Cox v. Bindewald Maintenance, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Donita Cox
Defendant: Willis Charles Hales and Bindewald Maintenance, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00365
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Christine A Nowak
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint Plaintiff's by Willis Charles Hales.(Fenley, Curtis)
July 10, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR - LETTERS ARE NOT FILED OF RECORD IN OUR COURT. Document # 9, STATUS REPORT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - LETTER ONLY***STATUS REPORT Court's Order re Scheduling Conference by Donita Cox. (Walker, Tennessee) Modified on 7/10/2019 (baf, ).
June 19, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's Original ANSWER to Complaint by Bindewald Maintenance, Inc..(Fenley, Curtis)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for a scheduling conference when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice must be filed within five days of the last remaining Defendants answer or motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 6/14/2019. (baf, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donita Cox. Bindewald Maintenance, Inc. served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Walker, Tennessee)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. The Court REFERS the above-styled and numbered civil action to United States Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak to conduct all pretrial proceedings in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/30/2019. (baf, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donita Cox. Willis Charles Hales served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Walker, Tennessee)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Bindewald Maintenance, Inc.. (baf, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Willis Charles Hales. (baf, )
May 16, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
May 16, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (baf, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 28:1332 against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7271375.), filed by Donita Cox. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Tennessee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Bindewald Maintenance, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donita Cox
Represented By: Tennessee Wilson Walker
Represented By: Travis Jeffrey Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willis Charles Hales
Represented By: Curtis William Fenley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bindewald Maintenance, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis William Fenley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?