Kehrer et al v. Knox

Plaintiff: Michael Kehrer, Madison Kehrer and Wendy Kehrer
Defendant: Chrisenberry Trucking LLC and Jordan Knox
Intervenor Plaintiff: Cliff Tamberino
Case Number: 4:2019cv00367
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2020 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2019 for Plaintiff and by 11/14/2019 for Defendant. Discovery due by 1/21/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 8/22/2019. Proposed Jury instructions/Form of Verdict due by 3/17/2020. Mediation Completion due by 12/20/2019. Designation of Mediator due by 11/8/2019. Motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, or other dispositive motions due by 10/17/2019. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 3/2/2020. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/11/2019. (baf, )
July 3, 2019 The Court hereby CANCELS the July 11, 2019 Scheduling Conference; the Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (tls)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hull, Lisa)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third against All Defendants, filed by Wendy Kehrer, Madison Kehrer, Michael Kehrer.(Kennedy, William)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/26/2019. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 03:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/22/2019. (rpc, )
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND ADVISORY re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Jordan Knox. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/17/2019. (baf, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 ***ANSWER TO INTERVENOR COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #6 Intervenor Complaint by Jordan Knox.(baf, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 ***INTERVENOR COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT*** Intervenor COMPLAINT, filed by Cliff Tamberino.(baf, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Jordan Knox.(baf, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 ***SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Wendy Kehrer, Madison Kehrer, Michael Kehrer, Robert Kehrer.(baf, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 ***AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Wendy Kehrer, Madison Kehrer, Michael Kehrer, Robert Kehrer.(baf, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Wendy Kehrer, Madison Kehrer, Michael Kehrer, Robert Kehrer.(baf, )
May 16, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
May 16, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jordan Knox from 397th Judicial District Court, Grayson County, Texas, case number CV-19-0314. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7271951), filed by Jordan Knox. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Original Petition, #4 Exhibit Citation to Jordan Knox, #5 Exhibit Amended Original Petition, #6 Exhibit Citation to Jordan Knox, #7 Exhibit Citation to Texas Transp Commission, #8 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt, #9 Exhibit Citation to Crisenberry Trucking LLC, #10 Exhibit Original Answer of Defendant Knox, #11 Exhibit Jury Demand of Defendant Knox, #12 Exhibit Petition in Intervention, #13 Exhibit Citation to Crisenberry Trucking LLC, #14 Exhibit Second Amended Original Petition, #15 Exhibit Answer to Petition in Intervention by Defendant Knox)(Hull, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kehrer et al v. Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kehrer
Represented By: Joan Elizabeth Ballard
Represented By: William P Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Kehrer
Represented By: Joan Elizabeth Ballard
Represented By: William P Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Kehrer
Represented By: Joan Elizabeth Ballard
Represented By: William P Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrisenberry Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Knox
Represented By: Lisa Dean Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Cliff Tamberino
Represented By: John Bart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?