Jeanty v. Nebraska Furniture Mart et al
Plaintiff: VanDamme V Jeanty
Defendant: The Colony, Texas, Tracy Murphree, The Colony Police Department, Micheal Dickens, Nebraska Furniture Mart, Kelly R Goodness, Jason Stevens, Casey McGregor, Big Bubba's Bail Bonds, Texas Denton County, David Coulon, Jane Doe Jailers, Edward Lipsett and Denton County District Attorney's Office
Case Number: 4:2019cv00366
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Strike #41 Amended Complaint by Texas Denton County, Denton County District Attorney's Office, Micheal Dickens. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yancey, Claire)
July 12, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Texas Denton County, Denton County District Attorney's Office, Micheal Dickens. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yancey, Claire)
July 12, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Texas Denton County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Yancey, Claire)
July 12, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Micheal Dickens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Yancey, Claire)
July 12, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Denton County District Attorney's Office. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yancey, Claire)
July 11, 2019 Filing 41 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by VanDamme V Jeanty. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(daj, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief by Kelly R Goodness. (Bunn, Nichol) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants TXFM Inc., incorrectly named as Nebraska Furniture Mart, LLC, Edward Lipsett, and Casey McGregor shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 18, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 6/25/2019. (rpc, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant Tracy Murphree shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 6/25/2019. (rpc, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Edward Lipsett, Casey McGregor, Nebraska Furniture Mart. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hart Sneed, Katherine) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/25/2019) (rpc, ).
June 24, 2019 Filing 36 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Tracy Murphree. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order corrected format)(Miller, Mary)
June 24, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #35 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer submitted by Tracy Murphree. The PDF is not in a searchable PDF format and the proposed order is not in an editable PDF format. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 35 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Tracy Murphree. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Mary) Modified on 6/24/2019 (rpc, ).
June 21, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VanDamme V Jeanty. Casey McGregor served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (daj, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss by David Coulon, Jason Stevens, The Colony Police Department, The Colony, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
June 21, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss by The Colony, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
June 20, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss by David Coulon, Jason Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NFM Investigative Report, #2 Exhibit PC Affidavit Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit Magistrate PC Determination, #4 Exhibit Magistrate PC Determination 2, #5 Exhibit Indictment Plaintiff, #6 Exhibit Register of Actions Plaintiff, #7 Exhibit Motion to Amend Indictment, #8 Exhibit Bond Charges Amount, #9 Exhibit PC Affidavit Wife Felony, #10 Exhibit Register of Actions Wife Felony, #11 Exhibit Indictment Wife Felony, #12 Exhibit Disposition Wife Felony, #13 Exhibit Order Deferred Adjudication, #14 Exhibit Order commencing Sentence, #15 Exhibit PC Affidavit Wife Misdemeanor, #16 Exhibit Register of Actions Wife Misdemeanor, #17 Exhibit Complaint and Information Wife Misdemeanor, #18 Exhibit Disposition Wife Misdemeanor, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 12, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 6/18/2019. (daj, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Texas Denton County, Denton County District Attorney's Office, Micheal Dickens. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yancey, Claire)
June 11, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss by The Colony Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
June 7, 2019 Filing 27 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by VanDamme V Jeanty as to #22 Order. (daj, )
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #24 "MOTION to Reconsider Plaintiff's Request to Proceed with Electronic Filing". ORDERED that Plaintiff is GRANTED an additional five (5) calendar days to file any responsive pleadings in this matter until further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 6/6/2019. (daj, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VanDamme V Jeanty. Edward Lipsett served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(daj, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Reconsideration re #22 Order, by VanDamme V Jeanty. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(daj, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VanDamme V Jeanty. Jason Stevens served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (daj, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2019: #1 Envelope(s)) (daj, ).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #21 MOTION to proceed with electronic filing filed by VanDamme V Jeanty. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of Court with a preferred e-mail address on or before Thursday, June 13, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. It is further ORDERED that the addition of Plaintiff's email address to the electronic list in no way allows Plaintiff to file electronically and/or entitles Plaintiff to a user ID and access to the Electronic Filing System. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 5/30/2019. (daj, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to proceed with electronic filing by VanDamme V Jeanty. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(daj, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Issued as to Tracy Murphree. (daj, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Issued as to The Colony Police Department. (daj, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Issued as to Nebraska Furniture Mart. (daj, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Issued as to Micheal Dickens. (daj, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Issued as to Kelly R Goodness. (daj, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Issued as to Jason Stevens. (daj, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued as to Edward Lipsett. (daj, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued as to Denton County District Attorney's Office. (daj, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued as to Texas Denton County. (daj, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to David Coulon. (daj, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to The Colony, Texas. (daj, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Casey McGregor. (daj, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Big Bubba's Bail Bonds. (daj, )
May 16, 2019 Note: Pursuant to Local Rule CV-7(j), any motions pending in another federal or state court made by any party will be considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court. (daj, )
May 16, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***Consent form mailed to plaintiff. (daj, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 Case reassigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-01137. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Sherman Division of Eastern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 5/14/2019) (mcrd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 5/16/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by VanDamme V Jeanty. (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 5/16/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Big Bubba's Bail Bonds, David Coulon, Denton County District Attorney's Office, Denton County Texas, Micheal Dickens, Kelly R Goodness, Jane Doe Jailers, Edward Lipsett, Casey McGregor, Tracy Murphree, Nebraska Furniture Mart, Jason Stevens, The Colony Police Department, The Colony Texas filed by VanDamme V Jeanty. (Filing fee $400.00; Receipt number DS116200) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 5/16/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 5/16/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 5/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeanty v. Nebraska Furniture Mart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Colony, Texas
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Murphree
Represented By: Mary Erin Wilcox Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Colony Police Department
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal Dickens
Represented By: Claire Raney Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Furniture Mart
Represented By: Katherine Marie Hart Sneed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly R Goodness
Represented By: Nichol L Bunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Stevens
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey McGregor
Represented By: Katherine Marie Hart Sneed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Bubba's Bail Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Denton County
Represented By: Claire Raney Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Coulon
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Jailers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Lipsett
Represented By: Katherine Marie Hart Sneed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denton County District Attorney's Office
Represented By: Claire Raney Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VanDamme V Jeanty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?