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #192 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS REBUTTAL SURVEY OF DR. MICHAEL J. BARONE filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov in Support of Armadillo's Opposition to Gibson's Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Michael J. Barone, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #190 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF GEORGE GRUHN filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov in Support of Armadillo's Opposition to Gibson's Motion to Exclude the Rebuttal Expert Report and Testimony of George Gruhn, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #188 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF GEORGE GRUHN filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov in Support of Armadillo's Opposition to Gibson's Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of George Gruhn, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File BRIEFS ON THE OUTSTADNING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting #198 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/16/2020. (rpc, )
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting #193 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/16/2020. (rpc, )
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting #191 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/16/2020. (rpc, )
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting #189 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/16/2020. (rpc, )
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting #187 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/16/2020. (rpc, )
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting #185 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/16/2020. (rpc, )
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 200 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. Eugene Ericksen by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov in Support of Armadillo's Daubert Motion to Exclude Ericksen, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 199 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Declaration, #9 Exhibit G to Declaration, #10 Exhibit H to Declaration, #11 Exhibit I to Declaration, #12 Exhibit J to Declaration, #13 Exhibit K to Declaration, #14 Exhibit L to Declaration, #15 Exhibit M to Declaration, #16 Exhibit N to Declaration, #17 Exhibit O to Declaration, #18 Exhibit P to Declaration, #19 Exhibit Q to Declaration, #20 Exhibit R to Declaration, #21 Exhibit S to Declaration, #22 Exhibit T to Declaration, #23 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Unopposed MOTION to Seal PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment by Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov in Support of Concordia's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Appendix of Exhibits to Declaration of Anna Naydonov, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Affidavit of Evan Rubinson in Support of Concordia's Motion for Summary Judgment, #7 Appendix of Exhibits to Declaration of Evan Rubinson, #8 Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov in Support of Armadillo's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Appendix of Exhibits to Declaration of Anna Naydonov, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46, #49 Exhibit 47, #50 Exhibit 48, #51 Exhibit 49, #52 Exhibit 50, #53 Affidavit of Evan Rubinson in Support of Armadillo's Motion for Summary Judgment, #54 Appendix of Exhibits to Declaration of Evan Rubinson, #55 Exhibit A, #56 Exhibit B, #57 Exhibit C, #58 Exhibit D, #59 Exhibit E, #60 Exhibit F, #61 Exhibit G, #62 Exhibit H, #63 Exhibit I, #64 Exhibit J, #65 Exhibit K, #66 Exhibit L, #67 Exhibit M, #68 Exhibit N, #69 Exhibit O, #70 Exhibit P, #71 Exhibit Q, #72 Exhibit R, #73 Exhibit S, #74 Exhibit T, #75 Exhibit U, #76 Exhibit V, #77 Exhibit W, #78 Exhibit X, #79 Exhibit Y, #80 Exhibit Z, #81 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 195 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Basil Imburgia by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov in Support of Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Basil Imburgia, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Mike Rock by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov In Support of Armadillo's Daubert Motion to Exclude Mike Rock, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Motions by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation), Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS REBUTTAL SURVEY OF DR. MICHAEL J. BARONE by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Unopposed MOTION to Seal PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS REBUTTAL SURVEY OF DR. MICHAEL J. BARONE by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF GEORGE GRUHN by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Unopposed MOTION to Seal PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF GEORGE GRUHN by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF GEORGE GRUHN by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF GEORGE GRUHN, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Unopposed MOTION to Seal PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF GEORGE GRUHN by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Updated George Gruhn Expert Report by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna B. Naydonov in Support of Armadillo's Motion for Leave to Supplement the Updated George Gruhn Expert Report, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Anna Naydonov in Support of Armadillo's Motion for Leave to Supplement the Updated George Gruhn Expert Report by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting #167 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/12/2020. (rpc, )
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that Gibson's Motion to Strike New Expert Report (Dkt. #143 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/10/2020. (rpc, )
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - Conduct Third-Party Depositions by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 REPLY to Response to Motion re #167 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Patrick Rodgers, #2 Exhibit 1)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting #177 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/29/2020. (rpc, )
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 REDACTION to #178 Sealed Response to Motion, by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrea Bates in Support of Opposition to Motion to Exceed Page Limit, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re #167 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrea Bates in Support of Opposition to Motion to Exceed Page Limit, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiff's Response Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Exceed Page Limit by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark S Hanna on behalf of Reverend Guitars. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8073421. (Hanna, Mark)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #162 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/21/2020. (rpc, )
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #155 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/21/2020. (rpc, )
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting #153 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/21/2020. (rpc, )
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #150 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/21/2020. (rpc, )
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Jury instructions due by 4/9/2021. Motions due by 12/15/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/24/2021. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/15/2020. (rpc, )
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that Defendant Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.'s Emergency Motion to Conduct Third-Party Depositions and Extend Deadlines (Dkt. #154 ) is hereby GRANTED. Armadillo has a two-month continuance to complete the thirteen third-party depositions. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/14/2020. (rpc, )
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery (Dkt. #151 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/14/2020. (rpc, )
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting #165 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/14/2020. (rpc, )
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #165 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Surreply in Opposition to Gibson's Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery, #151 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Emileigh S. Hubbard, #2 Affidavit of Evan Rubinson, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Evan Rubinson, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Evan Rubinson)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Surreply in Opposition to Gibson's Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 REDACTION to #163 Sealed Response to Motion, by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #154 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Leave to Conduct Third-Party Depositions and Extend Deadlines filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiff's Response to Emergency Motion for Leave to Conduct Third-Party Depositions and to Extend Deadlines by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #158 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/6/2020. (rpc, )
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 REDACTION to #159 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #151 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Amended Certificate of Conference re #153 Armadillo's MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Anna Naydonov in Support of Armadillo's Motion for Leave to Conduct Third-Party Depositions and Extend Deadlines by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc. (Hubbard, Emileigh) Modified on 10/2/2020 (rpc, ).
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #151 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Rodgers Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C1, #5 Exhibit C2, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Affidavit Rubinson Declaration, #8 Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Armadillo's Response in Opposition to Gibson's Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery and Armadillo's Request for Attorneys' Fees by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Leave to Conduct Third-Party Depositions and Extend Deadlines by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna Naydonov In Support of Armadillo's Motion for Leave to Conduct Third-Party Depositions and Extend Deadlines, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Anna Naydonov in Support of Armadillo's Motion for Leave to Conduct Third-Party Depositions and Extend Deadlines by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 REDACTION to #151 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrea Bates in Support for Motion for Leave, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrea Bates in Support of Motion for Leave, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 REPLY to Response to Motion re #143 MOTION to Strike New Expert Report of George Gruhn filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 REPLY to Response to Motion re #143 MOTION to Strike New Expert Report filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting #145 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/31/2020. (rpc, )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #143 MOTION to Strike New Expert Report filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - Comparison Gruhn Report, #3 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Gruhn, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document -Exhibits to Declaration of Anna Naydonov attached to Armadillo's Opposition to Gibson's Motion to Strike the Supplemental Report of George Gruhn by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #142 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Deadline. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/14/2020. (rpc, )
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MOTION to Strike New Expert Report by Gibson Brands, Inc.. Responses due by 8/28/2020 (Howen, Stephen)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 8/17/2020. Motions due by 10/16/2020. (rpc, )
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Deadline by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Leave to Extend)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 HOTLINE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 8/6/2020. (rpc, )
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Telephonic Hotline Conference held on 8/6/2020. (hma)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that Armadillo's Motion to Strike Gibson's Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel (Dkt. #96 ) and Concordia's Motion to Strike Gibson's Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel (Dkt. #112 ) are hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/24/2020. (rpc, )
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea) (Main Document 138 replaced with flattened image on 7/13/2020.) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Jan Mason, on 7/13/2020.)(bas).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Telephone Conference held on May 14, 2020 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-209-4013. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (7 pages) Motion to Redact due 8/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2020. (jm, )
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc. for proceedings held on Telephone Conference on May 14, 2020 before Judge Mazzant. (Hubbard, Emileigh) (Forwarded to Official Court Reporter, Jan Mason, on 7/6/2020.)(bas).
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel (Dkt. #56 ) is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/24/2020. (rpc, )
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that Gibson's Motion to Strike Allegations in Armadillo's. Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses (Dkt. #88 ) and Gibson's Motion to Strike Allegations in Concordia's Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses (Dkt. #93 ) are hereby DENIED in part. It is further ORDERED that Defendants are granted leave to amend the defense of acquiescence within their pleadings within fourteen (14) days of this Order. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/24/2020. (rpc, )
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Dismissal of the Sixth and Seventh Counterclaims (Dkt. #87 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/24/2020. (rpc, )
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that Defendant Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Counterfeiting Claim (Dkt. #79 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/24/2020. (rpc, )
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone conference regarding case deadlines held on 5/14/2020 at 10:00 a.m. Kurt Schuettinger and Stephen Howen appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Anna Naydonov and Emileigh Hubbard appeared on behalf of Defendants. Plaintiff requests an additional 30 days for one expert to complete rebuttal report. After hearing argument from counsel, Court grants Plaintiffs request to extend rebuttal report due date to 6/29. Call adjourned at 10:14 a.m. (Court Reporter Jan Mason) (kkc)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order *** ENTERED IN ERROR - PLEASE DISREGARD *** Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference regarding discovery dispute held on 5/13/2020 at 2:00 p.m. Michael Young, Roger Sanders, Mazin Sbaiti, Kevin Colquitt and Kate Schneider appeared on behalf of Relators. Jonathan Rosenberg, Richard Sayles, Elizabeth McKeen and Mark Strachan appeared on behalf of Defendant. Parties discuss NSM settlement agreement. The Court finds that the settlement speaks for itself and no discovery is needed at this time. Parties discuss issue regarding modified loans. The Court finds that the information is discoverable at this point and should be produced if there are certifications post NMS that relate to loans that were pre-NMS. The Court will allow defense to file a motion for reconsideration on this issue, if deemed necessary. The Parties discuss protective order and designation of documents as highly sensitive and attorneys eyes only; Court finds that the current protective order will remain in place but will allow relators to file a motion to modify the protective order or to compel, if deemed necessary. Call adjourned at 3:20 p.m. (Court Reporter Jan Mason) (kkc, ) Modified on 5/13/2020 (kkc, ).
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for Thursday 5/14/2020 10:00 AM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 9:55 AM: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (tls)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #130 Motion for Leave to Extend Deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2021 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III., Discovery due by 8/17/2020., Jury instructions due by 11/30/2020, Mediation Completion due by 8/17/2020., Motions due by 9/23/2020., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/14/2020. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/27/2020. (rpc, )
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #128 Motion for Leave to Extend Certain Expert Discovery Deadlines of the parties. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/13/2020. (rpc, )
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 5/18/2020. (rpc, )
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #112 MOTION to Strike #96 MOTION to Strike Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re #112 MOTION to Strike #96 MOTION to Strike Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel filed by Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Hubbard, Emileigh)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #96 MOTION to Strike Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 RESPONSE in Opposition re #112 MOTION to Strike #96 MOTION to Strike Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #122 Motion to Extend Pretrial Deadlines of the parties. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/10/2020. (rpc, )
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #119 Motion for Leave to File Reply Out-of-Time. Armadillo's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Gibson's Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel #120 is now considered timely filed. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/7/2020. (rpc, )
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 REPLY to Response to Motion re #96 MOTION to Strike Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Hubbard, Emileigh)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Out-Of-Time by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #116 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/5/2020. (rpc, )
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #93 MOTION to Strike Allegations in Concordia's Counterclaims and Second, Third, and Fourth Affirmative Defenses filed by Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Hubbard, Emileigh)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #113 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/29/2020. (rpc, )
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 REPLY to Response to Motion re #93 MOTION to Strike Allegations in Concordia's Counterclaims and Second, Third, and Fourth Affirmative Defenses filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION to Strike #96 MOTION to Strike Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel by Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #108 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/27/2020. (rpc, )
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #106 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/27/2020. (rpc, )
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #87 MOTION to Dismiss Armadillo's Sixth and Seventh Counterclaims filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #88 MOTION to Strike Allegations in Armadillo's Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 RESPONSE to Motion re #96 MOTION to Strike Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition re #93 MOTION to Strike Allegations in Concordia's Counterclaims and Second, Third, and Fourth Affirmative Defenses filed by Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #100 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/21/2020. (rpc, )
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #98 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/21/2020. (rpc, )
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 REPLY to Response to Motion re #87 MOTION to Dismiss Armadillo's Sixth and Seventh Counterclaims filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 REPLY to Response to Motion re #88 MOTION to Strike Allegations in Armadillo's Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Gibson's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Strike by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #79 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Counterfeiting Claim filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION to Strike Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 MOTION to Strike Allegations in Armadillo's Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition re #87 MOTION to Dismiss Armadillo's Sixth and Seventh Counterclaims filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION to Strike Allegations in Concordia's Counterclaims and Second, Third, and Fourth Affirmative Defenses by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Gibson's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Concordia's Counterclaims by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea) Modified on 1/6/2020 (rpc, ).
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #89 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/6/2020. (rpc, )
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 RESPONSE in Support re #79 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Counterfeiting Claim filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Anna Naydonov, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Anna Naydonov, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Anna Naydonov, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Anna Naydonov, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Anna Naydonov, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Anna Naydonov)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION to Strike Allegations in Armadillo's Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss Armadillo's Sixth and Seventh Counterclaims by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/30/2019) (rpc, ).
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION to Strike Allegations in Armadillo's Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea) Modified on 12/30/2019 (rpc, ).
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Partial Answer and Affirmative Defenses to #77 Defendant Armadillo's Second Amended Counterclaims by Gibson Brands, Inc. (Bates, Andrea) Modified on 12/30/2019 (rpc, ).
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #82 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/30/2019. (rpc, )
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #86 MOTION to Strike Allegations in Armadillo's Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses submitted by Gibson Brands, Inc.. The Motion is missing a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Counterfeiting Claim filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File excess pages by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/17/2019. (rpc, )
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ANSWER to #74 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims by Concordia Investment Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Counterfeiting Claim by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Armadillo's ANSWER to #74 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, And Counterclaims by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EUIPO Decision, #2 Exhibit B - TSDR Printout for ES App, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Opp Against ES Shape, #4 Exhibit D - Gibson letter to Dealers)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. Concordia Investment Partners, LLC waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020. (Bates, Andrea)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #73 Motion to Amend its Second Amended Complaint. It is further ORDERED that Defendant Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Counterfeiting Claim (Dkt. #20 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/2/2019. (rpc, )
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc., John Doe 1-10, filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Bates, Andrea)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Motion to Amend its Second Amended Complaint by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to Second Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit D to Second Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit E to Second Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit F to Second Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit G to Second Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit H to Second Amended Complaint, #10 Exhibit I to Second Amended Complaint, #11 Exhibit J to Second Amended Complaint, #12 Exhibit K to Second Amended Complaint, #13 Exhibit L to Second Amended Complaint, #14 Exhibit M to Second Amended Complaint, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #65 Motion to Amend Its Affirmative Defenses and First Amended Counterclaims. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Allegations in Defendant's Counterclaims and Acquiescence Affirmative Defense (Dkt. #26 ), and Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Fifth and Sixth Counterclaims (Dkt. #50 ) are DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/22/2019. (rpc, )
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REPLY to Response to Motion re #65 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Hubbard, Emileigh)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re #65 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Gibson Brands, Inc. for proceedings held on October 28, 2019 Telephonic Conference before Judge Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. (Bates, Andrea) Forwarded to official court reporter, Jan Mason on 11/12/2019 (bjc, ).
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Telephone Conference held on October 28, 2019 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-209-4013. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (30 page) Motion to Redact due 11/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2020. (jm, )
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc. for proceedings held on October 28, 2019 Telephone Conference before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Hubbard, Emileigh) Forwarded to official court reporter, Jan Mason on 10/31/2019. (bjc, ).
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 AMENDED ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, Amended Affirmative Defenses, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc. by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-EUIPO Decision, #2 Exhibit B-TSDR Printout for ES Application, #3 Exhibit C-Notice of Opposition Against ES Shape, #4 Exhibit D-Gibson Letter to Dealers)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Armadillo's Answer to Gibson's First Amended Complaint, Amended Affirmative Defenses, and Second Amended Counterclaims, #2 Exhibit A-EUIPO Decision, #3 Exhibit B-TSDR Printout for ES Application, #4 Exhibit C-Notice of Opposition Against ES Shape, #5 Exhibit D-Gibson Letter to Dealers)(Hubbard, Emileigh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2019: #6 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference regarding discovery dispute held on 10/28/2019 at 11:04 a.m. Kurt Schuettinger and Stephen Howen appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Anna Naydonov and Emileigh Hubbard appear on behalf of Defendant. After hearing argument from counsel, Court orally grants #64 MOTION to Quash filed by Gibson Brands, Inc. Court orally grants Defendant's request for twenty (20) third party depositions. Parties are encouraged to work together regarding declaration procedures and scheduling depositions. Call adjourned at 11:47 a.m. (Court Reporter Jan Mason) (kkc)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION to Quash by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kurt Schuettinger, #2 Exhibit 1 to Dec of Kurt Schuettinger, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference to address a discovery dispute set for 10/28/2019 11:00 AM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 10:55 AM: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (tls)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER. It is ORDERED that Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion to Strike (Dkt. #39 ) is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/17/2019. (rpc, )
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #24 ) is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/17/2019. (rpc, )
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #56 MOTION to Strike Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion re #56 MOTION to Strike Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Hubbard, Emileigh)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 MOTION to Strike Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Fifth and Sixth Counterclaims Sur-Reply in Opposition to Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Armadillo's Fifth and Sixth Counterclaims filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Hubbard, Emileigh)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Fifth and Sixth Counterclaims filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION to Strike Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION to Strike Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh) Modified on 9/13/2019 (rpc, ).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #55 MOTION to Strike Gibson Brands, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel submitted by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc. The Motion is missing a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Fifth and Sixth Counterclaims filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 2/26/2020. Discovery due by 5/18/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2020. Jury instructions due by 9/28/2020. Mediation Completion due by 5/18/2020. Designation of Mediator due by 4/6/2020, Motions due by 5/25/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/11/2020. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/10/2019. (rpc, )
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/9/2019. (rpc, )
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Due to the Court's schedule, the September 3, 2019 Scheduling Conference is CANCELED. The Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (tls)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Fifth and Sixth Counterclaims by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Partial ANSWER to #38 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, and Affirmative Defenses by Gibson Brands, Inc..(Bates, Andrea)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION re #39 MOTION to Strike #25 Answer to Counterclaim Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/27/2019. (rpc, )
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Strike Allegations in Defendant's Counterclaims and Acquiescence Affirmative Defense filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Hubbard, Emileigh)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations. It is therefore ORDERED that Gibson's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Strike (Dkt. #41 ) is permitted to exceed the page limitations for replies in support of non-dispositive motions set forth by this Court's local rules by 3 pages and is deemed filed. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/21/2019. (rpc, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bates, Andrea) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2019: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) (rpc, ).
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Counterfeiting Claim - Partial filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Strike Allegations in Defendant's Counterclaims and Acquiescence Affirmative Defense filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Gibson's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Strike by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Strike #25 Answer to Counterclaim Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Gibson Brands, Inc. by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Armadillo's Reply in Support of its Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Counterfeiting Claim is permitted to exceed the page limitations for replies in support of non-dispositive motions by three (3) pages in length. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/13/2019. (rpc, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Amend its Counterclaims. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/13/2019. (rpc, )
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Counterfeiting Claim - Partial filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna B. Naydonov, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Strike Allegations in Defendant's Counterclaims and Acquiescence Affirmative Defense filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Fifth Counterclaim by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.(a Florida corporation). (Hubbard, Emileigh)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY, SEE DKT #38 . PLEASE DISREGARD*** ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Gibson Brands, Inc. by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hubbard, Emileigh) Modified on 8/13/2019 (rpc, ).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Gibson's Response Opposition to Motion to Dismiss is permitted to exceed the page limitations for response to non-dispositive motions by 5 pages in length. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/6/2019. (rpc, )
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Counterfeiting Claim - Partial filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Bates, Andrea)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Strike Allegations in Defendant's Counterclaims and Acquiescence Affirmative Defense by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/29/2019) (rpc, ).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Gibson's Partial ANSWER to #12 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, and Affirmative Defenses by Gibson Brands, Inc..(Bates, Andrea)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Fifth Counterclaim by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Andrea) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/29/2019) (rpc, ).
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Johnathan Bates on behalf of Gibson Brands, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7364400. (Bates, Johnathan)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kurt Schuettinger on behalf of Gibson Brands, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7364393. (Schuettinger, Kurt)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/22/2019. (rpc, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Counterfeiting Claim - Partial by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anna B. Naydonov, #2 Exhibit 1 - Flying V #1, #3 Exhibit 2 - Flying V #2, #4 Exhibit 3 - Explorer #1, #5 Exhibit 4 - Explorer #2, #6 Exhibit 5 - SG #1, #7 Exhibit 6 - SG #2, #8 Exhibit 7 - Dove Wing, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Douglas A Rettew on behalf of Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7355878. (Rettew, Douglas)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #10 Motion to Dismiss submitted by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc. DEFICIENCY: Over Page Limit for Non-dispositive Motion. (kls, )
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Patrick J. Rodgers on behalf of Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7355595. (Rodgers, Patrick)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Anna B. Naydonov on behalf of Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7355459. (Naydonov, Anna)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before: August 6, 2019. Complete initial mandatory disclosure required by this Order: August 16, 2019. File joint report of attorney conference: August 20, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on Tuesday, September 3, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. at the Paul Brown United States Courthouse, 101 E. Pecan Street, Sherman, Texas 75090. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/16/2019. (kls, )
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Counsel are reminded that the Court has not opted out of this court's Local Rules concerning courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of pleadings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzant's chambers. Please use tabs and dividers for exhibits. (tls)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #10 MOTION to Dismiss .. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (kls, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Docket Entry 11 submitted by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc. DEFICIENCY: Incorrect Docket Event. Correction should be made by Next Business Day. (kls, )
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc. (Henry, Vic)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Gibson Brands, Inc. by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Henry, Vic)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED - SHOULD BE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS TO MAIN DOCUMENT*** MOTION to Dismiss Declaration in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 1, #2 Exhibit No. 2, #3 Exhibit No. 3, #4 Exhibit No, 4, #5 Exhibit No. 5, #6 Exhibit No. 6, #7 Exhibit No. 7)(Henry, Vic) Modified on 7/9/2019 (kls, ).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.. Responses due by 7/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Vic) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/9/2019) (kls, ).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc. served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Bates, Andrea)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc. (rpc, )
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Howen, Stephen)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Howen, Stephen)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY. INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED*** COMPLAINT First Amended against All Defendants, filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Howen, Stephen) Modified on 6/6/2019 (rpc, ).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #5 COMPLAINT First Amended against All Defendants submitted by Gibson Brands, Inc. The document needs to be filed using the event Amended Complaint. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andrea Bates on behalf of Gibson Brands, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7277144. (Bates, Andrea)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Howen, Stephen)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc. (rpc, )
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7268110.), filed by Gibson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Corporate Disclosure, #11 AO Form 120, #12 Summons(es))(Howen, Stephen)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson Brands, Inc. v. Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gibson Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Dale Howen
Represented By: Andrea Bates
Represented By: Johnathan Bates
Represented By: Kurt Schuettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concordia Investment Partners, LLC
Represented By: Emileigh Stewart Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Armadillo Distribution Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Vic Houston Henry
Represented By: Emileigh Stewart Hubbard
Represented By: Anna B. Naydonov
Represented By: Douglas A Rettew
Represented By: Elyse E McNamara
Represented By: Patrick J. Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?