United My Funds, LLC v. Perera et al
Plaintiff: United My Funds, LLC
Defendant: Yaser Al-Shayef, Chandana Perera, Michael R McCullough, Wait Al-Shayef, Click Mart, Inc., Hisham Mubaidin and Wail Al-Shayef
Not Classified By Court: Hon. Jeff Kaplan and Hon. King Fifer
Case Number: 4:2019cv00373
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conference is RESET for 3/31/2020 at 1:30 PM to be held via telephone before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/25/2020. (baf, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 69 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action served on Unitex Fuel LLC c/o James Yoo on 03/16/2020, filed by Hisham Mubaidin. (Champion, Austin)
March 18, 2020 Filing 68 Proposed Jury Instructions by Wail Al-Shayef, Yaser Al-Shayef, Click Mart, Inc.. (Ahmed, Farrah)
March 17, 2020 Filing 67 Proposed Jury Instructions by United My Funds, LLC. (Malone, Robbie)
March 17, 2020 Filing 66 RESPONSE to Motion re #62 MOTION in Limine filed by Hisham Mubaidin. (Champion, Austin)
March 17, 2020 Filing 65 Proposed Jury Instructions by Hisham Mubaidin. (Jones, William)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Hisham Mubaidin's Motion to Compel (Dkt. #42 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/12/2020. (baf, )
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Counter-Defendant United My Funds, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Counter-Plaintiff Hisham Mubaidin's Original Counterclaim (Dkt. #32 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/11/2020. (baf, )
March 3, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION in Limine by United My Funds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Eugene)
March 3, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION in Limine by Wail Al-Shayef, Yaser Al-Shayef, Click Mart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahmed, Farrah)
March 3, 2020 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION IN LIMINE submitted DOCUMENT #59 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE AND NO PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
March 3, 2020 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION IN LIMINE submitted DOCUMENT #60 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE AND NO PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 60 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION in Limine by Wail Al-Shayef, Yaser Al-Shayef, Click Mart, Inc.. (Ahmed, Farrah) Modified on 3/3/2020 (baf, ).
March 2, 2020 Filing 59 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION in Limine by United My Funds, LLC. (Martin, Eugene) Modified on 3/3/2020 (baf, ).
March 2, 2020 Filing 58 Proposed Pretrial Order by United My Funds, LLC. (Malone, Robbie)
February 28, 2020 Filing 57 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order #45 sent to Chandana Perera returned marked "RETURN TO SENDER - UNCLAIMED - UNABLE TO FORWARD" (rpc, )
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/26/2020. (baf, )
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER - GRANTING #51 Motion to Change Designation of Mediator. It is ORDERED, as follows: The Motion is GRANTED as set forth herein. The mediator assigned to this case is changed to Hon. King Fifer (Ret.) of BurdinMediations, 4514 Cole Avenue Ste. 1450, Dallas, TX 75205, Tel: (214) 528-1411. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/21/2020. (baf, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 54 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order #48 sent to Chandana Perera returned marked "RETURN TO SENDER - NO MAIL RECEPTACLE - UNABLE TO FORWARD" (rpc, )
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED Michael R. McCullough's Rule 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3) Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #20 ) is hereby GRANTED and Plaintiff's claims against Michael R. McCullough are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/11/2020. (baf, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION to Compel filed by Hisham Mubaidin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hearing Transcript)(Jones, William)
February 4, 2020 Filing 51 Joint MOTION to Change Designation of Mediator by United My Funds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Malone, Robbie)
February 4, 2020 Filing 50 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***NOTICE by United My Funds, LLC (Notice to Change Designation of Mediator) (Malone, Robbie) Modified on 2/4/2020 (baf, ).
February 4, 2020 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the NOTICE TO CHANGE DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR submitted DOCUMENT #50 - A MOTION IS REQUIRED. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Telephone Conference held on Nov. 22, 2019 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-209-4013. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (13 pages) Motion to Redact due 2/20/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2020. (jm, )
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART JOINT #43 MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES AND TRIAL DATE: Discovery due by 5/1/2020. Mediation Completion due by 5/1/2020. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/30/2020. (rpc) Modified on 1/31/2020 (tls).
January 29, 2020 Filing 47 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United My Funds, LLC for proceedings held on 11/22/19 Telephonic Conference before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Malone, Robbie) (Main Document 47 replaced with flattened image on 1/29/2020) (Forwarded to court reporter, Jan Mason, on 1/29/2020) (slo)
January 28, 2020 Filing 46 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Hisham Mubaidin for proceedings held on November 22, 2019 (Telephone Conference Regarding Discovery Dispute) before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Jones, William) (Main Document 46 replaced with flattened image on 1/28/2020) (Forwarded to court reporter, Jan Mason, on 1/28/2020) (slo)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: granting #43 Motion to Extend Deadlines and Trial Date. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2020 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III., Discovery due by 5/1/2020., Jury instructions due by 3/17/2020, Mediation Completion due by 5/1/2020., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/2/2020. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/28/2020. (rpc, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Compel filed by United My Funds, LLC. (Malone, Robbie)
January 20, 2020 Filing 43 Joint MOTION to Continue (to Extend Deadlines and Trial Date) by United My Funds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Malone, Robbie)
January 13, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Compel by Hisham Mubaidin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's First Request for Production to Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Requests for Production, #3 Exhibit C - Correspondence Dated November 1, 2019, #4 Exhibit D - Email Correspondence Dated November 6, 2019, #5 Exhibit E - Email Correspondence Dated November 6, 2019, #6 Exhibit F - Plaintiff's Amended Objections and Responses to Requests for Production, #7 Exhibit G - Plaintiff's Supplemental Objections and Responses to Requests for Production, #8 Exhibit H - Certificate of Formation, #9 Exhibit I - Certificate of Amendment, #10 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel)(Jones, William)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 HOTLINE ORDER entered re objections during deposition of Defendant Hisham Mubaidin. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/8/2020. (mjc, ) Modified on 1/8/2020 (mjc, ).
January 7, 2020 HOTLINE CONFERENCE (telephonic) held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/7/2020. [See Order at DE 41]. (leh, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/9/2019. (baf, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Entry of Agreed Protective Order by Michael R McCullough, Hisham Mubaidin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Agreed Protective Order))(Jones, William)
December 5, 2019 Filing 38 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION to Dismiss Counter-Plaintiff Hisham Mubaidin's Original Counterclaim filed by Hisham Mubaidin. (Jones, William)
November 27, 2019 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION to Dismiss Counter-Plaintiff Hisham Mubaidin's Original Counterclaim filed by United My Funds, LLC. (Martin, Eugene)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - GRANTING #34 Unopposed MOTION to Extend the Mediation Deadline filed by Hisham Mubaidin. Mediation Completion due by 1/20/2020. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/22/2019. (baf, )
November 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference regarding discovery dispute held on 11/22/2019 at 1:31 p.m. Robbie Malone and Eugene Martin IV appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs; William Benjamin Jones, Austin Champion, and Farrah Ahmed appeared on behalf of Defendants. Court will Defendant to file a motion to compel and Plaintiff to respond. Call adjourned at 1:48 p.m. (Court Reporter Jan Mason) (kkc, )
November 21, 2019 Counsel are advised that the Court has not opted out of this court's Local Rules concerning courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of pleadings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzant's chambers. Please use tabs and dividers for exhibits. (tls)
November 20, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Dismiss Counter-Plaintiff Hisham Mubaidin's Original Counterclaim filed by Hisham Mubaidin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Petition in State Court, #2 Exhibit B - Original Answer in State Court, #3 Text of Proposed Order Denying United My Funds, LLC's Motion to Dismiss)(Jones, William)
November 19, 2019 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION to Extend the Mediation Deadline by Hisham Mubaidin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend the Mediation Deadline)(Jones, William)
November 18, 2019 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action with Exhibit A served on James Yoo on 11/14/2019, filed by Hisham Mubaidin. (Champion, Austin)
November 14, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference to address a discovery dispute set for 11/22/2019 at 1:30 p.m. before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 1:25 p.m.: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (kkc)
November 6, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss Counter-Plaintiff Hisham Mubaidin's Original Counterclaim by United My Funds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Petition-Mubaidin, #2 Exhibit B - Order Granting Motion to Consolidate, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Eugene) (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/7/2019) (rpc, ).
October 17, 2019 Filing 31 COUNTERCLAIM against United My Funds, LLC, filed by Hisham Mubaidin.(Jones, William)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER - GRANTING #29 Joint MOTION Extension of Mediation Deadline re #18 Scheduling Order, filed by United My Funds, LLC. Mediation Completion due by 11/19/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/17/2019. (baf, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 29 Joint MOTION Extension of Mediation Deadline re #18 Scheduling Order,, by United My Funds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Malone, Robbie)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. The Court hereby ORDERS that this case be submitted to mediation in accordance with this court's Mediation Plan. By agreement of the parties, the mediator assigned is the Hon. Jeff Kaplan (Ret.). Mediation Completion due by 9/20/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/12/2019. (baf, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. Jeff Kaplan (Ret.), filed by United My Funds, LLC. (Shin, Jin Seock)
August 5, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Support filed by Michael R McCullough. (Jones, William)
July 31, 2019 Filing 25 Original ANSWER to #17 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Crossclaim, by Hisham Mubaidin.(Champion, Austin)
July 29, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Support filed by United My Funds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of James Yoo)(Malone, Robbie)
July 18, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - GRANTING #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Austin Smith Champion and William Benjamin Jones terminated. It is therefore ORDERED that the Clerk's Office shall enter the pro se appearance of Defendant Perera on the court docket, as follows: Chandana Perera, 2174 South Welsh, Wichita, Kansas 67230. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/17/2019. (baf, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 Original ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Chandana Perera.(Champion, Austin)
July 16, 2019 Filing 21 Original ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Hisham Mubaidin.(Champion, Austin)
July 16, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Support by Michael R McCullough. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael McCullough, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Champion, Austin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Click Mart, Inc. (Ahmed, Farrah)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2020 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 10/3/2019 for Plaintiff and by 10/17/2019 for Defendant. Discovery due by 12/26/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 8/22/2019. Jury instructions due by 3/17/2020 Mediation Completion due by 9/20/2019. Designation of Mediator due by 8/9/2019. Motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, or other dispositive motions due by 10/17/2019. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 3/2/2020. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/11/2019. (baf, )
July 11, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 CLICK MART, INC.S, YASER AL-SHAYEFS, AND WAIL AL SHAYEFS ORIGINAL ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM against Hisham Mubaidin, Chandana Perera by Yaser Al-Shayef, Wail Al-Shayef, Click Mart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ahmed, Farrah)
July 3, 2019 The Court hereby CANCELS the July 11, 2019 Scheduling Conference; the Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (tls)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Chandana Perera by Chandana Perera. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(Champion, Austin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Chandana Perera.( Champion, Austin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hisham Mubaidin.( Champion, Austin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Michael R McCullough.( Champion, Austin)
June 27, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hisham Mubaidin to 7/16/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
June 27, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Michael R McCullough to 7/16/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
June 27, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Chandana Perera to 7/16/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Malone, Robbie)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to Yaser Al-Shayef. (baf, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to Click Mart, Inc.. (baf, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Wail Al-Shayef. (baf, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT (PLAINTIFF UNITED MY FUNDS, LLC'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) against All Defendants, filed by United My Funds, LLC.(Malone, Robbie)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/26/2019. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 03:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/22/2019. (rpc, )
May 22, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hisham Mubaidin to 6/21/2019. 22 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
May 22, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Chandana Perera to 6/21/2019. 27 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
May 22, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Michael R McCullough to 6/21/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Plaintiff's amended complaint is due thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Defendants' amended answer is due twenty (20) days from receipt of the amended complaint. Any prior deadline for Defendant's answer shall be extended to the date set by this order. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/21/2019. (rpc, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Michael R McCullough.( Champion, Austin)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Chandana Perera.( Champion, Austin)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hisham Mubaidin.( Champion, Austin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United My Funds, LLC.(baf, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael R McCullough, Hisham Mubaidin, Chandana Perera from 401st District Court, Collin County, Texas, case number 401-02146-2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7274242), filed by Michael R McCullough, Hisham Mubaidin, Chandana Perera. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Documents, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Citation and Petition, #3 Exhibit B - Lead Counsel of Record, #4 Exhibit C - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit D - Certified State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit E - State Court Filings)(Champion, Austin)
May 17, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
May 17, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United My Funds, LLC v. Perera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yaser Al-Shayef
Represented By: Farrah Imtiaz Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandana Perera
Represented By: Austin Smith Champion
Represented By: William Benjamin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R McCullough
Represented By: Austin Smith Champion
Represented By: William Benjamin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wait Al-Shayef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Click Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Farrah Imtiaz Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hisham Mubaidin
Represented By: Austin Smith Champion
Represented By: William Benjamin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wail Al-Shayef
Represented By: Farrah Imtiaz Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United My Funds, LLC
Represented By: Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV
Represented By: Robbie LuAnn Malone
Represented By: Jin Seock Shin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Hon. Jeff Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Hon. King Fifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?