Deere v. United Revenue Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Deere
Defendant: United Revenue Corporation and Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00379
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint and Brief in Support. Responses due by 7/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 7/8/2019. (baf, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint and Brief in Support by Samuel Deere. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Klote, Gregory)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson.) Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 7/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 6/26/2019. (baf, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint and Brief in Support by United Revenue Corporation. (Farrar, Zachary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
June 21, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Saldana, Melissa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(Saldana, Melissa)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samuel Deere. United Revenue Corporation served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Motil, Gregory)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Experian Information Solutions, Inc served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Motil, Gregory)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (baf, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to United Revenue Corporation. (baf, )
May 24, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
May 24, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7282804.), filed by Samuel Deere. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Klote, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deere v. United Revenue Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Revenue Corporation
Represented By: Zachary Curtis Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Melissa Saldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Deere
Represented By: Joel Spencer Halvorsen
Represented By: Gregory Michael Klote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?